EP1789855 - SYSTEM FOR MAINTAINING HYDROGEN PURITY IN ELECTRICAL GENERATORS AND METHOD THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 28.11.2014 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.07.2016 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 17.08.2016 [2016/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Proton Energy Systems, Inc. 10, Technology Drive Wallingford, CT 06492 / US | [2007/22] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SPERANZA, A. John 26 Penn Drive West Hartford, CT 06119 / US | 02 /
GUDINO, Luisa 206 Creekbend Drive Downingtown, PA 19335 / US | [2013/21] |
Former [2007/22] | 01 /
SPERANZA, A. John 26 Penn Drive West Hartford, Connecticut 06119 / US | ||
02 /
GUDINO, Luisa 206 Creekbend Drive Downingtown, Pennsylvania 19335 / US | Representative(s) | Miller, James Lionel Woolverton, et al Kilburn & Strode LLP Lacon London 84 Theobalds Road London WC1X 8NL / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2014/04] | Miller, James Lionel Woolverton, et al Kilburn & Strode LLP 20 Red Lion Street London WC1R 4PJ / GB | ||
Former [2007/22] | Miller, James Lionel Woolverton, et al Kilburn & Strode, 20 Red Lion Street London WC1R 4PJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 05798194.6 | 16.09.2005 | [2007/22] | WO2005US33361 | Priority number, date | US20040711395 | 16.09.2004 Original published format: US 711395 | [2007/22] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2006034127 | Date: | 30.03.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/13] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1789855 | Date: | 30.05.2007 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.03.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/22] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1789855 | Date: | 22.01.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/04] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 07.12.2006 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.03.2010 | Classification | IPC: | G05B1/00, G05D21/02, // H02K9/24, H02K9/26 | [2013/21] | CPC: |
G05D21/02 (EP,US);
Y10T436/12 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2010/13] | G05B1/00, // H02K9/24, H02K9/26 | ||
Former IPC [2007/22] | G05B1/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/22] | Title | German: | SYSTEM ZUR BEWAHRUNG DER WASSERSTOFFREINHEIT BEI ELEKTRISCHEN GENERATOREN UND VERFAHREN DAFÜR | [2007/22] | English: | SYSTEM FOR MAINTAINING HYDROGEN PURITY IN ELECTRICAL GENERATORS AND METHOD THEREOF | [2007/22] | French: | SYSTEME SERVANT A MAINTENIR LA PURETE DE L'HYDROGENE DANS DES GENERATEURS ELECTRIQUES ET PROCEDES ASSOCIES | [2007/22] | Entry into regional phase | 06.02.2007 | National basic fee paid | 06.02.2007 | Search fee paid | 06.02.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 06.02.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 06.02.2007 | Examination requested [2007/22] | 08.06.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 12.11.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.10.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.02.