EP1806037 - METHOD FOR THE PRODUCTION OF A METAL-CERAMIC SUBSTRATE OR COPPER-CERAMIC SUBSTRATE, AND SUPPORT TO BE USED IN SAID METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 24.12.2010 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.10.2012 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 21.11.2012 [2012/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Curamik Electronics GmbH Am Stadtwald 2 92676 Eschenbach / DE | [2007/28] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SCHULZ-HARDER, Jürgen Mozartstrasse 21 91207 Lauf / DE | 02 /
FRISCHMANN, Andreas Karl Akaziengasse 4S/2 A-1230 Wien / AT | 03 /
ROGG, Alexander Bärnwinkel 12 92724 Trabitz / DE | 04 /
EXEL, Karl Hölderlinstr. 6 64668 Rimbach / DE | [2007/40] |
Former [2007/28] | 01 /
SCHULZ-HARDER, Jürgen Hugo-Dietz-Strasse 32 91207 Lauf / DE | ||
02 /
FRISCHMANN, Andreas Karl Akaziengasse 4S/2 A-1230 Wien / AT | |||
03 /
ROGG, Alexander Weinleite 9 92676 Speinshart / DE | |||
04 /
EXEL, Karl Hölderlinstr. 6 64668 Rimbach / DE | Representative(s) | Graf, Helmut, et al Graf Glück Habersack Kritzenberger Postfach 10 08 26 93008 Regensburg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/30] | Graf, Helmut, et al Patentanwälte Graf Wasmeier Glück Postfach 10 08 26 93008 Regensburg / DE | ||
Former [2007/28] | Graf, Helmut, et al Patentanwälte Graf Wasmeier Glück Postfach 10 08 26 93008 Regensburg / DE | Application number, filing date | 05798456.9 | 05.10.2005 | [2007/28] | WO2005DE01781 | Priority number, date | DE20041052280 | 27.10.2004 Original published format: DE102004052280 | DE20041056879 | 25.11.2004 Original published format: DE102004056879 | [2007/28] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2006045267 | Date: | 04.05.2006 | Language: | DE | [2006/18] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1806037 | Date: | 11.07.2007 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 04.05.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/28] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1806037 | Date: | 17.02.2010 | Language: | DE | [2010/07] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 04.05.2006 | Classification | IPC: | H05K3/02, H05K1/03, H05K13/00, H01L23/373, C04B37/02 | [2007/28] | CPC: |
C04B37/021 (EP,US);
B32B18/00 (EP,US);
H01L23/3735 (EP,US);
H05K3/022 (EP,US);
B32B2311/12 (EP,US);
B32B2315/02 (EP,US);
C04B2235/6584 (EP,US);
C04B2235/9607 (EP,US);
C04B2237/341 (EP,US);
C04B2237/343 (EP,US);
C04B2237/365 (EP,US);
C04B2237/407 (EP,US);
C04B2237/54 (EP,US);
C04B2237/56 (EP,US);
C04B2237/562 (EP,US);
C04B2237/704 (EP,US);
H01L2924/0002 (EP,US);
H05K1/0306 (EP,US);
| C-Set: |
H01L2924/0002, H01L2924/00 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/28] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUM HERSTELLEN EINES METALL-KERAMIK-SUBSTRATES BZW. KUPFER-KERAMIK-SUBSTRATES SOWIE TRÄGER ZUR VERWENDUNG BEI DIESEM VERFAHREN | [2007/28] | English: | METHOD FOR THE PRODUCTION OF A METAL-CERAMIC SUBSTRATE OR COPPER-CERAMIC SUBSTRATE, AND SUPPORT TO BE USED IN SAID METHOD | [2007/28] | French: | PROCEDE POUR REALISER UN SUBSTRAT METAL-CERAMIQUE OU UN SUBSTRAT CUIVRE-CERAMIQUE, ET SUPPORT A UTILISER DANS LE CADRE DE CE PROCEDE | [2007/28] | Entry into regional phase | 26.04.2007 | National basic fee paid | 26.04.