EP1792421 - ESTIMATION OF A SIGNAL-TO-INTERFERENCE PLUS NOISE RATIO AT THE OUTPUT OF AN OFDM CDMA RECEIVER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 04.01.2013 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.07.2014 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 20.08.2014 [2014/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Commissariat à l'Énergie Atomique et aux Énergies Alternatives Bâtiment "Le Ponant D" 25, Rue Leblanc 75015 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2012/09] | For all designated states Commissariat à l'Énergie Atomique et aux Énergies Alternatives Bâtiment "Le Ponant D" 25, rue Leblanc 75015 Paris / FR | ||
Former [2010/18] | For all designated states Commissariat à l'énergie atomique et aux énergies alternatives Bâtiment D "Le Ponant" 25, rue Leblanc 75015 Paris / FR | ||
Former [2007/23] | For all designated states COMMISSARIAT A L'ENERGIE ATOMIQUE 25, rue Leblanc Immeuble Le Ponant D 75015 Paris / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DES NOES, Mathieu 3, rue Charreton F-38000 Grenoble / FR | 02 /
KTENAS, Dimitri 23 ter rue de la Liberté F-38600 Fontaine / FR | 03 /
MARET, Luc Le Lotaret 38210 POLIENAS / FR | 04 /
NASSER, Youssef 391, rue des Universités F-38406 Saint Martin d'Heres / FR | [2007/46] |
Former [2007/23] | 01 /
DES NOES, Mathieu 3, rue Charreton F-38000 Grenoble / FR | ||
02 /
KTENAS, Dimitri 23 ter rue de la Liberté F-38600 Fontaine / FR | |||
03 /
MARET, Luc 28, rue du Docteur Greffier F-38000 Grenoble / FR | |||
04 /
NASSER, Youssef 391, rue des Universités F-38406 Saint Martin d'Heres / FR | Representative(s) | Poulin, Gérard, et al BREVALEX 95, rue d'Amsterdam 75378 Paris Cedex 8 / FR | [2012/09] |
Former [2010/34] | Poulin, Gérard, et al BREVALEX 3, rue du Docteur Lancereaux 75008 Paris / FR | ||
Former [2010/34] | Poulin, Gérard, et al BREVALEX 3, rue du Docteur Lancereaux 75008 Paris / FR | ||
Former [2007/23] | Poulin, Gérard, et al Brevatome 3, rue du Docteur Lancereaux 75008 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 05800107.4 | 19.09.2005 | [2007/23] | WO2005FR50762 | Priority number, date | FR20040052107 | 21.09.2004 Original published format: FR 0452107 | [2007/23] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2006032817 | Date: | 30.03.2006 | Language: | FR | [2006/13] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1792421 | Date: | 06.06.2007 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.03.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/23] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1792421 | Date: | 29.02.2012 | Language: | FR | [2012/09] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 30.03.2006 | Classification | IPC: | H04B17/00, H04L1/20 | [2007/23] | CPC: |
H04L1/20 (EP,US);
H04B17/336 (EP,US);
