EP1815090 - EXPANDABLE STRUCTURE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 06.05.2011 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.09.2013 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state Updated state(s): BG | published on 16.10.2013 [2013/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Helmore, Ian Stewart 24 The Sycamores Baldock Hertfordshire SG7 5BJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2007/32] | For all designated states Helmore, Ian Stewart 24 The Sycamores Baldock Hertfordshire SG7 5BJ / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2007/32] | Representative(s) | Probert, Gareth David Potter Clarkson LLP The Belgrave Centre Talbot Street Nottingham NG1 5GG / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2008/30] | Probert, Gareth David Potter Clarkson LLP Park View House 58 The Ropewalk Nottingham NG1 5DD / GB | Application number, filing date | 05801563.7 | 04.11.2005 | [2007/32] | WO2005GB04280 | Priority number, date | GB20040024448 | 05.11.2004 Original published format: GB 0424448 | [2007/32] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2006048672 | Date: | 11.05.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/19] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1815090 | Date: | 08.08.2007 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 11.05.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/32] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1815090 | Date: | 30.06.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/26] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 11.05.2006 | Classification | IPC: | E04H15/40, B63B7/06 | [2007/32] | CPC: |
E04H15/40 (EP,GB);
B63B7/06 (EP,GB,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/32] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | AUSDEHNBARE STRUKTUR | [2007/32] | English: | EXPANDABLE STRUCTURE | [2007/32] | French: | STRUCTURE EXTENSIBLE | [2007/32] | Entry into regional phase | 04.06.2007 | National basic fee paid | 04.06.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 04.06.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 04.06.2007 | Examination requested [2007/32] | 18.10.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.06.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.09.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.03.2010 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time | 11.05.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 11.05.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 31.03.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit [2011/23] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to fulfill actions required for granting the patent | 29.04.2010 | Request for further processing filed | 29.04.2010 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 25.05.2010 | Decision despatched | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 05.06.2008 | Request for further processing filed | 05.06.2008 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 19.06.2008 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.05.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.11.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.11.