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 26.04.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 07.04.2007 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 26.04.2007 | Examination requested [2007/28] | 10.09.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 03.03.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.10.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.12.2009 | Fee for grant paid | 30.12.2009 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 18.11.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit [2011/04] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.10.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.10.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 17.02.2010 | CZ | 17.02.2010 | DK | 17.02.2010 | EE | 17.02.2010 | FI | 17.02.2010 | IE | 17.02.2010 | IT | 17.02.2010 | LT | 17.02.2010 | LV | 17.02.2010 | NL | 17.02.2010 | PL | 17.02.2010 | RO | 17.02.2010 | SE | 17.02.2010 | SI | 17.02.2010 | SK | 17.02.2010 | TR | 17.02.2010 | BG | 17.05.2010 | GR | 18.05.2010 | ES | 28.05.2010 | IS | 17.06.2010 | PT | 17.06.2010 | HU | 18.08.2010 | AT | 05.10.2010 | LU | 05.10.2010 | BE | 31.10.2010 | CH | 31.10.2010 | LI | 31.10.2010 | MC | 31.10.2010 | [2012/47] |
Former [2012/44] | CY | 17.02.2010 | |
CZ | 17.02.2010 | ||
DK | 17.02.2010 | ||
EE | 17.02.2010 | ||
FI | 17.02.2010 | ||
IE | 17.02.2010 | ||
IT | 17.02.2010 | ||
LT | 17.02.2010 | ||
LV | 17.02.2010 | ||
NL | 17.02.2010 | ||
PL | 17.02.2010 | ||
RO | 17.02.2010 | ||
SE | 17.02.2010 | ||
SI | 17.02.2010 | ||
SK | 17.02.2010 | ||
BG | 17.05.2010 | ||
GR | 18.05.2010 | ||
ES | 28.05.2010 | ||
IS | 17.06.2010 | ||
PT | 17.06.2010 | ||
HU | 18.08.2010 | ||
AT | 05.10.2010 | ||
LU | 05.10.2010 | ||
BE | 31.10.2010 | ||
CH | 31.10.2010 | ||
LI | 31.10.2010 | ||
MC | 31.10.2010 | ||
Former [2012/42] | CY | 17.02.2010 | |
CZ | 17.02.2010 | ||
DK | 17.02.2010 | ||
EE | 17.02.2010 | ||
FI | 17.02.2010 | ||
IE | 17.02.2010 | ||
IT | 17.02.2010 | ||
LT | 17.02.2010 | ||
LV | 17.02.2010 | ||
NL | 17.02.2010 | ||
PL | 17.02.2010 | ||
RO | 17.02.2010 | ||
SE | 17.02.2010 | ||
SI | 17.02.2010 | ||
SK | 17.02.2010 | ||
BG | 17.05.2010 | ||
GR | 18.05.2010 | ||
ES | 28.05.2010 | ||
IS | 17.06.2010 | ||
PT | 17.06.2010 | ||
HU | 18.08.2010 | ||
AT | 05.10.2010 | ||
BE | 31.10.2010 | ||
CH | 31.10.2010 | ||
LI | 31.10.2010 | ||
MC | 31.10.2010 | ||
Former [2012/11] | CY | 17.02.2010 | |
CZ | 17.02.2010 | ||
DK | 17.02.2010 | ||
EE | 17.02.2010 | ||
FI | 17.02.2010 | ||
IE | 17.02.2010 | ||
IT | 17.02.2010 | ||
LT | 17.02.2010 | ||
LV | 17.02.2010 | ||
NL | 17.02.2010 | ||
PL | 17.02.2010 | ||
RO | 17.02.2010 | ||
SE | 17.02.2010 | ||
SI | 17.02.2010 | ||
SK | 17.02.2010 | ||
BG | 17.05.2010 | ||
GR | 18.05.2010 | ||
ES | 28.05.2010 | ||
IS | 17.06.2010 | ||
PT | 17.06.2010 | ||
AT | 05.10.2010 | ||
BE | 31.10.2010 | ||
CH | 31.10.2010 | ||
LI | 31.10.2010 | ||
MC | 31.10.2010 | ||
Former [2011/38] | CY | 17.02.2010 | |
CZ | 17.02.2010 | ||
DK | 17.02.2010 | ||
EE | 17.02.2010 | ||
FI | 17.02.2010 | ||
IE | 17.02.2010 | ||
IT | 17.02.2010 | ||
LT | 17.02.2010 | ||
LV | 17.02.2010 | ||
NL | 17.02.2010 | ||
PL | 17.02.2010 | ||
RO | 17.02.2010 | ||
SE | 17.02.2010 | ||
SI | 17.02.2010 | ||
SK | 17.02.2010 | ||
BG | 17.05.2010 | ||
