EP1827864 - SAFETY ELEMENT PROVIDED WITH AN OPTICALLY-VARIABLE LAYER AND METHOD FOR THE PRODUCTION THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 26.06.2009 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.12.2010 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): GR | published on 12.01.2011 [2011/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Giesecke & Devrient GmbH Prinzregentenstrasse 159 81677 München / DE | [2007/36] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HEIM, Manfred Schönstrasse 59 81543 München / DE | 02 /
KRETSCHMAR, Friedrich Erchanbertstrasse 8 81929 München / DE | [2007/36] | Representative(s) | Zeuner, Stefan Zeuner Summerer Stütz Nussbaumstrasse 8 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/35] | Zeuner, Stefan Zeuner & Summerer Hedwigstrasse 9 80636 München / DE | ||
Former [2008/29] | Zeuner, Stefan Zeuner & Summerer Hedwigstrasse 9 80636 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 05798822.2 | 06.10.2005 | [2007/36] | WO2005EP10766 | Priority number, date | DE20041049118 | 07.10.2004 Original published format: DE102004049118 | [2007/36] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2006040069 | Date: | 20.04.2006 | Language: | DE | [2006/16] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1827864 | Date: | 05.09.2007 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 20.04.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/36] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1827864 | Date: | 20.08.2008 | Language: | DE | [2008/34] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 20.04.2006 | Classification | IPC: | B42D15/00 | [2007/36] | CPC: |
B42D25/355 (EP,US);
B42D25/351 (US);
B42D25/364 (US);
B42D2033/26 (EP);
B42D2035/24 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/36] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SICHERHEITSELEMENT MIT EINER OPTISCH VARIABLEN SCHICHT UND VERFAHREN ZU SEINER HERSTELLUNG | [2007/36] | English: | SAFETY ELEMENT PROVIDED WITH AN OPTICALLY-VARIABLE LAYER AND METHOD FOR THE PRODUCTION THEREOF | [2007/36] | French: | ELEMENT DE SECURITE COMPORTANT UNE COUCHE A VARIATION OPTIQUE ET SON PROCEDE DE PRODUCTION | [2007/36] | Entry into regional phase | 07.05.2007 | National basic fee paid | 07.05.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 07.05.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 07.05.2007 | Examination requested [2007/36] | 16.04.2008 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.07.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 03.07.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 25.05.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/31] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.10.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 20.08.2008 | DK | 20.08.2008 | EE | 20.08.2008 | FI | 20.08.2008 | IE | 20.08.2008 | LT | 20.08.2008 | LV | 20.08.2008 | RO | 20.08.2008 | LU | 06.10.2008 | BE | 31.10.2008 | MC | 31.10.2008 | GR | 21.11.2008 | IS | 20.12.2008 | [2011/02] |
Former [2010/40] | CY | 20.08.2008 | |
DK | 20.08.2008 | ||
EE | 20.08.2008 | ||
FI | 20.08.2008 | ||
IE | 20.08.2008 | ||
LT | 20.08.2008 | ||
LV | 20.08.2008 | ||
RO | 20.08.2008 | ||
LU | 06.10.2008 | ||
BE | 31.10.2008 | ||
MC | 31.10.2008 | ||
IS | 20.12.2008 | ||
Former [2010/33] | DK | 20.08.2008 | |
EE | 20.08.2008 | ||
FI | 20.08.2008 | ||
IE | 20.08.2008 | ||
LT | 20.08.2008 | ||
LV | 20.08.2008 | ||
RO | 20.08.2008 | ||
LU | 06.10.2008 | ||
BE | 31.10.2008 | ||
MC | 31.10.2008 | ||
IS | 20.12.2008 | ||
Former [2010/01] | DK | 20.08.2008 | |
EE | 20.08.2008 | ||
FI | 20.08.2008 | ||
IE | 20.08.2008 | ||
LT | 20.08.2008 | ||
LV | 20.08.2008 | ||
RO | 20.08.2008 | ||
BE | 31.10.2008 | ||
MC | 31.10.2008 | ||
IS | 20.12.2008 | ||
Former [2009/28] | DK | 20.08.2008 | |
FI | 20.08.2008 | ||
IE | 20.08.2008 | ||
LT | 20.08.2008 | ||
LV | 20.08.2008 | ||
RO | 20.08.2008 | ||
MC | 31.10.2008 | ||
IS | 20.12.2008 | ||
Former [2009/20] | DK | 20.08.2008 | |
FI | 20.08.2008 | ||
LT | 20.08.2008 | ||
LV | 20.08.2008 | ||
IS | 20.12.2008 | ||
Former [2009/15] | FI | 20.08.2008 | |
LT | 20.08.2008 | ||
LV | 20.08.2008 | ||
IS | 20.12.2008 | ||
Former [2009/10] | LT | 20.08.2008 | |
IS | 20.12.2008 | Cited in | International search | [DA]US3858977 (BAIRD KENNETH M, et al) [DA] 1,7,34 * column 2, lines 13-18 * * column 3, line 48 - column 7, line 28; figures 2a-2c *; | [A]DE19639229 (WACKER CHEMIE GMBH [DE]) [A] 1,7,34* the whole document *; | [DA]EP0827457 (GIESECKE & DEVRIENT GMBH [DE]) [DA] 1,7,34 * paragraphs [0017] - [0037]; figures 1-3,6 *; | [A]WO9904983 (GIESECKE & DEVRIENT GMBH [DE], et al) [A] 1,7,34 * page 2, line 17 - page 4, line 16 * * page 12, line 18 - page 20, line 18 * * figures 1-15; claims 1-14 * | by applicant | US3858977 | WO0050249 | WO03068525 |