EP1940260 - DIP APPLICATOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 28.02.2014 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.07.2015 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU, LU | published on 19.08.2015 [2015/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Schwan-STABILO Cosmetics GmbH & Co. KG Schwanweg 1 90562 Heroldsberg / DE | [2008/28] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
RÖDER, Georg Berchtoldstr. 26 91126 Schwabach / DE | [2008/28] | Representative(s) | Eisenführ Speiser Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte PartGmbB Postfach 31 02 60 80102 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2013/17] | Eisenführ, Speiser & Partner Postfach 31 02 60 80102 München / DE | ||
Former [2008/28] | Eisenführ, Speiser & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte Postfach 31 02 60 80102 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 05802279.9 | 12.10.2005 | [2008/28] | WO2005EP10964 | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2007042061 | Date: | 19.04.2007 | Language: | DE | [2007/16] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1940260 | Date: | 09.07.2008 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 19.04.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2008/28] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1940260 | Date: | 24.04.2013 | Language: | DE | [2013/17] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 19.04.2007 | Classification | IPC: | A45D40/26, A45D34/04 | [2012/52] | CPC: |
A45D40/262 (EP,US);
A45D34/042 (EP,US);
A45D2200/1018 (EP,US);
A46B2200/106 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2008/28] | A45D40/26 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/28] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | DIP-APPLIKATOR | [2008/28] | English: | DIP APPLICATOR | [2008/28] | French: | APPLICATEUR PLONGEUR | [2008/28] | Entry into regional phase | 31.03.2008 | National basic fee paid | 31.03.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 31.03.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 31.03.2008 | Examination requested [2008/40] | 31.07.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.12.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.11.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 30.03.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.11.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.03.2013 | Fee for grant paid | 18.03.2013 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 31.07.2008 | Opposition(s) | 27.01.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit [2014/14] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.05.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.10.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 02.11.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 02.11.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 31.10.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 31.10.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 12.10.2005 | CY | 24.04.2013 | CZ | 24.04.2013 | DK | 24.04.2013 | EE | 24.04.2013 | FI | 24.04.2013 | IT | 24.04.2013 | LT | 24.04.2013 | LV | 24.04.2013 | MC | 24.04.2013 | NL | 24.04.2013 | PL | 24.04.2013 | RO | 24.04.2013 | SE | 24.04.2013 | SI | 24.04.2013 | SK | 24.04.2013 | TR | 24.04.2013 | BG | 24.07.2013 | GR | 25.07.2013 | ES | 04.08.2013 | IS | 24.08.2013 | PT | 26.08.2013 | AT | 12.10.2013 | GB | 12.10.2013 | IE | 12.10.2013 | LU | 12.10.2013 | BE | 31.10.2013 | CH | 31.10.2013 | FR | 31.10.2013 | LI | 31.10.2013 | [2015/34] |