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.04.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.07.2013 | Fee for grant paid | 23.07.2013 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 08.06.2010 | Opposition(s) | 23.10.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit [2015/01] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.07.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.09.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 11.09.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 22.12.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 28.12.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 27.11.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 12.12.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.2010 | 06   M06   Fee paid on   22.12.2010 | 30.09.2011 | 07   M06   Fee paid on   28.12.2011 | 30.09.2012 | 08   M06   Fee paid on   27.11.2012 | 30.09.2013 | 09   M06   Fee paid on   12.12.2013 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 16.09.2005 | AT | 22.01.2014 | BE | 22.01.2014 | BG | 22.01.2014 | CY | 22.01.2014 | CZ | 22.01.2014 | DK | 22.01.2014 | EE | 22.01.2014 | ES | 22.01.2014 | FI | 22.01.2014 | IT | 22.01.2014 | LT | 22.01.2014 | LV | 22.01.2014 | MC | 22.01.2014 | NL | 22.01.2014 | PL | 22.01.2014 | RO | 22.01.2014 | SE | 22.01.2014 | SI | 22.01.2014 | SK | 22.01.2014 | TR | 22.01.2014 | GR | 23.04.2014 | IS | 22.05.2014 | PT | 22.05.2014 | GB | 16.09.2014 | IE | 16.09.2014 | LU | 16.09.2014 | CH | 30.09.2014 | FR | 30.09.2014 | LI | 30.09.2014 | [2016/33] |
Former [2016/32] | HU | 16.09.2005 | |
AT | 22.01.2014 | ||
BE | 22.01.2014 | ||
BG | 22.01.2014 | ||
CY | 22.01.2014 | ||
CZ | 22.01.2014 | ||
DK | 22.01.2014 | ||
EE | 22.01.2014 | ||
ES | 22.01.2014 | ||
FI | 22.01.2014 | ||
IT | 22.01.2014 | ||
LT | 22.01.2014 | ||
LV | 22.01.2014 | ||
MC | 22.01.2014 | ||
NL | 22.01.2014 | ||
PL | 22.01.2014 | ||
RO | 22.01.2014 | ||
SE | 22.01.2014 | ||
SI | 22.01.2014 | ||
SK | 22.01.2014 | ||
GR | 23.04.2014 | ||
IS | 22.05.2014 | ||
PT | 22.05.2014 | ||
GB | 16.09.2014 | ||
IE | 16.09.2014 | ||
LU | 16.09.2014 | ||
CH | 30.09.2014 | ||
FR | 30.09.2014 | ||
LI | 30.09.2014 | ||
Former [2016/29] | AT | 22.01.2014 | |
BE | 22.01.2014 | ||
BG | 22.01.2014 | ||
CY | 22.01.2014 | ||
CZ | 22.01.2014 | ||
DK | 22.01.2014 | ||
EE | 22.01.2014 | ||
ES | 22.01.2014 | ||
FI | 22.01.2014 | ||
IT | 22.01.2014 | ||
LT | 22.01.2014 | ||
LV | 22.01.2014 | ||
MC | 22.01.2014 | ||
NL | 22.01.2014 | ||
PL | 22.01.2014 | ||
RO | 22.01.2014 | ||
SE | 22.01.2014 | ||
SI | 22.01.2014 | ||
SK | 22.01.2014 | ||
GR | 23.04.2014 | ||
IS | 22.05.2014 | ||
PT | 22.05.2014 | ||
GB | 16.09.2014 | ||
IE | 16.09.2014 | ||
LU | 16.09.2014 | ||
CH | 30.09.2014 | ||
FR | 30.09.2014 | ||
LI | 30.09.2014 | ||
Former [2016/28] | AT | 22.01.2014 | |
BE | 22.01.2014 | ||
BG | 22.01.2014 | ||
CY | 22.01.2014 | ||
CZ | 22.01.2014 | ||
DK | 22.01.2014 | ||
EE | 22.01.2014 | ||
ES | 22.01.2014 | ||
FI | 22.01.2014 | ||
LT | 22.01.2014 | ||
LV | 22.01.2014 | ||
MC | 22.01.2014 | ||
NL | 22.01.2014 | ||
PL | 22.01.2014 | ||
RO | 22.01.2014 | ||
