EP1794529 - HEAT EXCHANGER WITH INDENTATION PATTERN [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 10.05.2019 Database last updated on 19.07.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 01.06.2018 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 11.04.2018 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 11.04.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.07.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY | published on 05.08.2020 [2020/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Danfoss A/S Nordborgvej 81 6430 Nordborg / DK | [2018/27] |
Former [2012/36] | For all designated states Danfoss A/S Nordborgvej 81 6430 Nordborg / DK | ||
Former [2007/24] | For all designated states EP Technology AB Hanögatan 5 211 24 Malmö / SE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
PERSSON, Lars Kustvägen 108 S-274 56 Abbekås / SE | [2007/24] | Representative(s) | Keil & Schaafhausen Patentanwälte PartGmbB Bockenheimer Landstraße 25 60325 Frankfurt am Main / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2018/27] | Knoblauch, Andreas, et al Patentanwälte Dr. Knoblauch PartGmbB Reuterweg 51-53 60323 Frankfurt am Main / DE | ||
Former [2012/36] | Knoblauch, Andreas, et al Patentanwälte Dr. Knoblauch Schlosserstrasse 23 60322 Frankfurt am Main / DE | ||
Former [2009/32] | Bengtsson, Peggy Katrin, et al Albihns AB P.O. Box 4289 203 14 Malmö / SE | ||
Former [2007/24] | Akerman, Marten Lennart, et al Albihns Malmö AB Box 4289 203 14 Malmö / SE | Application number, filing date | 05801779.9 | 07.09.2005 | [2007/24] | WO2005IB53736 | Priority number, date | SE20040002152 | 08.09.2004 Original published format: SE 0402152 | [2007/24] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2006027761 | Date: | 16.03.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/11] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1794529 | Date: | 13.06.2007 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 16.03.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/24] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1794529 | Date: | 04.07.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/27] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 18.05.2006 | Classification | IPC: | F28F3/04 | [2007/24] | CPC: |
F28F3/04 (EP,US);
F28D9/0037 (SE)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2018/27] |
Former [2007/24] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | WÄRMETAUSCHER MIT VERTIEFUNGSMUSTER | [2007/24] | English: | HEAT EXCHANGER WITH INDENTATION PATTERN | [2007/24] | French: | ÉCHANGEUR DE CHALEUR AVEC MOTIFS D'INDENTATIONS | [2018/17] |
Former [2007/24] | ECHANGEUR DE CHALEUR PRESENTANT UNE CONFIGURATION EN RETRAIT | Entry into regional phase | 23.03.2007 | National basic fee paid | 23.03.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 23.03.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 05.07.2006 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 23.03.2007 | Examination requested [2007/24] | 08.07.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 16.01.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.04.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.08.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.04.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.05.2018 | Fee for grant paid | 16.05.2018 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 16.05.2018 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 08.07.2008 | Opposition(s) | 05.04.2019 | No opposition filed within time limit [2019/24] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.09.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.09.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.09.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 22.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 21.09.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 12.09.