EP1848321 - APPARATUSES AND METHODS FOR NON-INVASIVELY MONITORING BLOOD PARAMETERS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 10.02.2017 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.02.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 15.03.2017 [2017/11] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Covidien LP 15 Hampshire Street Mansfield, MA 02048 / US | [2014/15] |
Former [2013/41] | For all designated states Rader, Fishman & Grauer PLLC 39533 Woodward Ave., Suite 140 Michigan 48304 / US | ||
Former [2007/44] | For all designated states Optical Vitals, LLC 20 N. Meridian Street Suite 801 Indianapolis IN 46204 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HENDERSON, Leslie, G. 6345 E. 226th St. Cicero, IN 46034 / US | 02 /
BAILEY, Theodore, M. 9316 Oak Run Circle Indianapolis, IN 46260 / US | [2007/44] | Representative(s) | McCartney, Jonathan William, et al Haseltine Lake LLP Redcliff Quay 120 Redcliff Street Bristol BS1 6HU / GB | [2013/46] |
Former [2008/38] | Cheyne, John Robert Alexander M. HASELTINE LAKE Redcliff Quay 120 Redcliff Street Bristol BS1 6HU / GB | ||
Former [2007/44] | Cheyne, John Robert Alexander M. HASELTINE LAKE, Redcliff Quay 120 Redcliff Street Bristol BS1 6HU / GB | Application number, filing date | 05802897.8 | 04.10.2005 | [2007/44] | WO2005US35520 | Priority number, date | US20040958458 | 05.10.2004 Original published format: US 958458 | [2007/44] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2006041789 | Date: | 20.04.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/16] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1848321 | Date: | 31.10.2007 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 20.04.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/44] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 01.06.2006 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.02.2011 | Classification | IPC: | A61B5/021, A61B5/024, A61B5/1455 | [2016/19] | CPC: |
A61B5/02416 (EP,US);
A61B5/0059 (EP,US);
A61B5/021 (EP,US);
A61B5/02125 (EP,US);
A61B5/14551 (EP,US);
A61B5/14552 (EP,US);
A61B5/6814 (EP,US);
A61B5/6826 (EP,US);
A61B5/6838 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2011/09] | A61B5/1455, A61B5/024, A61B5/00 | ||
Former IPC [2007/44] | A61B5/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/44] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNGEN UND VERFAHREN ZUM NICHT INVASIVEN ÜBERWACHEN VON BLUTPARAMETERN | [2007/44] | English: | APPARATUSES AND METHODS FOR NON-INVASIVELY MONITORING BLOOD PARAMETERS | [2007/44] | French: | APPAREILS ET PROCEDES POUR LE CONTROLE NON INVASIF DE PARAMETRES SANGUINS | [2007/44] | Entry into regional phase | 20.08.2007 | National basic fee paid | 20.08.2007 | Search fee paid | 20.08.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.08.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 07.04.2006 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 20.08.2007 | Examination requested [2007/44] | 16.08.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 14.02.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.06.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.05.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.09.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2017/11] | 31.10.2016 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2017/11] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 14.02.2012 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.10.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.10.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.10.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.10.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 25.10.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 25.10.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 27.12.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 23.10.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 26.10.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 25.10.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 20.08.2007 | AT   M01   Fee paid on   20.08.2007 | 20.08.2007 | BE   M01   Fee paid on   20.08.2007 | 20.08.2007 | BG   M01   Fee paid on   20.08.2007 | 20.08.2007 | CH   M01   Fee paid on   20.08.2007 | 20.08.2007 | CY   M01   Fee paid on   20.08.2007 | 20.08.2007 | CZ   M01   Fee paid on   20.08.2007 | 20.08.2007 | DE   M01   Fee paid on   20.08.2007 | 20.08.2007 | DK   M01   Fee paid on   20.08.2007 | 20.08.2007 | EE   M01   Fee paid on   20.08.2007 | 20.08.2007 | ES   M01   Fee paid on   20.08.2007 | 20.08.2007 | FI   M01   Fee paid on   20.08.2007 | 20.08.2007 | FR   M01   Fee paid on   20.08.2007 | 20.08.2007 | GB   M01   Fee paid on   20.08.2007 | 20.08.2007 | GR   M01   Fee paid on   20.08.2007 | 20.08.2007 | HU   M01   Fee paid on   20.08.2007 | 20.08.2007 | IE   M01   Fee paid on   20.08.2007 | 20.08.2007 | IS   M01   Fee paid on   20.08.2007 | 20.08.2007 | IT   M01   Fee paid on   20.08.2007 | 20.08.2007 | LT   M01   Fee paid on   20.08.2007 | 20.08.2007 | LU   M01   Fee paid on   20.08.2007 | 20.08.2007 | LV   M01   Fee paid on   20.08.2007 | 20.08.2007 | MC   M01   Fee paid on   20.08.2007 | 20.08.2007 | NL   M01   Fee paid on   20.08.2007 | 20.08.2007 | PL   M01   Fee paid on   20.08.2007 | 20.08.2007 | PT   M01   Fee paid on   20.08.2007 | 20.08.2007 | RO   M01   Fee paid on   20.08.2007 | 20.08.2007 | SE   M01   Fee paid on   20.08.2007 | 20.08.2007 | SI   M01   Fee paid on   20.08.2007 | 20.08.2007 | SK   M01   Fee paid on   20.08.2007 | 20.08.2007 | TR   M01   Fee paid on   20.08.2007 | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 20.08.2007 | M01   Fee paid on   20.08.2007 | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.2013 | 09   M06   Fee paid on   27.12.2013 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [I]WO9203966 (UNIV UTAH [US]) [I] 3,4 * page 9, lines 12-33; figures 1-4 * * page 11, line 13 - page 12, line 19 * * page 31, line 20 - page 32, line 7 *; | [I]EP0638281 (SEIKO EPSON CORP [JP]) [I] 3,4 * abstract * * column 1, lines 34-52 * * column 3, lines 1-6 * * column 8, lines 20-29 * * column 13, lines 15-23 *; | [I]WO9518564 (VITAL INSITE INC [US]) [I] 3,4 * page 1, lines 1-7; figure 7; claim 1 * * page 6, lines 27-33 * * page 7, line 30 - page 8, line 3 * * page 9, lines 19-24 *; | [A]US2003036690 (GEDDES LESLIE A [US], et al) [A] 3,4* paragraphs [0002] , [0007] , [0036] - [0037]; figures 1-3,9,10 * | International search | [X]US2003036690 ; | [X]US5247931 ; | [X]US5111817 ; | [A]US5379774 |