EP1799825 - APTAMER REGULATED NUCLEIC ACIDS AND USES THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 04.05.2012 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.10.2013 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 06.11.2013 [2013/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states The California Institute of Technology 1200 East California Boulevard Pasadena California 91125 / US | [2007/26] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SMOLKE, Christina, D. 856 South Marengo, Nr. 2 Pasadena, CA 91106 / US | 02 /
BAYER, Travis, S. 791 East California Boulevard Pasadena, CA 91106 / US | [2007/43] |
Former [2007/26] | 01 /
SMOLKE, Christina, D. 315 Sycamore Glen Pasadena, CA 91105 / US | ||
02 /
BAYER, Travis, S. 791 East California Boulevard Pasadena, CA 91106 / US | Representative(s) | Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/35] | Vossius & Partner Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | ||
Former [2007/26] | Vossius & Partner Siebertstrasse 4 81675 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 05803129.5 | 05.10.2005 | [2007/26] | WO2005US36161 | Priority number, date | US20040615977P | 05.10.2004 Original published format: US 615977 P | US20050641658P | 06.01.2005 Original published format: US 641658 P | [2007/26] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2006042112 | Date: | 20.04.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/16] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1799825 | Date: | 27.06.2007 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 20.04.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/26] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1799825 | Date: | 29.06.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/26] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 21.12.2006 | Classification | IPC: | C12N15/113, C12N15/115, C12N15/67, C12Q1/68, A61K31/713 | [2010/43] | CPC: |
C12N15/111 (EP,US);
C12Q1/686 (US);
A61P3/04 (EP);
A61P3/10 (EP);
A61P31/00 (EP);
A61P31/04 (EP);
A61P35/00 (EP);
A61P37/04 (EP);
A61P43/00 (EP);
C12N15/113 (EP,US);
C12N15/115 (EP,US);
C12N15/635 (EP,US);
C12Q1/6897 (EP,US);
A61K38/00 (EP,US);
C12N2310/11 (EP,US);
| C-Set: |
C12Q1/6897, C12Q2525/205 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2007/26] | C12N15/11, C12N15/67, C12Q1/68, A61K38/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/26] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | APTAMER-REGULIERTE NUKLEINSÄUREN UND VERWENDUNGEN DAVON | [2007/26] | English: | APTAMER REGULATED NUCLEIC ACIDS AND USES THEREOF | [2007/26] | French: | ACIDES NUCLEIQUES A REGULATION D'APTAMERES ET LEURS UTILISATIONS | [2007/26] | Entry into regional phase | 04.04.2007 | National basic fee paid | 04.04.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 04.04.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 04.04.2007 | Examination requested [2007/26] | 11.02.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.06.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.03.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.07.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.12.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.05.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 04.05.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 11.02.2008 | Opposition(s) | 30.03.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit [2012/23] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.10.