EP1804965 - USE OF HYDROPHOBIZED SILICA GEL AS A SELECTIVE SORBENT FOR REMOVING ORGANIC SILICON COMPOUNDS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2007/28] | SORPTION UNIT FOR REMOVING ORGANIC SILICON COMPOUNDS AND USE OF HYDROPHOIZED SILICA GEL AS A SELECTIVE SORBENT | ||
[2009/18] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 16.07.2010 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.09.2011 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 02.11.2011 [2011/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Fraunhofer-Gesellschaft zur Förderung der angewandten Forschung e.V. Hansastrasse 27c 80686 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/51] | For all designated states Fraunhofer-Gesellschaft zur Förderung der angewandten Forschung e.V. Hansastrasse 27c 80686 München / DE | ||
Former [2007/28] | For all designated states Fraunhofer-Gesellschaft zur Förderung der angewandten Forschung e.V. Hansastrasse 27c 80686 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
URBAN, Wolfgang Hochstrasse 100 45894 Gelsenkirchen / DE | 02 /
UNGER, Christoph Am Blaufuss 23 46485 Wesel / DE | [2007/28] | Representative(s) | Pfenning, Meinig & Partner mbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Theresienhöhe 11a 80339 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2007/28] | Pfenning, Meinig & Partner GbR Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Theresienhöhe 13 80339 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 05797972.6 | 21.10.2005 | [2007/28] | WO2005EP11361 | Priority number, date | DE20041051807 | 25.10.2004 Original published format: DE102004051807 | [2007/28] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2006045561 | Date: | 04.05.2006 | Language: | DE | [2006/18] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1804965 | Date: | 11.07.2007 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 04.05.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/28] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1804965 | Date: | 09.09.2009 | Language: | DE | [2009/37] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 04.05.2006 | Classification | IPC: | B01J20/10, B01D53/04, B01D53/12 | [2009/18] | CPC: |
B01J20/103 (EP);
B01D53/12 (EP);
B01D2253/106 (EP);
B01D2253/304 (EP);
B01D2253/308 (EP);
B01D2258/05 (EP);
B01D2259/40083 (EP);
C12M47/18 (EP);
Y02E50/30 (EP);
Y02P20/59 (EP)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2007/28] | B01J20/10 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/28] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERWENDUNG VON HYDROPHOBIERTEN KIESELGEL ALS SELEKTIVES SORBENS ZUR ENTFERNUNG ORGANISCHER SILIZIUMVERBINDUNGEN | [2009/18] | English: | USE OF HYDROPHOBIZED SILICA GEL AS A SELECTIVE SORBENT FOR REMOVING ORGANIC SILICON COMPOUNDS | [2009/18] | French: | UTILISATION DE GEL DE SILICE HYDROPHOBE COMME SORBANT SELECTIF POUR ELIMINER DES COMPOSÉS DE SILICIUM ORGANIQUES | [2009/18] |
Former [2007/28] | SORPTIONSEINHEIT ZUR ENTFERNUNG ORGANISCHER SILIZIUMVERBINDUNGEN SOWIE VERWENDUNG VON HYDROPHOBIERTEN KIESELGEL ALS SELEKTIVES SORBENS | ||
