EP1800176 - DEVICE FOR REPRESENTING OPTICAL INFORMATION BY MEANS OF A VIRTUAL IMAGE, IN PARTICULAR IN A MOTOR VEHICLE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 27.02.2015 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.02.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 01.04.2015 [2015/14] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Continental Automotive GmbH Vahrenwalder Strasse 9 30165 Hannover / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/20] | For all designated states Continental Automotive GmbH Vahrenwalder Strasse 9 30165 Hannover / DE | ||
Former [2007/26] | For all designated states Siemens Aktiengesellschaft Wittelsbacherplatz 2 80333 Munich / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LIND, Britta Am Zellerbruch 27 63533 Mainhausen / DE | 02 /
LUDEWIG, Bernd Beethovenstr. 12 69493 Hirschberg / DE | 03 /
MAYER, Ralf Am Gerbach 5b 67295 Bolanden / DE | [2007/26] | Application number, filing date | 05801352.5 | 12.10.2005 | [2007/26] | WO2005EP55178 | Priority number, date | DE20041050574 | 15.10.2004 Original published format: DE102004050574 | [2007/26] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2006042814 | Date: | 27.04.2006 | Language: | DE | [2006/17] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1800176 | Date: | 27.06.2007 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.04.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/26] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 27.04.2006 | Classification | IPC: | G02B27/01 | [2007/26] | CPC: |
G02B27/0101 (EP,US);
G02B27/01 (KR);
G02B2027/011 (EP,US);
G02B2027/0154 (EP,US);
G02B5/18 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | CZ, DE, FR, IT [2008/04] |
Former [2007/26] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG ZUR DARSTELLUNG VON OPTISCHEN INFORMATIONEN MITTELS EINES VIRTUELLEN BILDES, INSBESONDERE IN EINEM KRAFTFAHRZEUG | [2007/26] | English: | DEVICE FOR REPRESENTING OPTICAL INFORMATION BY MEANS OF A VIRTUAL IMAGE, IN PARTICULAR IN A MOTOR VEHICLE | [2007/26] | French: | DISPOSITIF POUR REPRESENTER DES INFORMATIONS OPTIQUES AU MOYEN D'UNE IMAGE VIRTUELLE, EN PARTICULIER DANS UN VEHICULE AUTOMOBILE | [2007/26] | Entry into regional phase | 27.03.2007 | National basic fee paid | 27.03.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 27.03.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.03.2007 | Examination requested [2007/26] | 27.07.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 06.02.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.03.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 17.12.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.04.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 18.10.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2015/14] | 17.11.2014 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2015/14] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 27.07.2007 | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 17.12.2008 | Request for further processing filed | 17.12.2008 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.10.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.10.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.10.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.10.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 31.10.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 31.10.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 31.10.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.2014 | 10   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]JPS60131328 ; | [X]JPS62182710 ; | [A]EP0151455 (FLIGHT DYNAMICS INC [US]) [A] 1-6 * abstract * * page 6, line 12 - line 17 * * page 7, line 12 - line 21 * * figures 1,2 *; | [A]WO9003590 (SECR DEFENCE BRIT [GB]) [A] 5,11 * abstract * * page 9, line 8 - line 22 * * figure 5 *; | [A]WO8903059 (FLIGHT DYNAMICS INC [US]) [A] 7-10 * abstract * * page 9, line 12 - line 28 * * page 17, line 3 - page 18, line 27 * * page 28, line 6 - line 13 * * figures 1,8,10 * | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19851120), vol. 009, no. 294, Database accession no. (M - 431), & JP60131328 A 19850713 (NISSAN JIDOSHA KK) [X] 1-12 * abstract * | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19880128), vol. 012, no. 029, Database accession no. (P - 660), & JP62182710 A 19870811 (NEC CORP) [X] 1-12 * abstract * | Examination | - ANONYMOUS, "Beugung (Physik) - Wikipedia", (20140331), URL: http://de.wikipedia.org/wiki/Beugung_(Physik), (20140331), XP055110793 | - ANONYMOUS, "Fresnel-Linse - Wikipedia", (20140331), URL: http://de.wikipedia.org/wiki/Fresnel-Linse, (20140331), XP055110801 | - ANONYMOUS, "Brechung (Physik) - Wikipedia", (20140331), URL: http://de.wikipedia.org/wiki/Brechung_(Physik), (20140331), XP055110794 | - ANONYMOUS, "Spiegellinsenobjektiv - Wikipedia", (20140331), URL: http://de.wikipedia.org/wiki/Katadioptrisches_System, (20140331), XP055110795 |