EP1845833 - METHOD FOR OPERATING A WATER-USING DOMESTIC APPLIANCE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 09.05.2014 Database last updated on 19.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.07.2015 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): BG, HU, LU | published on 26.08.2015 [2015/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BSH Bosch und Siemens Hausgeräte GmbH Carl-Wery-Strasse 34 81739 München / DE | [2013/27] |
Former [2007/43] | For all designated states BSH Bosch und Siemens Hausgeräte GmbH Carl-Wery-Str. 34 81739 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ROSENBAUER, Michael Riedweg 19 86756 Reimlingen / DE | [2007/43] | Representative(s) | Dosterschill, Peter BSH Hausgeräte GmbH Zentralabteilung Gewerblicher Rechtsschutz Carl-Wery-Strasse 34 81739 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2013/27] | Dosterschill, Peter BSH Bosch und Siemens Hausgeräte GmbH Zentralabteilung Gewerblicher Rechtsschutz Carl-Wery-Strasse 34 81739 München / DE | ||
Former [2007/43] | Dosterschill, Peter BSH Bosch und Siemens Hausgeräte GmbH Zentralabteilung Gewerblicher Rechtsschutz Carl-Wery-Strasse 34 81739 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 05797269.7 | 21.10.2005 | [2007/43] | WO2005EP55469 | Priority number, date | DE20051005040 | 03.02.2005 Original published format: DE102005005040 | [2007/43] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2006081880 | Date: | 10.08.2006 | Language: | DE | [2006/32] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1845833 | Date: | 24.10.2007 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 10.08.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/43] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1845833 | Date: | 03.07.2013 | Language: | DE | [2013/27] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 10.08.2006 | Classification | IPC: | A47L15/42, D06F39/00 | [2007/43] | CPC: |
A47L15/4229 (EP,US);
D06F34/22 (EP,US);
A47L2401/11 (EP);
A47L2401/30 (EP);
A47L2501/07 (EP);
A47L2501/18 (EP);
A47L2501/26 (EP);
D06F2103/20 (EP,US);
D06F2105/42 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/43] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUM BETREIBEN EINES WASSERFÜHRENDEN HAUSHALTGERÄTS | [2013/11] | English: | METHOD FOR OPERATING A WATER-USING DOMESTIC APPLIANCE | [2007/43] | French: | PROCEDE POUR FAIRE FONCTIONNER UN APPAREIL MENAGER CONDUISANT DE L'EAU | [2007/43] |
Former [2007/43] | VERFAHREN ZUM BETREIBEN EINES WASSERF]HRENDEN HAUSHALTGER[TS | Entry into regional phase | 03.09.2007 | National basic fee paid | 03.09.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 03.09.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 03.09.2007 | Examination requested [2007/43] | 05.12.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 13.06.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.02.