H04L5/0021 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/23] | Title | German: | BEWERTUNG DES VERHÄLTNISSES SIGNAL-INTERFERENZ PLUS RAUSCHEN BEIM AUSGANG EINES OFDM-CDMA-EMPFÄNGERS | [2007/23] | English: | ESTIMATION OF A SIGNAL-TO-INTERFERENCE PLUS NOISE RATIO AT THE OUTPUT OF AN OFDM CDMA RECEIVER | [2007/23] | French: | ESTIMATION DU RAPPORT SIGNAL A INTERFERENCE PLUS BRUIT EN SORTIE D'UN RECEPTEUR OFDM-CDMA | [2007/23] | Entry into regional phase | 13.03.2007 | National basic fee paid | 13.03.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 13.03.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 18.07.2006 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 13.03.2007 | Examination requested [2007/23] | 10.05.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.07.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.10.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.01.2012 | Fee for grant paid | 18.01.2012 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 10.05.2011 | Opposition(s) | 30.11.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit [2013/06] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.09.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.09.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 22.09.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 19.09.2005 | AT | 29.02.2012 | CY | 29.02.2012 | CZ | 29.02.2012 | DK | 29.02.2012 | EE | 29.02.2012 | FI | 29.02.2012 | IE | 29.02.2012 | LT | 29.02.2012 | LV | 29.02.2012 | NL | 29.02.2012 | PL | 29.02.2012 | RO | 29.02.2012 | SE | 29.02.2012 | SI | 29.02.2012 | SK | 29.02.2012 | TR | 29.02.2012 | BG | 29.05.2012 | GR | 30.05.2012 | ES | 09.06.2012 | IS | 29.06.2012 | PT | 29.06.2012 | LU | 19.09.2012 | BE | 30.09.2012 | CH | 30.09.2012 | LI | 30.09.2012 | MC | 30.09.2012 | [2014/34] |
Former [2014/27] | AT | 29.02.2012 | |
CY | 29.02.2012 | ||
CZ | 29.02.2012 | ||
DK | 29.02.2012 | ||
EE | 29.02.2012 | ||
FI | 29.02.2012 | ||
IE | 29.02.2012 | ||
LT | 29.02.2012 | ||
LV | 29.02.2012 | ||
NL | 29.02.2012 | ||
PL | 29.02.2012 | ||
RO | 29.02.2012 | ||
SE | 29.02.2012 | ||
SI | 29.02.2012 | ||
SK | 29.02.2012 | ||
TR | 29.02.2012 | ||
BG | 29.05.2012 | ||
GR | 30.05.2012 | ||
ES | 09.06.2012 | ||
IS | 29.06.2012 | ||
PT | 29.06.2012 | ||
LU | 19.09.2012 | ||
BE | 30.09.2012 | ||
CH | 30.09.2012 | ||
LI | 30.09.2012 | ||
MC | 30.09.2012 | ||
Former [2014/21] | AT | 29.02.2012 | |
CY | 29.02.2012 | ||
CZ | 29.02.2012 | ||
DK | 29.02.2012 | ||
EE | 29.02.2012 | ||
FI | 29.02.2012 | ||
IE | 29.02.2012 | ||
LT | 29.02.2012 | ||
LV | 29.02.2012 | ||
NL | 29.02.2012 | ||
PL | 29.02.2012 | ||
RO | 29.02.2012 | ||
SE | 29.02.2012 | ||
SI | 29.02.2012 | ||
SK | 29.02.2012 | ||
TR | 29.02.2012 | ||
BG | 29.05.2012 | ||
GR | 30.05.2012 | ||
