EP1799484 - METHOD AND DEVICE FOR CONTROLLING THE LOCKING DEGREE OF AN ELECTRONICALLY CONTROLLABLE DIFFERENTIAL LOCK [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 28.12.2012 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.08.2013 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 02.10.2013 [2013/40] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Continental Teves AG & Co. oHG Guerickestrasse 7 60488 Frankfurt am Main / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2007/26] | For all designated states Continental Teves AG & Co. oHG Guerickestrasse 7 60488 Frankfurt am Main / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
RASTE, Thomas Weisskirchener Strasse 15a 61440 Oberursel / DE | 02 /
BAUER, Roger Wickerer Strasse 16 60326 Frankfurt am Main / DE | [2007/26] | Representative(s) | (deleted) | [2012/08] | Application number, filing date | 05801668.4 | 13.10.2005 | [2007/26] | WO2005EP55238 | Priority number, date | DE20041050307 | 14.10.2004 Original published format: DE102004050307 | DE20051049397 | 13.10.2005 Original published format: DE102005049397 | [2007/26] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2006040343 | Date: | 20.04.2006 | Language: | DE | [2006/16] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1799484 | Date: | 27.06.2007 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 20.04.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/26] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1799484 | Date: | 22.02.2012 | Language: | DE | [2012/08] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 20.04.2006 | Classification | IPC: | B60K28/16, B60K23/04, B60T8/32, B60W10/12, B60W10/18 | [2007/26] | CPC: |
B60W40/114 (EP,KR);
B60K23/04 (EP,KR);
B60T8/17552 (EP,KR);
B60W10/16 (EP,KR);
B60W10/184 (EP,KR);
B60W40/10 (EP);
B60W40/11 (EP,KR);
B60W40/112 (EP,KR);
B60T2201/14 (EP,KR);
B60W2520/10 (EP,KR);
B60W2520/14 (EP,KR);
B60W2540/18 (EP,KR);
B60W2710/12 (EP,KR)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR [2007/46] |
Former [2007/26] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUM STEUERN DES SPERRGRADES EINER ELEKTRONISCH STEUERBAREN DIFFERENZIALSPERRE | [2007/26] | English: | METHOD AND DEVICE FOR CONTROLLING THE LOCKING DEGREE OF AN ELECTRONICALLY CONTROLLABLE DIFFERENTIAL LOCK | [2007/26] | French: | PROCEDE ET DISPOSITIF POUR REGLER LE DEGRE DE VERROUILLAGE D'UN SYSTEME DE VERROUILLAGE DE DIFFERENTIEL A COMMANDE ELECTRONIQUE | [2007/26] | Entry into regional phase | 30.03.2007 | National basic fee paid | 30.03.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 30.03.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 30.03.2007 | Examination requested [2007/26] | 15.05.2007 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 20.06.2007 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 08.03.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 02.08.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.03.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.06.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.09.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.12.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 08.12.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 08.03.2010 | Opposition(s) | 23.11.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit [2013/05] | Request for further processing for: | 02.05.2008 | Request for further processing filed | 02.05.2008 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.03.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.01.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 02.11.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 02.11.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 31.10.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.2008 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   16.01.2009 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | FR | 31.10.2012 | [2013/40] | Cited in | International search | [XY]DE10248090 (VOLKSWAGEN AG [DE]) [X] 1,13-18 * the whole document * [Y] 2-12; | [X]DE10303984 (DAIMLER CHRYSLER AG [DE]) [X] 1,13,14 * paragraph [0013] *; | [Y]DE10245035 (PORSCHE AG [DE]) [Y] 2,3 * the whole document *; | [DY]DE19515051 (TEVES GMBH ALFRED [DE]) [DY] 8 * page 13, line 60 - page 15, line 42 *; | [Y]DE4030653 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]) [Y] 6,7,10 * the whole document *; | [Y]DE3714330 (PORSCHE AG [DE]) [Y] 9 * column 4, lines 12-39 * * column 8, line 63 - column 9, line 12 *; | [Y]US2003125148 (PHELAN PERRY E [US], et al) [Y] 4,5 * paragraphs [0018] , [0019] *; | [PL]DE10338656 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]) [PL] 4,5 * the whole document *; | [Y]WO02081279 (CONTINENTAL TEVES AG & CO OHG [DE], et al) [Y] 11,12 * the whole document * | by applicant | DD294078 | DE10248090 | DE10303984 | DE19515051 | DE19515015 |