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.10.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.10.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.10.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 29.06.2011 | BE | 29.06.2011 | CY | 29.06.2011 | CZ | 29.06.2011 | DK | 29.06.2011 | EE | 29.06.2011 | FI | 29.06.2011 | HU | 29.06.2011 | IT | 29.06.2011 | LT | 29.06.2011 | LV | 29.06.2011 | NL | 29.06.2011 | PL | 29.06.2011 | RO | 29.06.2011 | SE | 29.06.2011 | SI | 29.06.2011 | SK | 29.06.2011 | TR | 29.06.2011 | BG | 29.09.2011 | GR | 30.09.2011 | IE | 05.10.2011 | LU | 05.10.2011 | ES | 10.10.2011 | IS | 29.10.2011 | MC | 31.10.2011 | PT | 31.10.2011 | [2013/45] |
Former [2013/44] | AT | 29.06.2011 | |
BE | 29.06.2011 | ||
CY | 29.06.2011 | ||
CZ | 29.06.2011 | ||
DK | 29.06.2011 | ||
EE | 29.06.2011 | ||
FI | 29.06.2011 | ||
IT | 29.06.2011 | ||
LT | 29.06.2011 | ||
LV | 29.06.2011 | ||
NL | 29.06.2011 | ||
PL | 29.06.2011 | ||
RO | 29.06.2011 | ||
SE | 29.06.2011 | ||
SI | 29.06.2011 | ||
SK | 29.06.2011 | ||
TR | 29.06.2011 | ||
BG | 29.09.2011 | ||
GR | 30.09.2011 | ||
IE | 05.10.2011 | ||
LU | 05.10.2011 | ||
ES | 10.10.2011 | ||
IS | 29.10.2011 | ||
MC | 31.10.2011 | ||
PT | 31.10.2011 | ||
Former [2013/29] | AT | 29.06.2011 | |
BE | 29.06.2011 | ||
CY | 29.06.2011 | ||
CZ | 29.06.2011 | ||
DK | 29.06.2011 | ||
EE | 29.06.2011 | ||
FI | 29.06.2011 | ||
IT | 29.06.2011 | ||
LT | 29.06.2011 | ||
LV | 29.06.2011 | ||
NL | 29.06.2011 | ||
PL | 29.06.2011 | ||
RO | 29.06.2011 | ||
SE | 29.06.2011 | ||
SI | 29.06.2011 | ||
SK | 29.06.2011 | ||
BG | 29.09.2011 | ||
GR | 30.09.2011 | ||
IE | 05.10.2011 | ||
LU | 05.10.2011 | ||
ES | 10.10.2011 | ||
IS | 29.10.2011 | ||
MC | 31.10.2011 | ||
PT | 31.10.2011 | ||
Former [2013/25] | AT | 29.06.2011 | |
BE | 29.06.2011 | ||
CY | 29.06.2011 | ||
CZ | 29.06.2011 | ||
DK | 29.06.2011 | ||
EE | 29.06.2011 | ||
FI | 29.06.2011 | ||
IT | 29.06.2011 | ||
LT | 29.06.2011 | ||
LV | 29.06.2011 | ||
NL | 29.06.2011 | ||
PL | 29.06.2011 | ||
RO | 29.06.2011 | ||
SE | 29.06.2011 | ||
SI | 29.06.2011 | ||
SK | 29.06.2011 | ||
GR | 30.09.2011 | ||
IE | 05.10.2011 | ||
LU | 05.10.2011 | ||
ES | 10.10.2011 | ||
IS | 29.10.2011 | ||
MC | 31.10.2011 | ||
PT | 31.10.2011 | ||
Former [2013/22] | AT | 29.06.2011 | |
BE | 29.06.2011 | ||
CY | 29.06.2011 | ||
CZ | 29.06.2011 | ||
DK | 29.06.2011 | ||
EE | 29.06.2011 | ||
FI | 29.06.2011 | ||
IT | 29.06.2011 | ||
LT | 29.06.2011 | ||
LV | 29.06.2011 | ||
NL | 29.06.2011 | ||
PL | 29.06.2011 | ||
RO | 29.06.2011 | ||
SE | 29.06.2011 | ||
SI | 29.06.2011 | ||
SK | 29.06.2011 | ||
GR | 30.09.2011 | ||
IE | 05.10.2011 | ||
ES | 10.10.2011 | ||
IS | 29.10.2011 | ||
MC | 31.10.2011 | ||
PT | 31.10.2011 | ||
Former [2012/47] | AT | 29.06.2011 | |
BE | 29.06.2011 | ||
CY | 29.06.2011 | ||
CZ | 29.06.2011 | ||
DK | 29.06.2011 | ||
EE | 29.06.2011 | ||
FI | 29.06.2011 | ||
IT | 29.06.2011 | ||
LT | 29.06.2011 | ||
LV | 29.06.2011 | ||
NL | 29.06.2011 | ||
PL | 29.06.2011 | ||
RO | 29.06.2011 | ||
SE | 29.06.2011 | ||
SI | 29.06.2011 | ||
SK | 29.06.2011 | ||
GR | 30.09.2011 | ||
IE | 05.10.2011 | ||
IS | 29.10.2011 | ||
MC | 31.10.2011 | ||
PT | 31.10.2011 | ||
Former [2012/31] | AT | 29.06.2011 | |
BE | 29.06.2011 | ||
CY | 29.06.2011 | ||
CZ | 29.06.2011 | ||
DK | 29.06.2011 | ||
EE | 29.06.2011 | ||
FI | 29.06.2011 | ||
IT | 29.06.2011 | ||
LT | 29.06.2011 | ||