ES | 09.06.2012 | ||
IS | 29.06.2012 | ||
PT | 29.06.2012 | ||
BE | 30.09.2012 | ||
CH | 30.09.2012 | ||
LI | 30.09.2012 | ||
MC | 30.09.2012 | ||
Former [2013/33] | AT | 29.02.2012 | |
CY | 29.02.2012 | ||
CZ | 29.02.2012 | ||
DK | 29.02.2012 | ||
EE | 29.02.2012 | ||
FI | 29.02.2012 | ||
IE | 29.02.2012 | ||
LT | 29.02.2012 | ||
LV | 29.02.2012 | ||
NL | 29.02.2012 | ||
PL | 29.02.2012 | ||
RO | 29.02.2012 | ||
SE | 29.02.2012 | ||
SI | 29.02.2012 | ||
SK | 29.02.2012 | ||
BG | 29.05.2012 | ||
GR | 30.05.2012 | ||
ES | 09.06.2012 | ||
IS | 29.06.2012 | ||
PT | 29.06.2012 | ||
BE | 30.09.2012 | ||
CH | 30.09.2012 | ||
LI | 30.09.2012 | ||
MC | 30.09.2012 | ||
Former [2013/22] | AT | 29.02.2012 | |
CY | 29.02.2012 | ||
CZ | 29.02.2012 | ||
DK | 29.02.2012 | ||
EE | 29.02.2012 | ||
FI | 29.02.2012 | ||
IE | 29.02.2012 | ||
LT | 29.02.2012 | ||
LV | 29.02.2012 | ||
NL | 29.02.2012 | ||
PL | 29.02.2012 | ||
RO | 29.02.2012 | ||
SE | 29.02.2012 | ||
SI | 29.02.2012 | ||
SK | 29.02.2012 | ||
GR | 30.05.2012 | ||
ES | 09.06.2012 | ||
IS | 29.06.2012 | ||
PT | 29.06.2012 | ||
MC | 30.09.2012 | ||
Former [2013/20] | AT | 29.02.2012 | |
CY | 29.02.2012 | ||
CZ | 29.02.2012 | ||
DK | 29.02.2012 | ||
EE | 29.02.2012 | ||
FI | 29.02.2012 | ||
IE | 29.02.2012 | ||
LT | 29.02.2012 | ||
LV | 29.02.2012 | ||
NL | 29.02.2012 | ||
PL | 29.02.2012 | ||
RO | 29.02.2012 | ||
SE | 29.02.2012 | ||
SI | 29.02.2012 | ||
SK | 29.02.2012 | ||
GR | 30.05.2012 | ||
IS | 29.06.2012 | ||
PT | 29.06.2012 | ||
MC | 30.09.2012 | ||
Former [2013/07] | AT | 29.02.2012 | |
CY | 29.02.2012 | ||
CZ | 29.02.2012 | ||
DK | 29.02.2012 | ||
EE | 29.02.2012 | ||
FI | 29.02.2012 | ||
IE | 29.02.2012 | ||
LT | 29.02.2012 | ||
LV | 29.02.2012 | ||
NL | 29.02.2012 | ||
PL | 29.02.2012 | ||
RO | 29.02.2012 | ||
SE | 29.02.2012 | ||
SI | 29.02.2012 | ||
SK | 29.02.2012 | ||
GR | 30.05.2012 | ||
IS | 29.06.2012 | ||
PT | 29.06.2012 | ||
Former [2012/50] | CY | 29.02.2012 | |
CZ | 29.02.2012 | ||
DK | 29.02.2012 | ||
EE | 29.02.2012 | ||
FI | 29.02.2012 | ||
IE | 29.02.2012 | ||
LT | 29.02.2012 | ||
LV | 29.02.2012 | ||
NL | 29.02.2012 | ||
PL | 29.02.2012 | ||
RO | 29.02.2012 | ||
SE | 29.02.2012 | ||
SI | 29.02.2012 | ||
SK | 29.02.2012 | ||
GR | 30.05.2012 | ||
IS | 29.06.2012 | ||
PT | 29.06.2012 | ||
Former [2012/49] | CY | 29.02.2012 | |
CZ | 29.02.2012 | ||
DK | 29.02.2012 | ||
EE | 29.02.2012 | ||
FI | 29.02.2012 | ||
IE | 29.02.2012 | ||
LT | 29.02.2012 | ||
LV | 29.02.2012 | ||
NL | 29.02.2012 | ||
PL | 29.02.2012 | ||
RO | 29.02.2012 | ||
SE | 29.02.2012 | ||
SI | 29.02.2012 | ||
GR | 30.05.2012 | ||
IS | 29.06.2012 | ||
PT | 29.06.2012 | ||
Former [2012/48] | CY | 29.02.2012 | |
EE | 29.02.2012 | ||
FI | 29.02.2012 | ||
IE | 29.02.2012 | ||
LT | 29.02.2012 | ||
LV | 29.02.2012 | ||
NL | 29.02.2012 | ||