Former [2007/28] | SORPTION UNIT FOR REMOVING ORGANIC SILICON COMPOUNDS AND USE OF HYDROPHOIZED SILICA GEL AS A SELECTIVE SORBENT | ||
Former [2007/28] | UNITE DE SORPTION POUR ELIMINER DES COMPOSES SILICIUM ORGANIQUES ET UTILISATION DE GEL DE SILICE HYDROPHOBE COMME SORBANT SELECTIF | Entry into regional phase | 13.03.2007 | National basic fee paid | 13.03.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 13.03.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 26.04.2006 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 13.03.2007 | Examination requested [2007/28] | 21.06.2007 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 09.04.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.07.2009 | Fee for grant paid | 08.07.2009 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 10.06.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit [2010/33] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.10.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.10.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 09.09.2009 | CZ | 09.09.2009 | DK | 09.09.2009 | EE | 09.09.2009 | FI | 09.09.2009 | IE | 09.09.2009 | LT | 09.09.2009 | LV | 09.09.2009 | SE | 09.09.2009 | SI | 09.09.2009 | SK | 09.09.2009 | TR | 09.09.2009 | LU | 21.10.2009 | BE | 31.10.2009 | BG | 31.10.2009 | CH | 31.10.2009 | LI | 31.10.2009 | MC | 31.10.2009 | GR | 10.12.2009 | IS | 09.01.2010 | PT | 11.01.2010 | HU | 10.03.2010 | [2011/44] |
Former [2011/32] | CY | 09.09.2009 | |
CZ | 09.09.2009 | ||
DK | 09.09.2009 | ||
EE | 09.09.2009 | ||
FI | 09.09.2009 | ||
IE | 09.09.2009 | ||
LT | 09.09.2009 | ||
LV | 09.09.2009 | ||
SE | 09.09.2009 | ||
SI | 09.09.2009 | ||
SK | 09.09.2009 | ||
LU | 21.10.2009 | ||
BE | 31.10.2009 | ||
BG | 31.10.2009 | ||
CH | 31.10.2009 | ||
LI | 31.10.2009 | ||
MC | 31.10.2009 | ||
GR | 10.12.2009 | ||
IS | 09.01.2010 | ||
PT | 11.01.2010 | ||
HU | 10.03.2010 | ||
Former [2011/22] | CY | 09.09.2009 | |
CZ | 09.09.2009 | ||
DK | 09.09.2009 | ||
EE | 09.09.2009 | ||
FI | 09.09.2009 | ||
IE | 09.09.2009 | ||
LT | 09.09.2009 | ||
LV | 09.09.2009 | ||
SE | 09.09.2009 | ||
SI | 09.09.2009 | ||
SK | 09.09.2009 | ||
LU | 21.10.2009 | ||
BE | 31.10.2009 | ||
BG | 31.10.2009 | ||
CH | 31.10.2009 | ||
LI | 31.10.2009 | ||
MC | 31.10.2009 | ||
GR | 10.12.2009 | ||
IS | 09.01.2010 | ||
PT | 11.01.2010 | ||
Former [2011/16] | CY | 09.09.2009 | |
CZ | 09.09.2009 | ||
DK | 09.09.2009 | ||
EE | 09.09.2009 | ||
FI | 09.09.2009 | ||
IE | 09.09.2009 | ||
LT | 09.09.2009 | ||
LV | 09.09.2009 | ||
SE | 09.09.2009 | ||
SI | 09.09.2009 | ||
SK | 09.09.2009 | ||
BE | 31.10.2009 | ||
BG | 31.10.2009 | ||
CH | 31.10.2009 | ||
LI | 31.10.2009 | ||
MC | 31.10.2009 | ||
GR | 10.12.2009 | ||
IS | 09.01.2010 | ||
PT | 11.01.2010 | ||
Former [2011/02] | CY | 09.09.2009 | |
CZ | 09.09.2009 | ||
DK | 09.09.2009 | ||
EE | 09.09.2009 | ||
FI | 09.09.2009 | ||
IE | 09.09.2009 | ||
LT | 09.09.2009 | ||
LV | 09.09.2009 | ||
SE | 09.09.2009 | ||
SI | 09.09.2009 | ||
