EP1797705 - SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR STRUCTURING INFORMATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 20.08.2010 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.08.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 22.09.2010 [2010/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Talkflow Systems, LLC. The Governor Tyler, 1881 Grove Avenue Radford, VA 24141 / US | [2007/25] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KIRK, Randal J. P.O. Box 89, State Route 617 Belspring, VA 24058 / US | 02 /
KIRK, Julian, P. 7401 Christy Road Radford, VA 24141 / US | 03 /
LIEBERMAN, Eric 79 Dennison Road Essex, CT 06426 / US | [2007/25] | Representative(s) | Santarelli, Luc Santarelli 49, avenue des Champs Elysées 75008 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2007/25] | Santarelli, Luc 14 Avenue de la Grande Armée BP 237 75822 Paris cedex 17 / FR | Application number, filing date | 05797829.8 | 20.09.2005 | [2007/25] | WO2005US33501 | Priority number, date | US20040945428 | 21.09.2004 Original published format: US 945428 | [2007/25] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2006034204 | Date: | 30.03.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/13] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1797705 | Date: | 20.06.2007 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.03.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/25] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 16.04.2009 | Classification | IPC: | G06F17/20, G06F17/27, G06F17/28, G10L21/00 | [2009/22] | CPC: |
H04M3/51 (EP,US);
B07C3/00 (EP,US);
G06F16/3329 (EP,US);
G06F16/345 (EP,US);
G10L15/26 (EP,US);
H04M2203/2061 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2007/25] | H04M11/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/25] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SYSTEM UND VERFAHREN ZUR STRUKTURIERUNG VON INFORMATIONEN | [2007/25] | English: | SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR STRUCTURING INFORMATION | [2007/25] | French: | SYSTEME ET PROCEDE PERMETTANT DE STRUCTURER DES INFORMATIONS | [2007/25] | Entry into regional phase | 10.04.2007 | National basic fee paid | 10.04.2007 | Search fee paid | 10.04.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 10.04.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 10.04.2007 | Examination requested [2007/25] | 01.04.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2010/38] | 10.05.2010 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2010/38] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.04.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.09.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.2009 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]US5960080 (FAHLMAN SCOTT E [US], et al); | [X]US2002038213 (ADACHI AKIRA [JP]); | [Y]US2002128814 (BRANDON MAREK [CA], et al); | [X]US6463404 (APPLEBY STEPHEN CLIFFORD [GB]); | [X]US6523031 (GOESER SEBASTIAN [DE]); | [X]US6714939 (SALDANHA ALEXANDER [US], et al); | [X]US2004172235 (PINKHAM JESSIE E [US], et al); | [XP]US7158980 (SHEN CHENG-CHUNG [TW]) |