15.07.2016 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 17.08.2016 [2016/33] |
08.07.2016 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 10.08.2016 [2016/32] |
17.06.2016 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 20.07.2016 [2016/29] |
10.06.2016 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 13.07.2016 [2016/28] |
20.05.2016 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 22.06.2016 [2016/25] |
14.08.2015 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 16.09.2015 [2015/38] |
07.08.2015 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 09.09.2015 [2015/37] |
31.07.2015 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 02.09.2015 [2015/36] |
10.07.2015 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 12.08.2015 [2015/33] |
08.05.2015 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 10.06.2015 [2015/24] |
24.04.2015 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 27.05.2015 [2015/22] |
10.04.2015 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 13.05.2015 [2015/20] |
28.11.2014 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 31.12.2014 [2015/01] |
07.11.2014 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 10.12.2014 [2014/50] |
31.10.2014 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 03.12.2014 [2014/49] |
24.10.2014 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 26.11.2014 [2014/48] |
05.09.2014 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 08.10.2014 [2014/41] |
22.08.2014 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 24.09.2014 [2014/39] |
08.08.2014 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 10.09.2014 [2014/37] |
01.08.2014 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 03.09.2014 [2014/36] |
20.12.2013 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 22.01.2014 [2014/04] |
17.12.2013 |
New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: payment of fee |
|
17.12.2013 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
29.10.2013 |
New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: despatch of communication + time limit |
|
29.07.2013 |
New entry: Payment of fee for grant |
|
29.07.2013 |
New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing |
|
26.04.2013 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
19.04.2013 |
Change - inventor |
published on 22.05.2013 [2013/21] |
19.04.2013 |
Change - classification |
published on 22.05.2013 [2013/21] |
19.04.2013 |
Change - classification |
published on 22.05.2013 [2013/21] |
15.02.2013 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
30.11.2012 |
New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: payment of fee |
|
30.11.2012 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
29.10.2012 |
New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: despatch of communication + time limit |
|
15.10.2012 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
03.01.2012 |
New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: payment of fee |
|
03.01.2012 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
01.11.2011 |
New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: despatch of communication + time limit |
|
03.01.2011 |
New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: payment of fee |
|
03.01.2011 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
15.11.2010 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
29.10.2010 |
New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: despatch of communication + time limit |
|
08.10.2010 |
Change: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
04.06.2010 |
First examination report |
|
03.06.2010 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
26.02.2010 |
Supplementary search report |
published on 31.03.2010 [2010/13] |
22.09.2009 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
02.10.2008 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
23.11.2007 |
Change - extension states |
published on 26.12.2007 [2007/52] |
24.07.2007 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
27.04.2007 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 30.05.2007 [2007/22] |
27.04.2007 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 30.05.2007 [2007/22] |
28.02.2007 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
14.02.2007 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
07.02.2007 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
08.12.2006 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
15.09.2006 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
08.08.2006 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
20.12.2005 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|