EP1807865 - POLISHING APPARATUS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 15.02.2013 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.08.2013 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 02.10.2013 [2013/40] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states EBARA CORPORATION 11-1, Haneda Asahi-cho Ohta-ku Tokyo 144-8510 / JP | [2007/29] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
NABEYA, Osamu, @Ebara Corporation 11-1, Haneda Asahi-cho Ohta-ku Tokyo 144-8510 / JP | 02 /
TOGAWA, Tetsuji, @Ebara Corporation 11-1, Haneda Asahi-cho Ohta-ku Tokyo 144-8510 / JP | 03 /
FUKUSHIMA, Makoto, @Ebara Corporation 11-1, Haneda Asahi-cho Ohta-ku Tokyo 144-8510 / JP | 04 /
YASUDA, Hozumi, @Ebara Corporation 11-1, Haneda Asahi-cho Ohta-ku Tokyo 144-8510 / JP | [2012/15] |
Former [2007/29] | 01 /
NABEYA, Osamu, Ebara Corporation 11-1, Haneda, Asahi-cho, Ohta-ku Tokyo 144-8510 / JP | ||
02 /
TOGAWA, Tetsuji, Ebara Corporation 11-1, Haneda Asahi-cho, Ohta-ku Tokyo 144-8510 / JP | |||
03 /
FUKUSHIMA, Makoto, Ebara Corporation 11-1, Haneda Asahi-cho, Ohta-ku Tokyo 144-8510 / JP | |||
04 /
YASUDA, Hozumi, Ebara Corporation 11-1, Haneda Asahi-cho, Ohta-ku Tokyo 144-8510 / JP | Representative(s) | Emde, Eric Wagner & Geyer Partnerschaft mbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Gewürzmühlstrasse 5 80538 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2012/15] | Emde, Eric Wagner & Geyer Gewürzmühlstrasse 5 80538 München / DE | ||
Former [2007/29] | Emde, Eric Wagner & Geyer, Gewürzmühlstrasse 5 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 05800303.9 | 31.10.2005 | [2007/29] | WO2005JP20334 | Priority number, date | JP20040318581 | 01.11.2004 Original published format: JP 2004318581 | JP20050079166 | 18.03.2005 Original published format: JP 2005079166 | JP20050145566 | 18.05.2005 Original published format: JP 2005145566 | [2007/29] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2006049269 | Date: | 11.05.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/19] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1807865 | Date: | 18.07.2007 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 11.05.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/29] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1807865 | Date: | 11.04.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/15] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 11.05.2006 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.02.2011 | Classification | IPC: | H01L21/304, B24B37/04, B24B47/22, B24B49/16 | [2011/11] | CPC: |
B24B37/20 (EP,US);
H01L21/304 (KR);
B24B47/22 (EP,CN,US);
B24B37/005 (EP,US);
B24B37/042 (EP,US);
B24B37/10 (EP,US);
B24B37/105 (EP,US);
B24B37/30 (EP,CN,US);
B24B37/32 (EP,CN,US);
B24B49/00 (EP,US);
B24B49/16 (EP,CN,US);
B24B49/18 (EP,US);
B24B49/183 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2007/29] | H01L21/304, B24B37/04 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR [2008/06] |
Former [2007/29] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | POLIERVORRICHTUNG | [2007/29] | English: | POLISHING APPARATUS | [2007/29] | French: | APPAREIL DE POLISSAGE | [2007/29] | Entry into regional phase | 30.04.2007 | National basic fee paid | 30.04.2007 | Search fee paid | 30.04.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 30.04.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 30.04.2007 | Examination requested [2007/29] | 24.08.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 21.10.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 29.02.2012 | Fee for grant paid | 29.02.2012 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP11008956.2 / EP2418677 | EP13005022.2 / EP2690652 | EP14177630.2 / EP2797109 | EP14188224.1 / EP2838110 | EP16158297.8 / EP3043377 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 21.10.2011 | Opposition(s) | 14.01.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit [2013/12] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.04.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.10.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.10.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 26.10.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 25.10.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | FR | 31.10.2012 | [2013/40] | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO2004041479 (EBARA CORP [JP], et al) [A] 1-9* paragraph [0027] - paragraph [0038]; figure 1 * | International search | [A]JP2003071712 (DISCO ABRASIVE SYSTEMS LTD); | [A]JP2004154874 (EBARA CORP) |