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.11.2007 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   10.05.2008 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 30.06.2010 | BE | 30.06.2010 | CY | 30.06.2010 | CZ | 30.06.2010 | DK | 30.06.2010 | EE | 30.06.2010 | FI | 30.06.2010 | LT | 30.06.2010 | LV | 30.06.2010 | NL | 30.06.2010 | PL | 30.06.2010 | RO | 30.06.2010 | SE | 30.06.2010 | SI | 30.06.2010 | SK | 30.06.2010 | TR | 30.06.2010 | BG | 30.09.2010 | GR | 01.10.2010 | IS | 30.10.2010 | PT | 02.11.2010 | IE | 04.11.2010 | LU | 04.11.2010 | ES | 05.11.2010 | CH | 30.11.2010 | FR | 30.11.2010 | LI | 30.11.2010 | MC | 30.11.2010 | HU | 01.01.2011 | [2013/42] |
Former [2012/47] | AT | 30.06.2010 | |
BE | 30.06.2010 | ||
BG | 30.06.2010 | ||
CY | 30.06.2010 | ||
CZ | 30.06.2010 | ||
DK | 30.06.2010 | ||
EE | 30.06.2010 | ||
FI | 30.06.2010 | ||
LT | 30.06.2010 | ||
LV | 30.06.2010 | ||
NL | 30.06.2010 | ||
PL | 30.06.2010 | ||
RO | 30.06.2010 | ||
SE | 30.06.2010 | ||
SI | 30.06.2010 | ||
SK | 30.06.2010 | ||
TR | 30.06.2010 | ||
GR | 01.10.2010 | ||
IS | 30.10.2010 | ||
PT | 02.11.2010 | ||
IE | 04.11.2010 | ||
LU | 04.11.2010 | ||
ES | 05.11.2010 | ||
CH | 30.11.2010 | ||
FR | 30.11.2010 | ||
LI | 30.11.2010 | ||
MC | 30.11.2010 | ||
HU | 01.01.2011 | ||
Former [2012/44] | AT | 30.06.2010 | |
BE | 30.06.2010 | ||
BG | 30.06.2010 | ||
CY | 30.06.2010 | ||
CZ | 30.06.2010 | ||
DK | 30.06.2010 | ||
EE | 30.06.2010 | ||
FI | 30.06.2010 | ||
LT | 30.06.2010 | ||
LV | 30.06.2010 | ||
NL | 30.06.2010 | ||
PL | 30.06.2010 | ||
RO | 30.06.2010 | ||
SE | 30.06.2010 | ||
SI | 30.06.2010 | ||
SK | 30.06.2010 | ||
GR | 01.10.2010 | ||
IS | 30.10.2010 | ||
PT | 02.11.2010 | ||
IE | 04.11.2010 | ||
LU | 04.11.2010 | ||
ES | 05.11.2010 | ||
CH | 30.11.2010 | ||
FR | 30.11.2010 | ||
LI | 30.11.2010 | ||
MC | 30.11.2010 | ||
HU | 01.01.2011 | ||
Former [2012/42] | AT | 30.06.2010 | |
BE | 30.06.2010 | ||
BG | 30.06.2010 | ||
CY | 30.06.2010 | ||
CZ | 30.06.2010 | ||
DK | 30.06.2010 | ||
EE | 30.06.2010 | ||
FI | 30.06.2010 | ||
LT | 30.06.2010 | ||
LV | 30.06.2010 | ||
NL | 30.06.2010 | ||
PL | 30.06.2010 | ||
RO | 30.06.2010 | ||
SE | 30.06.2010 | ||
SI | 30.06.2010 | ||
SK | 30.06.2010 | ||
GR | 01.10.2010 | ||
IS | 30.10.2010 | ||
PT | 02.11.2010 | ||
IE | 04.11.2010 | ||
ES | 05.11.2010 | ||
CH | 30.11.2010 | ||
FR | 30.11.2010 | ||
LI | 30.11.2010 | ||
MC | 30.11.2010 | ||
HU | 01.01.2011 | ||
Former [2012/41] | AT | 30.06.2010 | |
BE | 30.06.2010 | ||
BG | 30.06.2010 | ||
CY | 30.06.2010 | ||
CZ | 30.06.2010 | ||
DK | 30.06.2010 | ||
EE | 30.06.2010 | ||
FI | 30.06.2010 | ||
LT | 30.06.2010 | ||
LV | 30.06.2010 | ||
NL | 30.06.2010 | ||
PL | 30.06.2010 | ||
RO | 30.06.2010 | ||
SE | 30.06.2010 | ||
SI | 30.06.2010 | ||
SK | 30.06.2010 | ||
GR | 01.10.2010 | ||
IS | 30.10.2010 | ||
PT | 02.11.2010 | ||
IE | 04.11.2010 | ||
ES | 05.11.2010 | ||
CH | 30.11.2010 | ||
FR | 30.11.2010 | ||
LI | 30.11.2010 | ||
MC | 30.11.2010 | ||
Former [2012/08] | AT | 30.06.2010 | |
BE | 30.06.2010 | ||
CY | 30.06.2010 | ||
CZ | 30.06.2010 | ||
DK | 30.06.2010 | ||
EE | 30.06.2010 | ||
FI | 30.06.2010 | ||
LT | 30.06.2010 | ||
LV | 30.06.2010 | ||
NL | 30.06.2010 | ||
PL | 30.06.2010 | ||
RO | 30.06.2010 | ||
SE | 30.06.2010 | ||
SI | 30.06.2010 | ||
SK | 30.06.2010 | ||
GR | 01.10.2010 | ||
IS | 30.10.2010 | ||
PT | 02.11.2010 | ||
IE | 04.11.2010 | ||
ES | 05.11.2010 | ||
CH | 30.11.2010 | ||
FR | 30.11.2010 | ||
