EP1799736 - METHOD FOR PRODUCING RIGID POLYURETHANE FOAMS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent maintained as amended Status updated on 15.10.2021 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.10.2021 | Patent maintained (B2 publication) | published on 17.11.2021 [2021/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BASF SE Carl-Bosch-Strasse 38 67056 Ludwigshafen am Rhein / DE | [2021/46] |
Former [2015/13] | For all designated states BASF SE 67056 Ludwigshafen / DE | ||
Former [2008/10] | For all designated states BASF SE 67056 Ludwigshafen / DE | ||
Former [2007/26] | For all designated states BASF AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT 67056 Ludwigshafen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
EMGE, Andreas Hauptstr.156 49448 Lemförde / DE | 02 /
SEIFERT, Holger Käthe-Kollwitz-Str. 15 49163 Bohmte / DE | 03 /
DINSCH, Stefan Pössnitzstr. 12 01993 Schipkau / DE | 04 /
KLASSEN, Johann Am Birkenhain 13 32351 Stemwede-Oppendorf / DE | 05 /
STELLING, Christian Eichenkamp 10 49205 Gaste / DE | [2007/26] | Representative(s) | BASF IP Association BASF SE GBI-C006 67056 Ludwigshafen / DE | [2021/46] |
Former [2015/13] | (deleted) | ||
Former [2012/34] | Jacobi, Markus Alexander Isenbruck Bösl Hörschler LLP Patentanwälte Eastsite One Seckenheimer Landstraße 4 68163 Mannheim / DE | Application number, filing date | 05798205.0 | 28.09.2005 | [2007/26] | WO2005EP10491 | Priority number, date | DE20041048728 | 05.10.2004 Original published format: DE102004048728 | [2007/26] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2006037540 | Date: | 13.04.2006 | Language: | DE | [2006/15] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1799736 | Date: | 27.06.2007 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 13.04.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/26] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1799736 | Date: | 25.03.2015 | Language: | DE | [2015/13] | Type: | B2 New European patent specification | No.: | EP1799736 | Date: | 17.11.2021 | Language: | DE | [2021/46] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 09.11.2006 | Classification | IPC: | C08G18/48, C08G18/76, C08J9/04 | [2007/26] | CPC: |
C08G18/482 (EP,US);
C08G18/76 (KR);
C08G18/4883 (EP,US);
C08G18/5027 (EP,US);
C08G18/7664 (EP,US);
C08G18/82 (KR);
C08J9/04 (KR);
C08J9/22 (KR);
C08G2110/0025 (EP,US);
C08G2110/005 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2021/46] |
Former [2007/26] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON POLYURETHAN-HARTSCHAUMSTOFFEN | [2007/26] | English: | METHOD FOR PRODUCING RIGID POLYURETHANE FOAMS | [2007/26] | French: | PROCEDE DE PRODUCTION DE MOUSSES DE POLYURETHANNE RIGIDES | [2007/26] | Entry into regional phase | 07.05.2007 | National basic fee paid | 09.05.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 09.05.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 17.10.2006 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 09.05.2007 | Examination requested [2007/26] | 30.10.2014 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.02.2015 | Fee for grant paid | 10.02.2015 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 10.02.2015 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 30.10.2014 | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
23.12.2015
ADMISSIBLE Covestro Deutschland AG Kaiser-Wilhelm-Allee 60 51373 Leverkussen / DE Opponent's representative Levpat c/o Covestro AG Gebäude 4825 51365 Leverkusen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2016/04] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
23.12.2015
ADMISSIBLE Covestro Deutschland AG Kaiser-Wilhelm-Allee 60 51373 Leverkussen / DE Opponent's representative Levpat c/o Covestro AG Alfred-Nobel-Straße 10 40789 Monheim am Rhein / DE | 02.02.2016 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 02.08.2016 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 17.01.2018 | Date of oral proceedings | 14.03.2018 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 15.03.2018 | Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition | 16.04.2021 | Legal effect of interlocutory decision in opposition | 01.07.2021 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be maintained as amended | 07.10.2021 | Fee for printing new specification paid | Appeal following opposition | 23.05.2018 | Appeal received No. T1253/18 | 25.07.2018 | Statement of grounds filed | 16.04.2021 | Result of appeal procedure: appeal of the proprietor was rejected | 25.05.2021 | Despatch of the decision of the Board of Appeal | 14.05.2018 | Appeal received No. T1253/18 | 24.07.2018 | Statement of grounds filed | 16.04.2021 | Result of appeal procedure: appeal of the proprietor was rejected | 25.05.2021 | Despatch of the decision of the Board of Appeal | 16.04.2021 | Date of oral proceedings | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 01.10.