Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2006057984 | Global Dossier | 08.02.2007 | A3 | WO2006057984 | 01.06.2006 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US99477204 | 22.11.2004 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US7879613 | Global Dossier | 01.02.2011 | B2 | US2009211920 | 27.08.2009 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US71139504 | 16.09.2004 | US46310509 | 08.05.2009 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US7552622 | Global Dossier | 30.06.2009 | B2 | US2008148818 | 26.06.2008 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US76488507 | 19.06.2007 | US71139504 | 16.09.2004 | US99477204 | 22.11.2004 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US7888124 | Global Dossier | 15.02.2011 | B2 | US2007244601 | 18.10.2007 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US76488207 | 19.06.2007 | US71139504 | 16.09.2004 | US99477204 | 22.11.2004 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2006057727 | Global Dossier | 16.03.2006 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US71139504 | 16.09.2004 | US99477204 | 22.11.2004 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2008514180 | Global Dossier | 01.05.2008 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2005US33361 | 16.09.2005 | US71139504 | 16.09.2004 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1789855 | Global Dossier | 22.01.2014 | B1 | EP1789855 | 31.03.2010 | A4 | EP1789855 | 30.05.2007 | A2 | Priority number | Date | WO2005US33361 | 16.09.2005 | US71139504 | 16.09.2004 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2574622 | 30.03.2006 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2005US33361 | 16.09.2005 | US71139504 | 16.09.2004 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN101006345B | 01.02.2012 | B | CN101006345 | 25.07.2007 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2005US33361 | 16.09.2005 | US71139504 | 16.09.2004 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2006034127 | Global Dossier | 07.12.2006 | A3 | WO2006034127 | 30.03.2006 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US71139504 | 16.09.2004 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US7550113 | Global Dossier | 23.06.2009 | B2 | US2006057034 | 16.03.2006 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US71139504 | 16.09.2004 |