15.10.2021 |
Patent maintained (B2 publication) |
published on 17.11.2021 [2021/46] |
09.10.2021 |
New entry: Fee for printing new specification paid |
|
11.08.2021 |
Change - representative |
|
30.06.2021 |
New entry: Despatch of communication that the patent will be maintained as amended |
|
29.06.2021 |
New entry: Legal effect of interlocutory decision |
|
19.04.2021 |
New entry: Decision (+date) in appeal procedure |
|
22.06.2020 |
Change: Date of oral proceedings |
|
22.06.2020 |
Deletion: Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings |
|
25.07.2018 |
New entry: Date of receipt of statement of grounds of an appeal |
|
24.07.2018 |
New entry: Date of receipt of statement of grounds of an appeal |
|
23.05.2018 |
New entry: Appeal number |
|
23.05.2018 |
New entry: Date of receipt of notice of appeal |
|
18.05.2018 |
Change: Appeal number |
|
15.05.2018 |
New entry: Appeal number |
|
15.05.2018 |
New entry: Date of receipt of notice of appeal |
|
14.03.2018 |
New entry: Despatch of interlocutory decision |
|
13.03.2018 |
New entry: Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings |
|
24.11.2017 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 27.12.2017 [2017/52] |
10.11.2017 |
Change - representative |
|
08.09.2017 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 11.10.2017 [2017/41] |
01.09.2017 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 04.10.2017 [2017/40] |
18.08.2017 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 20.09.2017 [2017/38] |
28.07.2017 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 30.08.2017 [2017/35] |
07.12.2016 |
New entry: Date of oral proceedings |
|
16.09.2016 |
New entry: Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition |
|
05.08.2016 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 07.09.2016 [2016/36] |
15.07.2016 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 17.08.2016 [2016/33] |
13.05.2016 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 15.06.2016 [2016/24] |
06.05.2016 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 08.06.2016 [2016/23] |
22.04.2016 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 25.05.2016 [2016/21] |
20.04.2016 |
Change: Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations + time limit |
|
04.03.2016 |
Change - representative |
|
01.02.2016 |
New entry: Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations + time limit |
|
25.12.2015 |
Opposition filed |
published on 27.01.2016 [2016/04] |
13.11.2015 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 16.12.2015 [2015/51] |
06.11.2015 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 09.12.2015 [2015/50] |
03.11.2015 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 02.12.2015 [2015/49] |
04.09.2015 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 07.10.2015 [2015/41] |
21.08.2015 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 23.09.2015 [2015/39] |
07.08.2015 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 09.09.2015 [2015/37] |
31.07.2015 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 02.09.2015 [2015/36] |
24.07.2015 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 26.08.2015 [2015/35] |
27.02.2015 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 25.03.2015 [2015/13] |
13.02.2015 |
New entry: Payment of fee for grant |
|
13.02.2015 |
New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing |
|
12.02.2015 |
New entry: Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) |
|
25.11.2014 |
Change - representative |
|
30.10.2014 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
07.10.2014 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
02.10.2013 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
08.10.2012 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
20.07.2012 |
Change - representative |
published on 22.08.2012 [2012/34] |
06.10.2011 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
07.10.2010 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
06.10.2009 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
11.04.2008 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
01.02.2008 |
Change - applicant |
published on 05.03.2008 [2008/10] |
07.12.2007 |
Change - extension states |
published on 09.01.2008 [2008/02] |
10.10.2007 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
25.05.2007 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 27.06.2007 [2007/26] |
25.05.2007 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 27.06.2007 [2007/26] |
17.05.2007 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
15.05.2007 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
05.01.2007 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
10.11.2006 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
27.09.2006 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
22.08.2006 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
20.12.2005 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|