SK | 09.09.2009 | ||
BE | 31.10.2009 | ||
CH | 31.10.2009 | ||
LI | 31.10.2009 | ||
MC | 31.10.2009 | ||
GR | 10.12.2009 | ||
IS | 09.01.2010 | ||
PT | 11.01.2010 | ||
Former [2010/46] | CY | 09.09.2009 | |
CZ | 09.09.2009 | ||
DK | 09.09.2009 | ||
EE | 09.09.2009 | ||
FI | 09.09.2009 | ||
IE | 09.09.2009 | ||
LT | 09.09.2009 | ||
LV | 09.09.2009 | ||
SE | 09.09.2009 | ||
SI | 09.09.2009 | ||
SK | 09.09.2009 | ||
CH | 31.10.2009 | ||
LI | 31.10.2009 | ||
MC | 31.10.2009 | ||
GR | 10.12.2009 | ||
IS | 09.01.2010 | ||
PT | 11.01.2010 | ||
Former [2010/40] | CY | 09.09.2009 | |
CZ | 09.09.2009 | ||
DK | 09.09.2009 | ||
EE | 09.09.2009 | ||
FI | 09.09.2009 | ||
IE | 09.09.2009 | ||
LT | 09.09.2009 | ||
LV | 09.09.2009 | ||
SE | 09.09.2009 | ||
SI | 09.09.2009 | ||
SK | 09.09.2009 | ||
MC | 31.10.2009 | ||
IS | 09.01.2010 | ||
PT | 11.01.2010 | ||
Former [2010/25] | CY | 09.09.2009 | |
CZ | 09.09.2009 | ||
EE | 09.09.2009 | ||
FI | 09.09.2009 | ||
IE | 09.09.2009 | ||
LT | 09.09.2009 | ||
LV | 09.09.2009 | ||
SE | 09.09.2009 | ||
SI | 09.09.2009 | ||
SK | 09.09.2009 | ||
MC | 31.10.2009 | ||
IS | 09.01.2010 | ||
PT | 11.01.2010 | ||
Former [2010/24] | CY | 09.09.2009 | |
CZ | 09.09.2009 | ||
EE | 09.09.2009 | ||
FI | 09.09.2009 | ||
IE | 09.09.2009 | ||
LT | 09.09.2009 | ||
LV | 09.09.2009 | ||
SE | 09.09.2009 | ||
SI | 09.09.2009 | ||
SK | 09.09.2009 | ||
IS | 09.01.2010 | ||
PT | 11.01.2010 | ||
Former [2010/21] | CY | 09.09.2009 | |
EE | 09.09.2009 | ||
FI | 09.09.2009 | ||
IE | 09.09.2009 | ||
LT | 09.09.2009 | ||
LV | 09.09.2009 | ||
SE | 09.09.2009 | ||
SI | 09.09.2009 | ||
IS | 09.01.2010 | ||
PT | 11.01.2010 | ||
Former [2010/20] | CY | 09.09.2009 | |
EE | 09.09.2009 | ||
FI | 09.09.2009 | ||
IE | 09.09.2009 | ||
LT | 09.09.2009 | ||
LV | 09.09.2009 | ||
SE | 09.09.2009 | ||
SI | 09.09.2009 | ||
Former [2010/16] | CY | 09.09.2009 | |
FI | 09.09.2009 | ||
LT | 09.09.2009 | ||
LV | 09.09.2009 | ||
SE | 09.09.2009 | ||
SI | 09.09.2009 | ||
Former [2010/13] | FI | 09.09.2009 | |
LT | 09.09.2009 | ||
LV | 09.09.2009 | ||
SE | 09.09.2009 | ||
SI | 09.09.2009 | Cited in | International search | [A]JP2002060767 ; | [A]JPS60222144 ; | [X]EP0903171 (COSMO ENGINEERING CO LTD [JP], et al) [X] 1,3,5,7 * column 6, line 14 - line 55; claims 1,2 *; | [A]EP1316350 (FRAUNHOFER GES FORSCHUNG [DE], et al) [A] 1,2,5,7-10,14-16 * column 2, paragraph 6 *; | [A]DE10224349 (DOCZYCK WOLFGANG [DE]) [A] 1,2,5,7-10,14-16 * page 2, paragraph 4 *; | [DA] - SCHWEIGKOFLER M., "Removal of siloxanes in biogases", JOURNAL OF HAZARDOUS MATERIALS, (20010530), vol. 83, no. 3, pages 183 - 196, XP002362422 [DA] 1,2,5,7-10,14-16 * page 188 - page 190 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0304-3894(00)00318-6 | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (20020604), vol. 2002, no. 06, & JP2002060767 A 20020226 (NKK CORP) [A] 1,8 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19860408), vol. 010, no. 090, Database accession no. (C - 337), & JP60222144 A 19851106 (MATSUSHITA DENKO KK) [A] 1,8 * abstract * |