EP1836570 - METHOD FOR TASK ASSIGNMENT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 28.08.2015 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.08.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 30.09.2015 [2015/40] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Konsultointi Martikainen Oy Kaskenpolttajantie 21 B 2 00670 Helsinki / FI | [2007/39] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MARTIKAINEN, Olli Kaskenpolttajantie 21 B 1 FI-00670 Helsinki / FI | 02 /
NAUMOV, Valeriy A. Hakoportaankatu 4 A 4 FI-53850 Lappeenranta / FI | [2007/39] | Representative(s) | Lahti, Heikki Sinikalliontie 12 02630 Espoo / FI | [2012/41] |
Former [2009/15] | Lahti, Heikki Sinimäentie 8B 02630 Espoo / FI | Application number, filing date | 05799073.1 | 11.10.2005 | [2007/39] | WO2005FI00430 | Priority number, date | FI20040001380 | 26.10.2004 Original published format: FI 20041380 | [2007/39] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2006045881 | Date: | 04.05.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/18] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1836570 | Date: | 26.09.2007 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 04.05.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/39] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | FI | 04.05.2006 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.01.2009 | Classification | IPC: | G06F9/46, H04L12/24, G06F9/50 | [2009/04] | CPC: |
G06F9/505 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2007/39] | G06F9/46, H04L12/24 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/39] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR TASK-ZUWEISUNG | [2007/39] | English: | METHOD FOR TASK ASSIGNMENT | [2007/39] | French: | PROCEDE D'ASSIGNATION DE TACHES | [2007/39] | Entry into regional phase | 16.04.2007 | National basic fee paid | 16.04.2007 | Search fee paid | 16.04.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 16.04.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 17.04.2006 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 01.06.2006 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: FI | 17.04.2007 | Examination requested [2007/39] | 20.04.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.05.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.02.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.03.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.10.2012 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 23.10.2012 | 23.10.2012 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 19.11.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.04.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.05.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2015/40] | 28.05.2015 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2015/40] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 20.04.2009 | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 17.06.2014 | Request for further processing filed | 17.06.2014 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 27.06.2014 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.04.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.12.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.10.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 21.10.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 04.10.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 29.10.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 28.10.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.2008 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   11.12.2008 | 31.10.2014 | 10   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP0232509 (IBM [US]) [X] 1-4 * page 4 - page 5; figure 8 *; | [A]US5031089 (LIU HOWARD T [US], et al) [A] 1-4* abstract *; | [A]US2003149716 (PETERSON RICKY MERLE [US]) [A] 1-4 * abstract *; | [X]US2003212731 (BRENNER LARRY BERT [US], et al) [X] 1-4 * figures 1,2,9 * * paragraph [0025] - paragraph [0027] * * paragraph [0043] * * paragraph [0052] - paragraph [0069] * * paragraph [0097] - paragraph [0098] * | International search | [A]US5991808 (BRODER ANDREI [US], et al); | [X]US6292822 (HARDWICK JONATHAN C [GB]); | [Y] - BANAWAN ET AL, "A Comparative Study of Load Sharing in Heterogenous Multicomputer Systems", PROC 25TH ANNUAL SIMULATION SYMPOSIUM, (1992), pages 22 - 31, XP010028457 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/SIMSYM.1992.227580 | [XP] - NAUMOV ET AL, "Idle Period Notification Policy for Dynamic Task Assignment", PROCEEDINGS OF THE 2005 INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON PARALLEL PROCESSING WORKSHOPS (ICPPW'05), OSLO, NORWAY, (20050614), pages 331 - 335, XP010820983 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/ICPPW.2005.40 | [A] - MITZENMACHER M., "How Useful Is Old Information?", IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON PARALLEL AND DISTRIBUTED SYSTEMS, (2000), vol. 11, no. 1, pages 6 - 20, XP000903745 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/71.824633 | by applicant | US2003212731 | - V. CARDELLINI; E. CASALICCHIO, "The State of the Art in Locally Distributed Web-Server Systems", ACM COMPUTING SURVEYS, (200206), vol. 34, no. 2, pages 263 - 311 | - O. YOUNIS; S. FAHMY, "Constraint-Based Routing in the Internet: Basic Principles and Recent Research", IEEE COMMUNICATIONS SURVEYS, (2003), vol. &, no. 1, pages 2 - 13 | - T.L. CASAVANT; J.G. KUHL, "A Taxonomy of Scheduling in General-Purpose Distributed Computing Systems", IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON SOFTWARE ENGINEERING, (198802), vol. 14, no. 2, pages 141 - 154 | - "Optimal load balancing in memory hierarchies", J.P. BUZEN; P.P.-S, CHEN, Information Processing 74, (1974), pages 271 - 275 | - M. NI; K. HWANG, "Optimal load balancing in a multiple processor system with many job classes", IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON SOFTWARE ENGINEERING, (1985), vol. 11, no. 5, pages 491 - 496 | - A.N. TANTAWI; D. TOWSLEY, "Optimal static load balancing in distributed computer systems", JOURNAL OF THE ACM, (198504), vol. 32, no. 2, pages 445 - 465 | - C. KIM; H. KAMEDA, "An algorithm for optimal static load balancing in distributed computer systems", IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON COMPUTERS, (199203), vol. 41, no. 3, pages 381 - 384 | - Y.C. CHOW; W.H. KOHLER, "Models of dynamic load balancing in a heterogeneous multiple processor system", IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON COMPUTERS, (197905), vol. C-28, no. 5, pages 354 - 361 | - M. MITZENMACHER, "How useful is old information", IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON PARALLEL AND DISTRIBUTED SYSTEMS, (200001), vol. 11, no. 1, pages 6 - 20 | - D.V. LINDLEY, "On the theory of queues with a single server", PROC. OF THE CAMBRIDGE PHILOSOPHICAL SOCIETY, (1952), vol. 48, pages 277 - 289 | - S.A. BANAWAN; N.M. ZEIDAT, "Comparative study of load sharing in heterogeneous multicomputer systems", PROC. 25TH ANNUAL SIMULATION SYMPOSIUM, (19920406), pages 22 - 31 |