EP1803129 - FUSE MEMORY CELL COMPRISING A DIODE, THE DIODE SERVING AS THE FUSE ELEMENT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 04.05.2012 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.05.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 06.06.2012 [2012/23] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SanDisk 3D LLC 601 McCarthy Boulevard Milpitas, CA 95035-7932 / US | [2010/46] |
Former [2007/27] | For all designated states Matrix Semiconductor, Inc. 3230 Scott Boulevard Santa Clara, CA 95054 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
PETTI, Christopher J. 660 Sierra Ave. Mountain View, CA 94041 / US | [2007/27] | Representative(s) | Hitchcock, Esmond Antony Marks & Clerk LLP 90 Long Acre London WC2E 9RA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2010/46] | Hitchcock, Esmond Antony Marks & Clerk LLP 90 Long Acre London WC2E 9RA / GB | ||
Former [2010/40] | (deleted) | ||
Former [2007/27] | Barth, Stephan Manuel Reinhard-Skuhra-Weise & Partner GbR Patentanwälte Friedrichstrasse 31 80801 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 05800174.4 | 28.09.2005 | [2007/27] | WO2005US34936 | Priority number, date | US20040955387 | 29.09.2004 Original published format: US 955387 | [2007/27] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2006039370 | Date: | 13.04.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/15] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1803129 | Date: | 04.07.2007 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 13.04.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/27] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 28.05.2009 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.08.2010 | Classification | IPC: | H01L23/525, H01L27/102, // G11C17/16 | [2010/38] | CPC: |
H01L23/5256 (EP,US);
G11C11/36 (KR);
G11C17/165 (EP,US);
H01L23/62 (KR);
H10B20/25 (US);
G11C17/16 (EP,US);
G11C2213/33 (EP,US);
G11C2213/71 (EP,US);
H01L23/5252 (EP,US);
| C-Set: |
H01L2924/0002, H01L2924/00 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2009/29] | G11C11/14, G11C11/00, G11C11/15, G11C17/18, H01L29/43 | ||
Former IPC [2007/27] | G11C17/18, G11C11/36 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/27] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SICHERUNGSSPEICHERZELLE MIT EINER DIODE ALS SICHERUNGSELEMENT | [2007/27] | English: | FUSE MEMORY CELL COMPRISING A DIODE, THE DIODE SERVING AS THE FUSE ELEMENT | [2007/27] | French: | CELLULE DE MEMOIRE A FUSIBLE COMPRENANT UNE DIODE, LA DIODE SERVANT DE FUSIBLE | [2007/27] | Entry into regional phase | 21.12.2006 | National basic fee paid | 21.12.2006 | Search fee paid | 21.12.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.12.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 21.12.2006 | Examination requested [2007/27] | 12.07.2010 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 22.11.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2012/23] | 30.12.2011 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2012/23] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.09.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.09.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 11.09.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.2011 | 07   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XAI]US4677742 (JOHNSON ROBERT R [US]); | [XI]EP1239520 (HEWLETT PACKARD CO [US]); | [XA]EP1367596 (HEWLETT PACKARD CO [US]) | International search | [A]US6525953 (JOHNSON MARK G [US]); | [A]US6704235 (KNALL N JOHAN [US], et al); | [AT]US6822903 (SCHEUERLEIN ROY E [US], et al); | [AT]US7177169 (SCHEUERLEIN ROY E [US]); | [XE]US2007164309 (KUMAR TANMAY [US], et al) |