SE | 29.02.2012 | ||
GR | 30.05.2012 | ||
IS | 29.06.2012 | ||
PT | 29.06.2012 | ||
Former [2012/47] | CY | 29.02.2012 | |
FI | 29.02.2012 | ||
IE | 29.02.2012 | ||
LT | 29.02.2012 | ||
LV | 29.02.2012 | ||
NL | 29.02.2012 | ||
GR | 30.05.2012 | ||
IS | 29.06.2012 | ||
PT | 29.06.2012 | ||
Former [2012/41] | CY | 29.02.2012 | |
FI | 29.02.2012 | ||
LT | 29.02.2012 | ||
LV | 29.02.2012 | ||
NL | 29.02.2012 | ||
GR | 30.05.2012 | ||
IS | 29.06.2012 | ||
PT | 29.06.2012 | ||
Former [2012/39] | FI | 29.02.2012 | |
LT | 29.02.2012 | ||
LV | 29.02.2012 | ||
NL | 29.02.2012 | ||
GR | 30.05.2012 | ||
IS | 29.06.2012 | ||
PT | 29.06.2012 | ||
Former [2012/37] | FI | 29.02.2012 | |
LT | 29.02.2012 | ||
NL | 29.02.2012 | ||
GR | 30.05.2012 | ||
IS | 29.06.2012 | ||
PT | 29.06.2012 | ||
Former [2012/36] | LT | 29.02.2012 | |
NL | 29.02.2012 | ||
GR | 30.05.2012 | ||
IS | 29.06.2012 | ||
Former [2012/35] | LT | 29.02.2012 | |
NL | 29.02.2012 | ||
IS | 29.06.2012 | ||
Former [2012/34] | LT | 29.02.2012 | |
IS | 29.06.2012 | ||
Former [2012/33] | LT | 29.02.2012 | Cited in | International search | [A]EP1396956 (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC INF TECH [NL]) [A] 1-9* page 8 - page 9 *; | [AD] - STEENDAM, MOENCLAEY, "The effect of synchronisatoin errors on MC-CDMA performance", IEEE INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON COMMUNICATIONS, NEW YORK, US, (19990606), pages 1510 - 1514, XP000903624 [AD] 1-9 * Equation 13 * | [AD] - EVANS, TSE, "Large system performance of linear multiuser receivers in multipath fading channels", IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON INFORMATION THEORY, NEW YORK, US, (200009), vol. 46, no. 6, pages 2059 - 2078, XP002329715 [AD] 1-9 * Lemme 1 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/18.868478 | [AD] - SCHMIDT ET AL., "Channel tracking in wireless OFDM systems", 5TH WORLD MULTI-CONFERENCE ON SYSTEMICS, CYBERNETICS AND INFORMATICS, (20010722), XP002329716 [AD] 1-9 * abstract * | [AD] - HELARD ET AL., "Multicarrier CDMA techniques for future wideband wireless networks", ANNALES DES TELECOMMUNICATIONS, LAUSSANE, CH, (200105), vol. 56, no. 5/6, pages 260 - 274, XP001082129 [AD] 1-9 * Partie III * | [AD] - CHAUFRAY ET AL., "Asymptotic analysis of optimum and sub-optimum CDMA downlink MMSE receivers", INTERNATIONAL SYMPOSIUM ON SIGNAL PROCESSING AND ITS APPLICATIONS, PISCATAWAY, US, (20030701), vol. 1, pages 493 - 496, XP010653236 [AD] 1-9 * the whole document * | [A] - DEBBAH ET AL., "Asymptotic performance analysis for redundant block precoded OFDM systems with mmse equalization", IEEE SIGNAL PROCESSING WORKSHOP ON STATISTICAL SIGNAL PROCESSING, PISCATAWAY, US, (20010806), ISBN 0-7803-7011-2, pages 389 - 392, XP010561158 [A] 1-9 * page 391, column L, paragraph 1 * * abstract * |