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.09.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 30.09.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 01.10.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 30.09.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 30.09.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 25.03.2015 | EE | 25.03.2015 | FI | 25.03.2015 | LT | 25.03.2015 | LV | 25.03.2015 | MC | 25.03.2015 | NL | 25.03.2015 | SE | 25.03.2015 | SI | 25.03.2015 | SK | 25.03.2015 | GR | 26.06.2015 | IS | 25.07.2015 | IE | 28.09.2015 | LU | 28.09.2015 | BE | 30.09.2015 | CH | 30.09.2015 | FR | 30.09.2015 | LI | 30.09.2015 | CZ | 28.09.2016 | DK | 30.09.2016 | PT | 28.03.2017 | [2017/52] |
Former [2017/35] | CY | 25.03.2015 | |
EE | 25.03.2015 | ||
FI | 25.03.2015 | ||
LT | 25.03.2015 | ||
LV | 25.03.2015 | ||
MC | 25.03.2015 | ||
NL | 25.03.2015 | ||
SE | 25.03.2015 | ||
SI | 25.03.2015 | ||
SK | 25.03.2015 | ||
GR | 26.06.2015 | ||
IS | 25.07.2015 | ||
IE | 28.09.2015 | ||
LU | 28.09.2015 | ||
BE | 30.09.2015 | ||
CH | 30.09.2015 | ||
FR | 30.09.2015 | ||
LI | 30.09.2015 | ||
CZ | 28.09.2016 | ||
PT | 28.03.2017 | ||
Former [2016/36] | EE | 25.03.2015 | |
FI | 25.03.2015 | ||
LT | 25.03.2015 | ||
LV | 25.03.2015 | ||
MC | 25.03.2015 | ||
NL | 25.03.2015 | ||
SE | 25.03.2015 | ||
SI | 25.03.2015 | ||
SK | 25.03.2015 | ||
GR | 26.06.2015 | ||
IS | 25.07.2015 | ||
IE | 28.09.2015 | ||
LU | 28.09.2015 | ||
CH | 30.09.2015 | ||
FR | 30.09.2015 | ||
LI | 30.09.2015 | ||
Former [2016/33] | EE | 25.03.2015 | |
FI | 25.03.2015 | ||
LT | 25.03.2015 | ||
LV | 25.03.2015 | ||
MC | 25.03.2015 | ||
NL | 25.03.2015 | ||
SE | 25.03.2015 | ||
SI | 25.03.2015 | ||
SK | 25.03.2015 | ||
GR | 26.06.2015 | ||
IS | 25.07.2015 | ||
IE | 28.09.2015 | ||
LU | 28.09.2015 | ||
CH | 30.09.2015 | ||
LI | 30.09.2015 | ||
Former [2016/24] | EE | 25.03.2015 | |
FI | 25.03.2015 | ||
LT | 25.03.2015 | ||
LV | 25.03.2015 | ||
MC | 25.03.2015 | ||
NL | 25.03.2015 | ||
SE | 25.03.2015 | ||
SI | 25.03.2015 | ||
SK | 25.03.2015 | ||
GR | 26.06.2015 | ||
IS | 25.07.2015 | ||
LU | 28.09.2015 | ||
Former [2016/23] | EE | 25.03.2015 | |
FI | 25.03.2015 | ||
LT | 25.03.2015 | ||
LV | 25.03.2015 | ||
MC | 25.03.2015 | ||
NL | 25.03.2015 | ||
SE | 25.03.2015 | ||
SK | 25.03.2015 | ||
GR | 26.06.2015 | ||
IS | 25.07.2015 | ||
LU | 28.09.2015 | ||
Former [2016/21] | EE | 25.03.2015 | |
FI | 25.03.2015 | ||
LT | 25.03.2015 | ||
LV | 25.03.2015 | ||
NL | 25.03.2015 | ||
SE | 25.03.2015 | ||
SK | 25.03.2015 | ||
GR | 26.06.2015 | ||
IS | 25.07.2015 | ||
LU | 28.09.2015 | ||
Former [2015/50] | EE | 25.03.2015 | |
FI | 25.03.2015 | ||
LT | 25.03.2015 | ||
LV | 25.03.2015 | ||
NL | 25.03.2015 | ||
SE | 25.03.2015 | ||
SK | 25.03.2015 | ||
GR | 26.06.2015 | ||
IS | 25.07.2015 | ||
Former [2015/49] | EE | 25.03.2015 | |
FI | 25.03.2015 | ||
LT | 25.03.2015 | ||
LV | 25.03.2015 | ||
NL | 25.03.2015 | ||
SE | 25.03.2015 | ||
SK | 25.03.2015 | ||
GR | 26.06.2015 | ||
Former [2015/41] | FI | 25.03.2015 | |
LT | 25.03.2015 | ||
LV | 25.03.2015 | ||
NL | 25.03.2015 | ||
SE | 25.03.2015 | ||
GR | 26.06.2015 | ||
Former [2015/39] | FI | 25.03.2015 | |
LT | 25.03.2015 | ||
LV | 25.03.2015 | ||
SE | 25.03.2015 | ||
GR | 26.06.2015 | ||
Former [2015/37] | FI | 25.03.2015 | |
LT | 25.03.2015 | ||
SE | 25.03.2015 | ||
GR | 26.06.2015 | ||
Former [2015/36] | FI | 25.03.2015 | |
LT | 25.03.2015 | ||
SE | 25.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/35] | LT | 25.03.2015 | Cited in | International search | [A]EP0824123 (SUMITOMO BAYER URETHANE CO [JP]) [A] 1-14 * page 2, line 31 - page 4, line 13; claims 1,2,6; tables 1-3 *; | [A]EP0832909 (BASF AG [DE]) [A] 1,2* page 3, line 22 - page 4, line 44; claims 1,10,14 *; | [A]WO0005289 (HUNTSMAN ICI CHEM LLC [US], et al) [A] 1-14 * page 1, line 21 - page 4, line 9; claims 1-28; tables 1,2 *; | [DX]EP1138709 (BASF AG [DE]) [DX] 1-14 * page 3, line 1 - page 5, line 37; examples 3-5; claims 1-9 *; | [A]WO03027161 (LG ELECTRONICS INC [KR], et al) [A] 1-14 * page 2, line 15 - page 5, line 4; example -; claims 1-14; table 1 * |