EP1800390 - SWITCHED-MODE POWER SUPPLY REGULATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 20.08.2010 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.08.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 22.09.2010 [2010/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states STMICROELECTRONICS SA 29, Boulevard Romain Rolland 92120 Montrouge / FR | [2007/26] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BAILLY, Alain Chemin de la Bastidette F-13790 ROUSSET / FR | [2007/26] | Representative(s) | de Beaumont, Michel Cabinet Beaumont 1, rue Champollion 38000 Grenoble / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2007/26] | de Beaumont, Michel Cabinet Beaumont 1, rue Champollion 38000 Grenoble / FR | Application number, filing date | 05797771.2 | 04.08.2005 | [2007/26] | WO2005FR50646 | Priority number, date | FR20040051806 | 06.08.2004 Original published format: FR 0451806 | [2007/26] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2006021726 | Date: | 02.03.2006 | Language: | FR | [2006/09] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1800390 | Date: | 27.06.2007 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 02.03.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/26] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 04.10.2007 | Classification | IPC: | H02M3/335 | [2007/26] | CPC: |
H02M3/33523 (EP,US);
H02M1/32 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2007/46] |
Former [2007/26] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SCHALTNETZTEILREGULIERUNG | [2007/26] | English: | SWITCHED-MODE POWER SUPPLY REGULATION | [2007/26] | French: | REGULATION D'UNE ALIMENTATION A DECOUPAGE | [2007/26] | Entry into regional phase | 05.03.2007 | National basic fee paid | 05.03.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 05.03.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 05.03.2007 | Examination requested [2007/26] | 28.02.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2010/38] | 23.04.2010 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2010/38] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.08.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.08.2009 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]JP2003299351 ; | [A]EP0576702 (SIEMENS AG [DE]) [A] 1 * abstract *; | [A]US6282110 (CHEN CHUN-HSIUNG [TW]) [A] 1-10 * the whole document * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (20031205), vol. 2003, no. 12, & JP2003299351 A 20031017 (SANKEN ELECTRIC CO LTD) [A] 1 * abstract * |