EP1809821 - SANITARY BATH TUB FILLER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 04.10.2019 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 07.01.2019 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 02.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.10.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 06.11.2019 [2019/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hansa Armaturen GmbH Sigmaringer Strasse 107 70567 Stuttgart / DE | [2015/32] |
Former [2007/30] | For all designated states HANSA METALLWERKE AG Sigmaringer Strasse 107 70567 Stuttgart / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HARSCH, Martin Alter Weg 2 74395 Mundelsheim / DE | [2007/30] | Representative(s) | Ostertag & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Azenbergstraße 35 70174 Stuttgart / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2007/30] | Ostertag, Ulrich, et al Patentanwälte Ostertag & Partner Epplestr. 14 70597 Stuttgart / DE | Application number, filing date | 05801437.4 | 07.11.2005 | [2007/30] | WO2005EP11868 | Priority number, date | DE20041054986 | 13.11.2004 Original published format: DE102004054986 | [2007/30] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2006050883 | Date: | 18.05.2006 | Language: | DE | [2006/20] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1809821 | Date: | 25.07.2007 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.05.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/30] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 18.05.2006 | Classification | IPC: | E03C1/04 | [2007/30] | CPC: |
E03C1/0404 (EP);
E03C2201/30 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/30] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SANITÄRE WANNENFÜLLBATTERIE | [2007/30] | English: | SANITARY BATH TUB FILLER | [2007/30] | French: | MITIGEUR POUR BAIGNOIRES SANITAIRE | [2007/30] | Entry into regional phase | 10.05.2007 | National basic fee paid | 10.05.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 10.05.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 10.05.2007 | Examination requested [2007/30] | 23.12.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 01.06.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.04.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 02.11.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.02.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 28.08.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.01.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 01.06.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2019/45] | 27.06.2019 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2019/45] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 23.12.2009 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.11.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.11.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.11.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 26.11.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 28.11.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 28.11.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 27.11.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 27.11.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 24.11.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 23.11.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 24.11.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.11.2018 | 14   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]DE9309418U (KWC AG, UNTERKULM, CH) [X] 1-3,7,8 * page 5, line 7 - page 6, line 9 * * page 7, line 17 - page 9, line 4 * * figure 1 *; | [A]DE202004005561U (REICH KG, REGEL- UND SICHERHEITSTECHNIK) [A] 1-8 * paragraph [0017] * * paragraph [0019] - paragraph [0020] * * figures 3,4 * |