LI | 30.11.2010 | ||
MC | 30.11.2010 | ||
Former [2011/47] | AT | 30.06.2010 | |
BE | 30.06.2010 | ||
CY | 30.06.2010 | ||
CZ | 30.06.2010 | ||
DK | 30.06.2010 | ||
EE | 30.06.2010 | ||
FI | 30.06.2010 | ||
LT | 30.06.2010 | ||
LV | 30.06.2010 | ||
NL | 30.06.2010 | ||
PL | 30.06.2010 | ||
RO | 30.06.2010 | ||
SE | 30.06.2010 | ||
SI | 30.06.2010 | ||
SK | 30.06.2010 | ||
GR | 01.10.2010 | ||
IS | 30.10.2010 | ||
PT | 02.11.2010 | ||
IE | 04.11.2010 | ||
CH | 30.11.2010 | ||
FR | 30.11.2010 | ||
LI | 30.11.2010 | ||
MC | 30.11.2010 | ||
Former [2011/38] | AT | 30.06.2010 | |
BE | 30.06.2010 | ||
CY | 30.06.2010 | ||
CZ | 30.06.2010 | ||
DK | 30.06.2010 | ||
EE | 30.06.2010 | ||
FI | 30.06.2010 | ||
LT | 30.06.2010 | ||
LV | 30.06.2010 | ||
NL | 30.06.2010 | ||
PL | 30.06.2010 | ||
RO | 30.06.2010 | ||
SE | 30.06.2010 | ||
SI | 30.06.2010 | ||
SK | 30.06.2010 | ||
GR | 01.10.2010 | ||
IS | 30.10.2010 | ||
PT | 02.11.2010 | ||
CH | 30.11.2010 | ||
LI | 30.11.2010 | ||
MC | 30.11.2010 | ||
Former [2011/32] | AT | 30.06.2010 | |
BE | 30.06.2010 | ||
CY | 30.06.2010 | ||
CZ | 30.06.2010 | ||
DK | 30.06.2010 | ||
EE | 30.06.2010 | ||
FI | 30.06.2010 | ||
LT | 30.06.2010 | ||
LV | 30.06.2010 | ||
NL | 30.06.2010 | ||
PL | 30.06.2010 | ||
RO | 30.06.2010 | ||
SE | 30.06.2010 | ||
SI | 30.06.2010 | ||
SK | 30.06.2010 | ||
GR | 01.10.2010 | ||
IS | 30.10.2010 | ||
PT | 02.11.2010 | ||
MC | 30.11.2010 | ||
Former [2011/19] | AT | 30.06.2010 | |
BE | 30.06.2010 | ||
CY | 30.06.2010 | ||
CZ | 30.06.2010 | ||
DK | 30.06.2010 | ||
EE | 30.06.2010 | ||
FI | 30.06.2010 | ||
LT | 30.06.2010 | ||
LV | 30.06.2010 | ||
NL | 30.06.2010 | ||
PL | 30.06.2010 | ||
RO | 30.06.2010 | ||
SE | 30.06.2010 | ||
SI | 30.06.2010 | ||
SK | 30.06.2010 | ||
GR | 01.10.2010 | ||
IS | 30.10.2010 | ||
PT | 02.11.2010 | ||
Former [2011/13] | AT | 30.06.2010 | |
BE | 30.06.2010 | ||
CY | 30.06.2010 | ||
CZ | 30.06.2010 | ||
EE | 30.06.2010 | ||
FI | 30.06.2010 | ||
LT | 30.06.2010 | ||
LV | 30.06.2010 | ||
NL | 30.06.2010 | ||
PL | 30.06.2010 | ||
RO | 30.06.2010 | ||
SE | 30.06.2010 | ||
SI | 30.06.2010 | ||
SK | 30.06.2010 | ||
GR | 01.10.2010 | ||
IS | 30.10.2010 | ||
PT | 02.11.2010 | ||
Former [2011/12] | AT | 30.06.2010 | |
CZ | 30.06.2010 | ||
EE | 30.06.2010 | ||
FI | 30.06.2010 | ||
LT | 30.06.2010 | ||
LV | 30.06.2010 | ||
NL | 30.06.2010 | ||
PL | 30.06.2010 | ||
RO | 30.06.2010 | ||
SE | 30.06.2010 | ||
SI | 30.06.2010 | ||
SK | 30.06.2010 | ||
GR | 01.10.2010 | ||
PT | 02.11.2010 | ||
Former [2011/08] | AT | 30.06.2010 | |
EE | 30.06.2010 | ||
FI | 30.06.2010 | ||
LT | 30.06.2010 | ||
LV | 30.06.2010 | ||
NL | 30.06.2010 | ||
PL | 30.06.2010 | ||
SE | 30.06.2010 | ||
SI | 30.06.2010 | ||
GR | 01.10.2010 | ||
Former [2011/04] | AT | 30.06.2010 | |
FI | 30.06.2010 | ||
LT | 30.06.2010 | ||
LV | 30.06.2010 | ||
PL | 30.06.2010 | ||
SE | 30.06.2010 | ||
SI | 30.06.2010 | ||
GR | 01.10.2010 | ||
Former [2011/02] | AT | 30.06.2010 | |
FI | 30.06.2010 | ||
LT | 30.06.2010 | ||
LV | 30.06.2010 | ||
SE | 30.06.2010 | ||
SI | 30.06.2010 | ||
GR | 01.10.2010 | Cited in | International search | [XY]DE3013178 (BECKER HERMANN); | [X]DE4229281 (BARCELLONA ELEONORA [IT]); | [YA]US5592961 (CHIN ANNA H K [US]); | [Y]EP1243292 (FINECARD INTERNAT LTD [GB]); | [XY]US2003183263 (VIGLIONE DEAN PETER [AU]); | [Y]US2004149328 (ZHENG YU [US]) |