Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US7893124 | Global Dossier | 22.02.2011 | B2 | US2007232712 | 04.10.2007 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE102004048728 | 05.10.2004 | WO2005EP10491 | 28.09.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR101238100B | Global Dossier | 04.03.2013 | B1 | KR20070060150 | 12.06.2007 | A | Priority number | Date | DE102004048728 | 05.10.2004 | WO2005EP10491 | 28.09.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP4907541B | Global Dossier | 28.03.2012 | B2 | JP2008516022 | 15.05.2008 | A | Priority number | Date | DE102004048728 | 05.10.2004 | WO2005EP10491 | 28.09.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1799736 | Global Dossier | 17.11.2021 | B2 | EP1799736 | 25.03.2015 | B1 | EP1799736 | 27.06.2007 | A2 | Priority number | Date | DE102004048728 | 05.10.2004 | WO2005EP10491 | 28.09.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | BRPI0516462 | 02.09.2008 | A | Priority number | Date | DE102004048728 | 05.10.2004 | WO2005EP10491 | 28.09.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN101035826B | 09.06.2010 | B | CN101035826 | 12.09.2007 | A | Priority number | Date | DE102004048728 | 05.10.2004 | WO2005EP10491 | 28.09.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | DK1799736T | 29.06.2015 | T3 | Priority number | Date | DE102004048728 | 05.10.2004 | WO2005EP10491 | 28.09.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | ES2540280T | 19.04.2022 | T5 | ES2540280T | 09.07.2015 | T3 | Priority number | Date | DE102004048728 | 05.10.2004 | WO2005EP10491 | 28.09.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | MX2007003035 | 16.05.2007 | A | Priority number | Date | DE102004048728 | 05.10.2004 | WO2005EP10491 | 28.09.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | PL1799736T | 14.03.2022 | T5 | PL1799736T | 31.08.2015 | T3 | Priority number | Date | DE102004048728 | 05.10.2004 | EP05798205 | 28.09.2005 | WO2005EP10491 | 28.09.2005 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2006037540 | Global Dossier | 09.11.2006 | A3 | WO2006037540 | 13.04.2006 | A2 | Priority number | Date | DE102004048728 | 05.10.2004 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE102004048728 | 06.04.2006 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE102004048728 | 05.10.2004 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | PT1799736E | 13.05.2015 | E | Priority number | Date | DE102004048728 | 05.10.2004 |