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.05.2013 | Fee for grant paid | 23.05.2013 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 05.12.2011 | Opposition(s) | 04.04.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit [2014/24] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.10.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.10.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 02.11.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 02.11.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 31.10.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 31.10.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 21.10.2005 | BG | 03.07.2013 | CY | 03.07.2013 | CZ | 03.07.2013 | DK | 03.07.2013 | EE | 03.07.2013 | FI | 03.07.2013 | LT | 03.07.2013 | LV | 03.07.2013 | MC | 03.07.2013 | NL | 03.07.2013 | RO | 03.07.2013 | SE | 03.07.2013 | SI | 03.07.2013 | SK | 03.07.2013 | GR | 04.10.2013 | AT | 21.10.2013 | GB | 21.10.2013 | IE | 21.10.2013 | LU | 21.10.2013 | BE | 31.10.2013 | CH | 31.10.2013 | LI | 31.10.2013 | IS | 03.11.2013 | PT | 04.11.2013 | [2015/34] |
Former [2015/12] | CY | 03.07.2013 | |
CZ | 03.07.2013 | ||
DK | 03.07.2013 | ||
EE | 03.07.2013 | ||
FI | 03.07.2013 | ||
LT | 03.07.2013 | ||
LV | 03.07.2013 | ||
MC | 03.07.2013 | ||
NL | 03.07.2013 | ||
RO | 03.07.2013 | ||
SE | 03.07.2013 | ||
SI | 03.07.2013 | ||
SK | 03.07.2013 | ||
GR | 04.10.2013 | ||
AT | 21.10.2013 | ||
GB | 21.10.2013 | ||
IE | 21.10.2013 | ||
BE | 31.10.2013 | ||
CH | 31.10.2013 | ||
LI | 31.10.2013 | ||
IS | 03.11.2013 | ||
PT | 04.11.2013 | ||
Former [2014/48] | CY | 03.07.2013 | |
CZ | 03.07.2013 | ||
DK | 03.07.2013 | ||
EE | 03.07.2013 | ||
FI | 03.07.2013 | ||
LT | 03.07.2013 | ||
LV | 03.07.2013 | ||
MC | 03.07.2013 | ||
NL | 03.07.2013 | ||
RO | 03.07.2013 | ||
SE | 03.07.2013 | ||
SI | 03.07.2013 | ||
SK | 03.07.2013 | ||
GR | 04.10.2013 | ||
GB | 21.10.2013 | ||
IE | 21.10.2013 | ||
BE | 31.10.2013 | ||
CH | 31.10.2013 | ||
LI | 31.10.2013 | ||
IS | 03.11.2013 | ||
PT | 04.11.2013 | ||
Former [2014/41] | CY | 03.07.2013 | |
CZ | 03.07.2013 | ||
DK | 03.07.2013 | ||
EE | 03.07.2013 | ||
FI | 03.07.2013 | ||
LT | 03.07.2013 | ||
LV | 03.07.2013 | ||
MC | 03.07.2013 | ||
NL | 03.07.2013 | ||
RO | 03.07.2013 | ||
SE | 03.07.2013 | ||
SI | 03.07.2013 | ||
SK | 03.07.2013 | ||
GR | 04.10.2013 | ||
GB | 21.10.2013 | ||
BE | 31.10.2013 | ||
CH | 31.10.2013 | ||
LI | 31.10.2013 | ||
IS | 03.11.2013 | ||
PT | 04.11.2013 | ||
Former [2014/34] | CY | 03.07.2013 | |
CZ | 03.07.2013 | ||
DK | 03.07.2013 | ||
EE | 03.07.2013 | ||
FI | 03.07.2013 | ||
LT | 03.07.2013 | ||
LV | 03.07.2013 | ||
MC | 03.07.2013 | ||
NL | 03.07.2013 | ||
RO | 03.07.2013 | ||
SE | 03.07.2013 | ||
SI | 03.07.2013 | ||
SK | 03.07.2013 | ||
GR | 04.10.2013 | ||
GB | 21.10.2013 | ||
CH | 31.10.2013 | ||
LI | 31.10.2013 | ||
IS | 03.11.2013 | ||
PT | 04.11.2013 | ||
Former [2014/25] | CY | 03.07.2013 | |
CZ | 03.07.2013 | ||