Former [2015/32] | CY | 24.04.2013 | |
CZ | 24.04.2013 | ||
DK | 24.04.2013 | ||
EE | 24.04.2013 | ||
FI | 24.04.2013 | ||
IT | 24.04.2013 | ||
LT | 24.04.2013 | ||
LV | 24.04.2013 | ||
MC | 24.04.2013 | ||
NL | 24.04.2013 | ||
PL | 24.04.2013 | ||
RO | 24.04.2013 | ||
SE | 24.04.2013 | ||
SI | 24.04.2013 | ||
SK | 24.04.2013 | ||
TR | 24.04.2013 | ||
BG | 24.07.2013 | ||
GR | 25.07.2013 | ||
ES | 04.08.2013 | ||
IS | 24.08.2013 | ||
PT | 26.08.2013 | ||
AT | 12.10.2013 | ||
GB | 12.10.2013 | ||
IE | 12.10.2013 | ||
BE | 31.10.2013 | ||
CH | 31.10.2013 | ||
FR | 31.10.2013 | ||
LI | 31.10.2013 | ||
Former [2015/12] | CY | 24.04.2013 | |
CZ | 24.04.2013 | ||
DK | 24.04.2013 | ||
EE | 24.04.2013 | ||
FI | 24.04.2013 | ||
IT | 24.04.2013 | ||
LT | 24.04.2013 | ||
LV | 24.04.2013 | ||
MC | 24.04.2013 | ||
NL | 24.04.2013 | ||
PL | 24.04.2013 | ||
RO | 24.04.2013 | ||
SE | 24.04.2013 | ||
SI | 24.04.2013 | ||
SK | 24.04.2013 | ||
BG | 24.07.2013 | ||
GR | 25.07.2013 | ||
ES | 04.08.2013 | ||
IS | 24.08.2013 | ||
PT | 26.08.2013 | ||
AT | 12.10.2013 | ||
GB | 12.10.2013 | ||
IE | 12.10.2013 | ||
BE | 31.10.2013 | ||
CH | 31.10.2013 | ||
FR | 31.10.2013 | ||
LI | 31.10.2013 | ||
Former [2014/48] | CY | 24.04.2013 | |
CZ | 24.04.2013 | ||
DK | 24.04.2013 | ||
EE | 24.04.2013 | ||
FI | 24.04.2013 | ||
IT | 24.04.2013 | ||
LT | 24.04.2013 | ||
LV | 24.04.2013 | ||
MC | 24.04.2013 | ||
NL | 24.04.2013 | ||
PL | 24.04.2013 | ||
RO | 24.04.2013 | ||
SE | 24.04.2013 | ||
SI | 24.04.2013 | ||
SK | 24.04.2013 | ||
BG | 24.07.2013 | ||
GR | 25.07.2013 | ||
ES | 04.08.2013 | ||
IS | 24.08.2013 | ||
PT | 26.08.2013 | ||
GB | 12.10.2013 | ||
IE | 12.10.2013 | ||
BE | 31.10.2013 | ||
CH | 31.10.2013 | ||
FR | 31.10.2013 | ||
LI | 31.10.2013 | ||
Former [2014/41] | CY | 24.04.2013 | |
CZ | 24.04.2013 | ||
DK | 24.04.2013 | ||
EE | 24.04.2013 | ||
FI | 24.04.2013 | ||
IT | 24.04.2013 | ||
LT | 24.04.2013 | ||
LV | 24.04.2013 | ||
MC | 24.04.2013 | ||
NL | 24.04.2013 | ||
PL | 24.04.2013 | ||
RO | 24.04.2013 | ||
SE | 24.04.2013 | ||
SI | 24.04.2013 | ||
SK | 24.04.2013 | ||
BG | 24.07.2013 | ||
GR | 25.07.2013 | ||
ES | 04.08.2013 | ||
IS | 24.08.2013 | ||
PT | 26.08.2013 | ||
GB | 12.10.2013 | ||
BE | 31.10.2013 | ||
CH | 31.10.2013 | ||
FR | 31.10.2013 | ||
LI | 31.10.2013 | ||
Former [2014/37] | CY | 24.04.2013 | |
CZ | 24.04.2013 | ||
DK | 24.04.2013 | ||
EE | 24.04.2013 | ||
FI | 24.04.2013 | ||
IT | 24.04.2013 | ||
LT | 24.04.2013 | ||
LV | 24.04.2013 | ||
MC | 24.04.2013 | ||
NL | 24.04.2013 | ||
PL | 24.04.2013 | ||
RO | 24.04.2013 | ||
SE | 24.04.2013 | ||
SI | 24.04.2013 | ||
SK | 24.04.2013 | ||
BG | 24.07.2013 | ||
GR | 25.07.2013 | ||
ES | 04.08.2013 | ||
IS | 24.08.2013 | ||
PT | 26.08.2013 | ||
GB | 12.10.2013 | ||
CH | 31.10.2013 | ||
FR | 31.10.2013 | ||
LI | 31.10.2013 | ||
Former [2014/34] | CY | 24.04.2013 | |
CZ | 24.04.2013 | ||
DK | 24.04.2013 | ||
EE | 24.04.2013 | ||
FI | 24.04.2013 | ||
IT | 24.04.2013 | ||
LT | 24.04.2013 | ||
LV | 24.04.2013 | ||
MC | 24.04.2013 | ||
NL | 24.04.2013 | ||
PL | 24.04.2013 | ||
RO | 24.04.2013 | ||
SE | 24.04.2013 | ||
SI | 24.04.2013 | ||
SK | 24.04.2013 | ||
BG | 24.07.2013 | ||
GR | 25.07.2013 | ||
ES | 04.08.2013 | ||
IS | 24.08.2013 | ||
PT | 26.08.2013 | ||
GB | 12.10.2013 | ||
CH | 31.10.2013 | ||
LI | 31.10.2013 | ||
Former [2014/25] | CY | 24.04.2013 | |
CZ | 24.04.2013 | ||
DK | 24.04.2013 | ||