SE | 22.01.2014 | ||
SI | 22.01.2014 | ||
SK | 22.01.2014 | ||
GR | 23.04.2014 | ||
IS | 22.05.2014 | ||
PT | 22.05.2014 | ||
GB | 16.09.2014 | ||
IE | 16.09.2014 | ||
LU | 16.09.2014 | ||
CH | 30.09.2014 | ||
FR | 30.09.2014 | ||
LI | 30.09.2014 | ||
Former [2016/25] | AT | 22.01.2014 | |
BE | 22.01.2014 | ||
BG | 22.01.2014 | ||
CY | 22.01.2014 | ||
CZ | 22.01.2014 | ||
DK | 22.01.2014 | ||
EE | 22.01.2014 | ||
ES | 22.01.2014 | ||
FI | 22.01.2014 | ||
LT | 22.01.2014 | ||
LV | 22.01.2014 | ||
MC | 22.01.2014 | ||
NL | 22.01.2014 | ||
PL | 22.01.2014 | ||
RO | 22.01.2014 | ||
SE | 22.01.2014 | ||
SI | 22.01.2014 | ||
SK | 22.01.2014 | ||
IS | 22.05.2014 | ||
PT | 22.05.2014 | ||
GB | 16.09.2014 | ||
IE | 16.09.2014 | ||
LU | 16.09.2014 | ||
CH | 30.09.2014 | ||
FR | 30.09.2014 | ||
LI | 30.09.2014 | ||
Former [2015/38] | AT | 22.01.2014 | |
BE | 22.01.2014 | ||
CY | 22.01.2014 | ||
CZ | 22.01.2014 | ||
DK | 22.01.2014 | ||
EE | 22.01.2014 | ||
ES | 22.01.2014 | ||
FI | 22.01.2014 | ||
LT | 22.01.2014 | ||
LV | 22.01.2014 | ||
MC | 22.01.2014 | ||
NL | 22.01.2014 | ||
PL | 22.01.2014 | ||
RO | 22.01.2014 | ||
SE | 22.01.2014 | ||
SI | 22.01.2014 | ||
SK | 22.01.2014 | ||
IS | 22.05.2014 | ||
PT | 22.05.2014 | ||
GB | 16.09.2014 | ||
IE | 16.09.2014 | ||
LU | 16.09.2014 | ||
CH | 30.09.2014 | ||
FR | 30.09.2014 | ||
LI | 30.09.2014 | ||
Former [2015/37] | AT | 22.01.2014 | |
BE | 22.01.2014 | ||
CY | 22.01.2014 | ||
CZ | 22.01.2014 | ||
DK | 22.01.2014 | ||
EE | 22.01.2014 | ||
ES | 22.01.2014 | ||
FI | 22.01.2014 | ||
LT | 22.01.2014 | ||
LV | 22.01.2014 | ||
MC | 22.01.2014 | ||
NL | 22.01.2014 | ||
PL | 22.01.2014 | ||
RO | 22.01.2014 | ||
SE | 22.01.2014 | ||
SI | 22.01.2014 | ||
SK | 22.01.2014 | ||
IS | 22.05.2014 | ||
PT | 22.05.2014 | ||
GB | 16.09.2014 | ||
IE | 16.09.2014 | ||
LU | 16.09.2014 | ||
CH | 30.09.2014 | ||
LI | 30.09.2014 | ||
Former [2015/36] | AT | 22.01.2014 | |
BE | 22.01.2014 | ||
CY | 22.01.2014 | ||
CZ | 22.01.2014 | ||
DK | 22.01.2014 | ||
EE | 22.01.2014 | ||
ES | 22.01.2014 | ||
FI | 22.01.2014 | ||
LT | 22.01.2014 | ||
LV | 22.01.2014 | ||
MC | 22.01.2014 | ||
NL | 22.01.2014 | ||
PL | 22.01.2014 | ||
RO | 22.01.2014 | ||
SE | 22.01.2014 | ||
SI | 22.01.2014 | ||
SK | 22.01.2014 | ||
IS | 22.05.2014 | ||
PT | 22.05.2014 | ||
GB | 16.09.2014 | ||
LU | 16.09.2014 | ||
CH | 30.09.2014 | ||
LI | 30.09.2014 | ||
Former [2015/33] | AT | 22.01.2014 | |
BE | 22.01.2014 | ||
CY | 22.01.2014 | ||
CZ | 22.01.2014 | ||
DK | 22.01.2014 | ||
EE | 22.01.2014 | ||
ES | 22.01.2014 | ||
FI | 22.01.2014 | ||
LT | 22.01.2014 | ||
LV | 22.01.2014 | ||
MC | 22.01.2014 | ||
NL | 22.01.2014 | ||
PL | 22.01.2014 | ||
RO | 22.01.2014 | ||
SE | 22.01.2014 | ||
SI | 22.01.2014 | ||
SK | 22.01.2014 | ||
IS | 22.05.2014 | ||
PT | 22.05.2014 | ||
LU | 16.09.2014 | ||
CH | 30.09.2014 | ||
LI | 30.09.2014 | ||
Former [2015/24] | AT | 22.01.2014 | |
BE | 22.01.2014 | ||
CY | 22.01.2014 | ||
CZ | 22.01.2014 | ||
DK | 22.01.2014 | ||
EE | 22.01.2014 | ||
ES | 22.01.2014 | ||
FI | 22.01.2014 | ||
LT | 22.01.2014 | ||
LV | 22.01.2014 | ||
MC | 22.01.2014 | ||
NL | 22.01.2014 | ||
PL | 22.01.2014 | ||