DK | 03.07.2013 | ||
EE | 03.07.2013 | ||
FI | 03.07.2013 | ||
LT | 03.07.2013 | ||
LV | 03.07.2013 | ||
MC | 03.07.2013 | ||
NL | 03.07.2013 | ||
RO | 03.07.2013 | ||
SE | 03.07.2013 | ||
SI | 03.07.2013 | ||
SK | 03.07.2013 | ||
GR | 04.10.2013 | ||
IS | 03.11.2013 | ||
PT | 04.11.2013 | ||
Former [2014/23] | CY | 03.07.2013 | |
CZ | 03.07.2013 | ||
DK | 03.07.2013 | ||
EE | 03.07.2013 | ||
FI | 03.07.2013 | ||
LT | 03.07.2013 | ||
LV | 03.07.2013 | ||
NL | 03.07.2013 | ||
RO | 03.07.2013 | ||
SE | 03.07.2013 | ||
SI | 03.07.2013 | ||
SK | 03.07.2013 | ||
GR | 04.10.2013 | ||
IS | 03.11.2013 | ||
PT | 04.11.2013 | ||
Former [2014/22] | CY | 03.07.2013 | |
DK | 03.07.2013 | ||
FI | 03.07.2013 | ||
LT | 03.07.2013 | ||
LV | 03.07.2013 | ||
NL | 03.07.2013 | ||
RO | 03.07.2013 | ||
SE | 03.07.2013 | ||
SI | 03.07.2013 | ||
GR | 04.10.2013 | ||
IS | 03.11.2013 | ||
PT | 04.11.2013 | ||
Former [2014/21] | CY | 03.07.2013 | |
DK | 03.07.2013 | ||
FI | 03.07.2013 | ||
LT | 03.07.2013 | ||
LV | 03.07.2013 | ||
NL | 03.07.2013 | ||
SE | 03.07.2013 | ||
SI | 03.07.2013 | ||
GR | 04.10.2013 | ||
IS | 03.11.2013 | ||
PT | 04.11.2013 | ||
Former [2014/18] | CY | 03.07.2013 | |
FI | 03.07.2013 | ||
LT | 03.07.2013 | ||
LV | 03.07.2013 | ||
NL | 03.07.2013 | ||
SE | 03.07.2013 | ||
SI | 03.07.2013 | ||
GR | 04.10.2013 | ||
IS | 03.11.2013 | ||
PT | 04.11.2013 | ||
Former [2014/14] | FI | 03.07.2013 | |
LT | 03.07.2013 | ||
LV | 03.07.2013 | ||
NL | 03.07.2013 | ||
SE | 03.07.2013 | ||
SI | 03.07.2013 | ||
CY | 24.07.2013 | ||
GR | 04.10.2013 | ||
IS | 03.11.2013 | ||
PT | 04.11.2013 | ||
Former [2014/12] | FI | 03.07.2013 | |
LT | 03.07.2013 | ||
LV | 03.07.2013 | ||
SE | 03.07.2013 | ||
SI | 03.07.2013 | ||
CY | 24.07.2013 | ||
GR | 04.10.2013 | ||
IS | 03.11.2013 | ||
PT | 04.11.2013 | ||
Former [2014/11] | FI | 03.07.2013 | |
LT | 03.07.2013 | ||
SE | 03.07.2013 | ||
SI | 03.07.2013 | ||
CY | 24.07.2013 | ||
IS | 03.11.2013 | ||
PT | 04.11.2013 | ||
Former [2014/10] | LT | 03.07.2013 | |
SE | 03.07.2013 | ||
SI | 03.07.2013 | ||
CY | 24.07.2013 | ||
IS | 03.11.2013 | ||
PT | 04.11.2013 | ||
Former [2014/09] | LT | 03.07.2013 | |
SE | 03.07.2013 | ||
SI | 03.07.2013 | ||
PT | 04.11.2013 | ||
Former [2014/08] | LT | 03.07.2013 | |
SI | 03.07.2013 | ||
PT | 04.11.2013 | ||
Former [2013/49] | SI | 03.07.2013 | Cited in | International search | [XA]DE19650915 (AEG HAUSGERAETE GMBH [DE]) [X] 1,10 * column 1, line 60 - column 2, line 38 * * column 3, line 17 - line 28; claims 1-3,5,6 * [A] 5,6; | [AD]DE19721976 (BOSCH SIEMENS HAUSGERAETE [DE]) [AD] 1,9* figure .; claim - *; | [A]DE10011692 (AWECO APPLIANCE SYS GMBH & CO [DE]) [A] 1-3,5,10 * column 3, line 38 - line 49 * * column 3, lines 56-66; figure .; claims 1,3,5,7,8 *; | [X]DE10260160 (BSH BOSCH SIEMENS HAUSGERAETE [DE]) [X] 1,7,8 * paragraphs [0007] - [0010] - [0014] , [0015]; claims 1,2,6,7 * | by applicant | DE19650915 | DE19721976 | DE10260160 |