GR | 18.05.2010 | ||
ES | 28.05.2010 | ||
IS | 17.06.2010 | ||
PT | 17.06.2010 | ||
BE | 31.10.2010 | ||
CH | 31.10.2010 | ||
LI | 31.10.2010 | ||
MC | 31.10.2010 | ||
Former [2011/30] | CY | 17.02.2010 | |
CZ | 17.02.2010 | ||
DK | 17.02.2010 | ||
EE | 17.02.2010 | ||
FI | 17.02.2010 | ||
IE | 17.02.2010 | ||
IT | 17.02.2010 | ||
LT | 17.02.2010 | ||
LV | 17.02.2010 | ||
NL | 17.02.2010 | ||
PL | 17.02.2010 | ||
RO | 17.02.2010 | ||
SE | 17.02.2010 | ||
SI | 17.02.2010 | ||
SK | 17.02.2010 | ||
BG | 17.05.2010 | ||
GR | 18.05.2010 | ||
ES | 28.05.2010 | ||
IS | 17.06.2010 | ||
PT | 17.06.2010 | ||
MC | 31.10.2010 | ||
Former [2011/16] | CY | 17.02.2010 | |
CZ | 17.02.2010 | ||
DK | 17.02.2010 | ||
EE | 17.02.2010 | ||
FI | 17.02.2010 | ||
IE | 17.02.2010 | ||
IT | 17.02.2010 | ||
LT | 17.02.2010 | ||
LV | 17.02.2010 | ||
NL | 17.02.2010 | ||
PL | 17.02.2010 | ||
RO | 17.02.2010 | ||
SE | 17.02.2010 | ||
SI | 17.02.2010 | ||
SK | 17.02.2010 | ||
BG | 17.05.2010 | ||
GR | 18.05.2010 | ||
ES | 28.05.2010 | ||
IS | 17.06.2010 | ||
PT | 17.06.2010 | ||
Former [2011/07] | CY | 17.02.2010 | |
CZ | 17.02.2010 | ||
DK | 17.02.2010 | ||
EE | 17.02.2010 | ||
FI | 17.02.2010 | ||
IE | 17.02.2010 | ||
LT | 17.02.2010 | ||
LV | 17.02.2010 | ||
NL | 17.02.2010 | ||
PL | 17.02.2010 | ||
RO | 17.02.2010 | ||
SE | 17.02.2010 | ||
SI | 17.02.2010 | ||
SK | 17.02.2010 | ||
BG | 17.05.2010 | ||
GR | 18.05.2010 | ||
ES | 28.05.2010 | ||
IS | 17.06.2010 | ||
PT | 17.06.2010 | ||
Former [2011/02] | CY | 17.02.2010 | |
CZ | 17.02.2010 | ||
EE | 17.02.2010 | ||
FI | 17.02.2010 | ||
IE | 17.02.2010 | ||
LT | 17.02.2010 | ||
LV | 17.02.2010 | ||
NL | 17.02.2010 | ||
PL | 17.02.2010 | ||
RO | 17.02.2010 | ||
SE | 17.02.2010 | ||
SI | 17.02.2010 | ||
SK | 17.02.2010 | ||
BG | 17.05.2010 | ||
GR | 18.05.2010 | ||
ES | 28.05.2010 | ||
IS | 17.06.2010 | ||
PT | 17.06.2010 | ||
Former [2010/46] | FI | 17.02.2010 | |
IE | 17.02.2010 | ||
LT | 17.02.2010 | ||
LV | 17.02.2010 | ||
NL | 17.02.2010 | ||
PL | 17.02.2010 | ||
SI | 17.02.2010 | ||
GR | 18.05.2010 | ||
ES | 28.05.2010 | ||
IS | 17.06.2010 | ||
PT | 17.06.2010 | ||
Former [2010/45] | FI | 17.02.2010 | |
LT | 17.02.2010 | ||
LV | 17.02.2010 | ||
NL | 17.02.2010 | ||
PL | 17.02.2010 | ||
SI | 17.02.2010 | ||
ES | 28.05.2010 | ||
IS | 17.06.2010 | ||
PT | 17.06.2010 | ||
Former [2010/40] | FI | 17.02.2010 | |
LT | 17.02.2010 | ||
LV | 17.02.2010 | ||
PL | 17.02.2010 | ||
SI | 17.02.2010 | ||
ES | 28.05.2010 | ||
IS | 17.06.2010 | ||
PT | 17.06.2010 | ||
Former [2010/33] | ES | 28.05.2010 | Cited in | International search | [I]US4259061 (DUBETSKY DERRY J) [I] 29-39,41 * column 3, line 16 - column 4, line 46 *; | [A]US4483810 (BUNK KLAUS [DE], et al) [A] 1-41 * column 3, line 26 - column 4, line 3; figure 1 *; | [I]US4906509 (NISHIO HIDEAKI [JP], et al) [I] 29-40 * column 3, lines 12-16 - column 4, lines 6-17; figure 1 *; | [A]US5603875 (GILLER RUSSELL S [US], et al) [A] 29-41 * the whole document *; | [A]US6033787 (NAGASE TOSHIYUKI [JP], et al) [A] 1-28 * column 6, lines 47-56; figure 8 *; | [A]US6086990 (SUMINO HIROYASU [JP], et al) [A] 1-28 * the whole document *; | [A]US2004026482 (SCHULZ-HARDER JURGEN [DE]) [A] * the whole document *; | [A]US2004131832 (TSUKAGUCHI NOBUYOSHI [JP], et al) [A] 1-28 * paragraph [0066]; figure 7B * |