EP1810170 - SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR CONCURRENT DISCOVERY AND SURVEY OF NETWORKED DEVICES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 25.11.2011 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.11.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 28.12.2011 [2011/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Guidance Software, INC. 215 N. Marengo Avenue 2nd Floor Pasadena CA 91101 / US | [2007/30] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MCCREIGHT, Shawn 525 S. Santa Anita Avenue Pasadena, CA 91107 / US | 02 /
WEBER, Dominik 3415 Dorchester Avenue El Sereno, CA 90032 / US | [2007/30] | Representative(s) | Kensett, John Hinton Saunders & Dolleymore LLP 9 Rickmansworth Road Watford WD18 0JU / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2007/30] | Kensett, John Hinton Saunders & Dolleymore, 9 Rickmansworth Road Watford Hertfordshire WD18 0JU / GB | Application number, filing date | 05797546.8 | 13.09.2005 | [2007/30] | WO2005US32611 | Priority number, date | US20040940092 | 14.09.2004 Original published format: US 940092 | [2007/30] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2006031836 | Date: | 23.03.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/12] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1810170 | Date: | 25.07.2007 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.03.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/30] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 14.09.2006 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.11.2010 | Classification | IPC: | G06F15/16, G06F21/00 | [2010/51] | CPC: |
H04L9/0822 (EP,US);
H04L63/102 (EP,US);
H04L9/3247 (EP,US);
H04L9/3273 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2007/30] | G06F15/16 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/30] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SYSTEM UND VERFAHREN FÜR GLEICHZEITIGE ENTDECKUNG UND BEFRAGUNG VON VERNETZTEN EINRICHTUNGEN | [2007/30] | English: | SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR CONCURRENT DISCOVERY AND SURVEY OF NETWORKED DEVICES | [2007/30] | French: | SYSTEME ET PROCEDE DE RECHERCHE ET D'EVALUATION SIMULTANEES DE DISPOSITIFS EN RESEAU | [2007/30] | Entry into regional phase | 30.03.2007 | National basic fee paid | 30.03.2007 | Search fee paid | 30.03.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 30.03.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 30.03.2007 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 30.03.2007 | Examination requested [2007/30] | 18.06.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2011/52] | 27.07.2011 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report not received in time [2011/52] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.07.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 06.08.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 05.08.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.2011 | 07   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US6408391 (HUFF JULIE LYNN [US], et al) [X] 1-17 * abstract * * column 7, line 18 - column 11, line 60 * * figure 3 *; | [X]US2003014669 (CACERES MAXIMILIANO GERARDO [AR], et al) [X] 1-17 * abstract * * paragraph [0024] - paragraph [0025] * * paragraph [0070] - paragraph [0071] * * paragraph [0103] - paragraph [0116] * * figures 7, 8, 16-18 *; | [A]US2004006588 (JESSEN JOHN H [US]) [A] 1-17 * abstract * * paragraph [0007] - paragraph [0011] * * paragraph [0018] - paragraph [0021] * * paragraph [0029] - paragraph [0037] ** figures 1,3 * | International search | [X]US5994794 (WEHRLEN DAVID J [US]); | [A]US6792545 (MCCREIGHT SHAWN [US], et al) |