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 12.09.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 12.09.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 11.09.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 13.09.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 12.09.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 13 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 07.09.2005 | CY | 04.07.2018 | CZ | 04.07.2018 | EE | 04.07.2018 | ES | 04.07.2018 | LT | 04.07.2018 | LV | 04.07.2018 | MC | 04.07.2018 | PT | 04.07.2018 | SK | 04.07.2018 | IE | 07.09.2018 | LU | 07.09.2018 | BE | 30.09.2018 | CH | 30.09.2018 | LI | 30.09.2018 | BG | 04.10.2018 | GR | 05.10.2018 | IS | 04.11.2018 | [2020/32] |
Former [2020/27] | HU | 07.09.2005 | |
CZ | 04.07.2018 | ||
EE | 04.07.2018 | ||
ES | 04.07.2018 | ||
LT | 04.07.2018 | ||
LV | 04.07.2018 | ||
MC | 04.07.2018 | ||
PT | 04.07.2018 | ||
SK | 04.07.2018 | ||
IE | 07.09.2018 | ||
LU | 07.09.2018 | ||
BE | 30.09.2018 | ||
CH | 30.09.2018 | ||
LI | 30.09.2018 | ||
BG | 04.10.2018 | ||
GR | 05.10.2018 | ||
IS | 04.11.2018 | ||
Former [2019/49] | CZ | 04.07.2018 | |
EE | 04.07.2018 | ||
ES | 04.07.2018 | ||
LT | 04.07.2018 | ||
LV | 04.07.2018 | ||
MC | 04.07.2018 | ||
SK | 04.07.2018 | ||
IE | 07.09.2018 | ||
LU | 07.09.2018 | ||
BE | 30.09.2018 | ||
CH | 30.09.2018 | ||
LI | 30.09.2018 | ||
BG | 04.10.2018 | ||
GR | 05.10.2018 | ||
IS | 04.11.2018 | ||
Former [2019/39] | CZ | 04.07.2018 | |
EE | 04.07.2018 | ||
ES | 04.07.2018 | ||
LT | 04.07.2018 | ||
LV | 04.07.2018 | ||
MC | 04.07.2018 | ||
RO | 04.07.2018 | ||
SK | 04.07.2018 | ||
IE | 07.09.2018 | ||
LU | 07.09.2018 | ||
BE | 30.09.2018 | ||
CH | 30.09.2018 | ||
LI | 30.09.2018 | ||
BG | 04.10.2018 | ||
GR | 05.10.2018 | ||
IS | 04.11.2018 | ||
Former [2019/38] | CZ | 04.07.2018 | |
EE | 04.07.2018 | ||
ES | 04.07.2018 | ||
LT | 04.07.2018 | ||
LV | 04.07.2018 | ||
MC | 04.07.2018 | ||
RO | 04.07.2018 | ||
SK | 04.07.2018 | ||
IE | 07.09.2018 | ||
LU | 07.09.2018 | ||
BE | 30.09.2018 | ||
BG | 04.10.2018 | ||
GR | 05.10.2018 | ||
IS | 04.11.2018 | ||
Former [2019/37] | CZ | 04.07.2018 | |
EE | 04.07.2018 | ||
ES | 04.07.2018 | ||
LT | 04.07.2018 | ||
LV | 04.07.2018 | ||
MC | 04.07.2018 | ||
RO | 04.07.2018 | ||
SK | 04.07.2018 | ||
IE | 07.09.2018 | ||
LU | 07.09.2018 | ||
BG | 04.10.2018 | ||
GR | 05.10.2018 | ||
IS | 04.11.2018 | ||
Former [2019/33] | CZ | 04.07.2018 | |
EE | 04.07.2018 | ||
ES | 04.07.2018 | ||
LT | 04.07.2018 | ||
LV | 04.07.2018 | ||
MC | 04.07.2018 | ||
SK | 04.07.2018 | ||
IE | 07.09.2018 | ||
LU | 07.09.2018 | ||
BG | 04.10.2018 | ||
GR | 05.10.2018 | ||
IS | 04.11.2018 | ||
Former [2019/30] | CZ | 04.07.2018 | |
EE | 04.07.2018 | ||
ES | 04.07.2018 | ||
LT | 04.07.2018 | ||
LV | 04.07.2018 | ||
MC | 04.07.2018 | ||
SK | 04.07.2018 | ||
LU | 07.09.2018 | ||
BG | 04.10.2018 | ||
GR | 05.10.2018 | ||
IS | 04.11.2018 | ||
Former [2019/24] | CZ | 04.07.2018 | |
EE | 04.07.2018 | ||
ES | 04.07.2018 | ||
LT | 04.07.2018 | ||
LV | 04.07.2018 | ||
MC | 04.07.2018 | ||
SK | 04.07.2018 | ||
BG | 04.10.2018 | ||
GR | 05.10.2018 | ||
IS | 04.11.2018 | ||
Former [2019/12] | CZ | 04.07.2018 | |
ES | 04.07.2018 | ||
LT | 04.07.2018 | ||
LV | 04.07.2018 | ||
BG | 04.10.2018 | ||
GR | 05.10.2018 | ||
IS | 04.11.2018 | ||
Former [2019/10] | CZ | 04.07.2018 | |
LT | 04.07.2018 | ||
BG | 04.10.2018 | ||
GR | 05.10.2018 | ||
IS | 04.11.2018 | ||
Former [2019/08] | LT | 04.07.2018 | |
IS | 04.11.2018 | ||
Former [2019/07] | LT | 04.07.2018 | Cited in | International search | [A]JP2000205783 ; | [A]GB888636 (ROSENBLADS PATENTER AB); | [X]GB901914 (NAT RES DEV); | [X]US3106242 (KNUT JENSSEN SVERRE, et al); | [A]US3757855 (KUN L, et al); | [X]DE4308858 (BEHR GMBH & CO [DE]); | [X]EP0933608 (HONDA MOTOR CO LTD [JP]); | [A]US2004011515 (MATSUSHIMA HITOSHI [JP]) | Examination | US2959400 | JP2004011936 |