EE | 24.04.2013 | ||
FI | 24.04.2013 | ||
IT | 24.04.2013 | ||
LT | 24.04.2013 | ||
LV | 24.04.2013 | ||
MC | 24.04.2013 | ||
NL | 24.04.2013 | ||
PL | 24.04.2013 | ||
RO | 24.04.2013 | ||
SE | 24.04.2013 | ||
SI | 24.04.2013 | ||
SK | 24.04.2013 | ||
BG | 24.07.2013 | ||
GR | 25.07.2013 | ||
ES | 04.08.2013 | ||
IS | 24.08.2013 | ||
PT | 26.08.2013 | ||
Former [2014/14] | CY | 24.04.2013 | |
CZ | 24.04.2013 | ||
DK | 24.04.2013 | ||
EE | 24.04.2013 | ||
FI | 24.04.2013 | ||
IT | 24.04.2013 | ||
LT | 24.04.2013 | ||
LV | 24.04.2013 | ||
NL | 24.04.2013 | ||
PL | 24.04.2013 | ||
RO | 24.04.2013 | ||
SE | 24.04.2013 | ||
SI | 24.04.2013 | ||
SK | 24.04.2013 | ||
BG | 24.07.2013 | ||
GR | 25.07.2013 | ||
ES | 04.08.2013 | ||
IS | 24.08.2013 | ||
PT | 26.08.2013 | ||
Former [2014/11] | CY | 24.04.2013 | |
CZ | 24.04.2013 | ||
DK | 24.04.2013 | ||
EE | 24.04.2013 | ||
FI | 24.04.2013 | ||
IT | 24.04.2013 | ||
LT | 24.04.2013 | ||
LV | 24.04.2013 | ||
PL | 24.04.2013 | ||
RO | 24.04.2013 | ||
SE | 24.04.2013 | ||
SI | 24.04.2013 | ||
SK | 24.04.2013 | ||
BG | 24.07.2013 | ||
GR | 25.07.2013 | ||
ES | 04.08.2013 | ||
IS | 24.08.2013 | ||
PT | 26.08.2013 | ||
Former [2014/10] | CY | 24.04.2013 | |
CZ | 24.04.2013 | ||
DK | 24.04.2013 | ||
EE | 24.04.2013 | ||
FI | 24.04.2013 | ||
LT | 24.04.2013 | ||
LV | 24.04.2013 | ||
PL | 24.04.2013 | ||
SE | 24.04.2013 | ||
SI | 24.04.2013 | ||
SK | 24.04.2013 | ||
BG | 24.07.2013 | ||
GR | 25.07.2013 | ||
ES | 04.08.2013 | ||
IS | 24.08.2013 | ||
PT | 26.08.2013 | ||
Former [2014/09] | CY | 24.04.2013 | |
DK | 24.04.2013 | ||
EE | 24.04.2013 | ||
FI | 24.04.2013 | ||
LT | 24.04.2013 | ||
LV | 24.04.2013 | ||
PL | 24.04.2013 | ||
SE | 24.04.2013 | ||
SI | 24.04.2013 | ||
BG | 24.07.2013 | ||
GR | 25.07.2013 | ||
ES | 04.08.2013 | ||
IS | 24.08.2013 | ||
PT | 26.08.2013 | ||
Former [2013/52] | CY | 24.04.2013 | |
FI | 24.04.2013 | ||
LT | 24.04.2013 | ||
LV | 24.04.2013 | ||
PL | 24.04.2013 | ||
SE | 24.04.2013 | ||
SI | 24.04.2013 | ||
BG | 24.07.2013 | ||
GR | 25.07.2013 | ||
ES | 04.08.2013 | ||
IS | 24.08.2013 | ||
PT | 26.08.2013 | ||
Former [2013/50] | FI | 24.04.2013 | |
LT | 24.04.2013 | ||
LV | 24.04.2013 | ||
PL | 24.04.2013 | ||
SE | 24.04.2013 | ||
SI | 24.04.2013 | ||
BG | 24.07.2013 | ||
GR | 25.07.2013 | ||
ES | 04.08.2013 | ||
IS | 24.08.2013 | ||
PT | 26.08.2013 | ||
Former [2013/49] | FI | 24.04.2013 | |
LT | 24.04.2013 | ||
SE | 24.04.2013 | ||
SI | 24.04.2013 | ||
GR | 25.07.2013 | ||
ES | 04.08.2013 | ||
IS | 24.08.2013 | ||
PT | 26.08.2013 | ||
Former [2013/48] | LT | 24.04.2013 | |
ES | 04.08.2013 | ||
IS | 24.08.2013 | ||
PT | 26.08.2013 | ||
Former [2013/47] | LT | 24.04.2013 | |
PT | 26.08.2013 | Cited in | International search | [XY]EP0038524 (GEKA BRUSH GEORG KARL GMBH [DE]) [X] 1,3,5,6,9-11,13,21-44 * page 3, line 3 - line 17 * * page 4, line 22 - line 35 * * page 6, line 7 - line 13 * * page 9, line 28 - page 12, line 12 * * figure - * [Y] 2,4,7,8,14-16; | [Y]US4635659 (SPATZ WALTER [US]) [Y] 2,4,7,8,14-16 * column 3, line 23 - line 36 * * column 4, line 36 - line 47 * * column 4, line 65 - column 5, line 53; figure - *; | [A]EP0965286 (OREAL [FR]) [A] 1,5,6,9-16,21,30,44 * paragraphs [0027] , [0028] , [0035] - [0037] - [0048] , [0049] , [0069] - [0079]; figures 16,20,21 *; | [A]WO0054623 (CORONET WERKE GMBH [DE], et al) [A] 1-44 * the whole document *; | [A]WO03032769 (COTY SA [FR], et al) [A] 1-44 * the whole document * | Examination | EP0875169 | by applicant | US6616366 |