RO | 22.01.2014 | ||
SE | 22.01.2014 | ||
SI | 22.01.2014 | ||
SK | 22.01.2014 | ||
IS | 22.05.2014 | ||
PT | 22.05.2014 | ||
LU | 16.09.2014 | ||
Former [2015/22] | AT | 22.01.2014 | |
BE | 22.01.2014 | ||
CY | 22.01.2014 | ||
CZ | 22.01.2014 | ||
DK | 22.01.2014 | ||
EE | 22.01.2014 | ||
ES | 22.01.2014 | ||
FI | 22.01.2014 | ||
LT | 22.01.2014 | ||
LV | 22.01.2014 | ||
MC | 22.01.2014 | ||
NL | 22.01.2014 | ||
PL | 22.01.2014 | ||
RO | 22.01.2014 | ||
SE | 22.01.2014 | ||
SK | 22.01.2014 | ||
IS | 22.05.2014 | ||
PT | 22.05.2014 | ||
LU | 16.09.2014 | ||
Former [2015/20] | AT | 22.01.2014 | |
BE | 22.01.2014 | ||
CY | 22.01.2014 | ||
CZ | 22.01.2014 | ||
DK | 22.01.2014 | ||
EE | 22.01.2014 | ||
ES | 22.01.2014 | ||
FI | 22.01.2014 | ||
LT | 22.01.2014 | ||
LV | 22.01.2014 | ||
MC | 22.01.2014 | ||
NL | 22.01.2014 | ||
PL | 22.01.2014 | ||
RO | 22.01.2014 | ||
SE | 22.01.2014 | ||
SK | 22.01.2014 | ||
IS | 22.05.2014 | ||
PT | 22.05.2014 | ||
Former [2014/50] | AT | 22.01.2014 | |
BE | 22.01.2014 | ||
CY | 22.01.2014 | ||
CZ | 22.01.2014 | ||
DK | 22.01.2014 | ||
EE | 22.01.2014 | ||
ES | 22.01.2014 | ||
FI | 22.01.2014 | ||
LT | 22.01.2014 | ||
LV | 22.01.2014 | ||
NL | 22.01.2014 | ||
PL | 22.01.2014 | ||
RO | 22.01.2014 | ||
SE | 22.01.2014 | ||
SK | 22.01.2014 | ||
IS | 22.05.2014 | ||
PT | 22.05.2014 | ||
Former [2014/49] | AT | 22.01.2014 | |
BE | 22.01.2014 | ||
CY | 22.01.2014 | ||
CZ | 22.01.2014 | ||
DK | 22.01.2014 | ||
EE | 22.01.2014 | ||
ES | 22.01.2014 | ||
FI | 22.01.2014 | ||
LT | 22.01.2014 | ||
LV | 22.01.2014 | ||
NL | 22.01.2014 | ||
RO | 22.01.2014 | ||
SE | 22.01.2014 | ||
IS | 22.05.2014 | ||
PT | 22.05.2014 | ||
Former [2014/48] | AT | 22.01.2014 | |
BE | 22.01.2014 | ||
CY | 22.01.2014 | ||
CZ | 22.01.2014 | ||
DK | 22.01.2014 | ||
EE | 22.01.2014 | ||
ES | 22.01.2014 | ||
FI | 22.01.2014 | ||
LT | 22.01.2014 | ||
LV | 22.01.2014 | ||
NL | 22.01.2014 | ||
SE | 22.01.2014 | ||
IS | 22.05.2014 | ||
PT | 22.05.2014 | ||
Former [2014/41] | AT | 22.01.2014 | |
BE | 22.01.2014 | ||
CY | 22.01.2014 | ||
ES | 22.01.2014 | ||
FI | 22.01.2014 | ||
LT | 22.01.2014 | ||
LV | 22.01.2014 | ||
NL | 22.01.2014 | ||
SE | 22.01.2014 | ||
IS | 22.05.2014 | ||
PT | 22.05.2014 | ||
Former [2014/39] | AT | 22.01.2014 | |
CY | 22.01.2014 | ||
ES | 22.01.2014 | ||
FI | 22.01.2014 | ||
LT | 22.01.2014 | ||
NL | 22.01.2014 | ||
SE | 22.01.2014 | ||
IS | 22.05.2014 | ||
PT | 22.05.2014 | ||
Former [2014/37] | AT | 22.01.2014 | |
CY | 22.01.2014 | ||
ES | 22.01.2014 | ||
FI | 22.01.2014 | ||
LT | 22.01.2014 | ||
SE | 22.01.2014 | ||
IS | 22.05.2014 | ||
PT | 22.05.2014 | ||
Former [2014/36] | LT | 22.01.2014 | |
IS | 22.05.2014 | Documents cited: | Search | [XAI]GB270315 (VICKERS ELECTRICAL CO LTD) [X] 1-3 * page 1, lines 13-17 * * page 1, lines 45-48 * * page 1, lines 57-62 * * page 1, lines 75-80 * * page 2, lines 35-63 * * figure 1 * [A] 6 [I] 4-5; | [I]JPS61231849 (MITSUBISHI HEAVY IND LTD) [I] 1-5* abstract * | International search | [X]US2003090164 (BROSNIHAN RONALD F [US], et al); | [Y]US5510201 (WERTH JOHN [US]) | by applicant | GB270315 | JPS61231849 | US2003090164 |