LV | 29.06.2011 | ||
NL | 29.06.2011 | ||
PL | 29.06.2011 | ||
RO | 29.06.2011 | ||
SE | 29.06.2011 | ||
SI | 29.06.2011 | ||
SK | 29.06.2011 | ||
GR | 30.09.2011 | ||
IS | 29.10.2011 | ||
MC | 31.10.2011 | ||
PT | 31.10.2011 | ||
Former [2012/25] | AT | 29.06.2011 | |
BE | 29.06.2011 | ||
CY | 29.06.2011 | ||
CZ | 29.06.2011 | ||
EE | 29.06.2011 | ||
FI | 29.06.2011 | ||
IT | 29.06.2011 | ||
LT | 29.06.2011 | ||
LV | 29.06.2011 | ||
NL | 29.06.2011 | ||
PL | 29.06.2011 | ||
RO | 29.06.2011 | ||
SE | 29.06.2011 | ||
SI | 29.06.2011 | ||
SK | 29.06.2011 | ||
GR | 30.09.2011 | ||
IS | 29.10.2011 | ||
MC | 31.10.2011 | ||
PT | 31.10.2011 | ||
Former [2012/23] | AT | 29.06.2011 | |
BE | 29.06.2011 | ||
CY | 29.06.2011 | ||
CZ | 29.06.2011 | ||
EE | 29.06.2011 | ||
FI | 29.06.2011 | ||
IT | 29.06.2011 | ||
LT | 29.06.2011 | ||
LV | 29.06.2011 | ||
NL | 29.06.2011 | ||
PL | 29.06.2011 | ||
RO | 29.06.2011 | ||
SE | 29.06.2011 | ||
SI | 29.06.2011 | ||
SK | 29.06.2011 | ||
GR | 30.09.2011 | ||
IS | 29.10.2011 | ||
PT | 31.10.2011 | ||
Former [2012/12] | AT | 29.06.2011 | |
BE | 29.06.2011 | ||
CY | 29.06.2011 | ||
CZ | 29.06.2011 | ||
EE | 29.06.2011 | ||
FI | 29.06.2011 | ||
LT | 29.06.2011 | ||
LV | 29.06.2011 | ||
NL | 29.06.2011 | ||
PL | 29.06.2011 | ||
RO | 29.06.2011 | ||
SE | 29.06.2011 | ||
SI | 29.06.2011 | ||
SK | 29.06.2011 | ||
GR | 30.09.2011 | ||
IS | 29.10.2011 | ||
PT | 31.10.2011 | ||
Former [2012/11] | AT | 29.06.2011 | |
BE | 29.06.2011 | ||
CZ | 29.06.2011 | ||
EE | 29.06.2011 | ||
FI | 29.06.2011 | ||
LT | 29.06.2011 | ||
LV | 29.06.2011 | ||
NL | 29.06.2011 | ||
PL | 29.06.2011 | ||
RO | 29.06.2011 | ||
SE | 29.06.2011 | ||
SI | 29.06.2011 | ||
SK | 29.06.2011 | ||
GR | 30.09.2011 | ||
IS | 29.10.2011 | ||
PT | 31.10.2011 | ||
Former [2012/10] | AT | 29.06.2011 | |
BE | 29.06.2011 | ||
CZ | 29.06.2011 | ||
EE | 29.06.2011 | ||
FI | 29.06.2011 | ||
LT | 29.06.2011 | ||
LV | 29.06.2011 | ||
NL | 29.06.2011 | ||
RO | 29.06.2011 | ||
SE | 29.06.2011 | ||
SI | 29.06.2011 | ||
SK | 29.06.2011 | ||
GR | 30.09.2011 | ||
IS | 29.10.2011 | ||
PT | 31.10.2011 | ||
Former [2012/09] | AT | 29.06.2011 | |
BE | 29.06.2011 | ||
CZ | 29.06.2011 | ||
EE | 29.06.2011 | ||
FI | 29.06.2011 | ||
LT | 29.06.2011 | ||
LV | 29.06.2011 | ||
NL | 29.06.2011 | ||
SE | 29.06.2011 | ||
SI | 29.06.2011 | ||
GR | 30.09.2011 | ||
IS | 29.10.2011 | ||
PT | 31.10.2011 | ||
Former [2012/08] | AT | 29.06.2011 | |
BE | 29.06.2011 | ||
EE | 29.06.2011 | ||
FI | 29.06.2011 | ||
LT | 29.06.2011 | ||
LV | 29.06.2011 | ||
NL | 29.06.2011 | ||
SE | 29.06.2011 | ||
SI | 29.06.2011 | ||
GR | 30.09.2011 | ||
IS | 29.10.2011 | ||
Former [2012/05] | AT | 29.06.2011 | |
BE | 29.06.2011 | ||
FI | 29.06.2011 | ||
LT | 29.06.2011 | ||
LV | 29.06.2011 | ||
SE | 29.06.2011 | ||
SI | 29.06.2011 | ||
GR | 30.09.2011 | ||
Former [2011/52] | AT | 29.06.2011 | |
FI | 29.06.2011 | ||
LT | 29.06.2011 | ||
LV | 29.06.2011 | ||
SE | 29.06.2011 | ||
SI | 29.06.2011 | ||
GR | 30.09.2011 | ||
Former [2011/50] | FI | 29.06.2011 | |
LT | 29.06.2011 | ||
LV | 29.06.2011 | ||
SE | 29.06.2011 | ||
SI | 29.06.2011 | ||
GR | 30.09.2011 | ||
Former [2011/49] | FI | 29.06.2011 | |
LT | 29.06.2011 | ||
SE | 29.06.2011 | ||
GR | 30.09.2011 | ||
Former [2011/48] | LT | 29.06.2011 | |
SE | 29.06.2011 | Cited in | International search | [A]WO9904800 (GENITRIX LLC [US], et al) [A] * the whole document *; | [A]US2002150996 (NILSEN-HAMILTON MARIT [US]) [A] * the whole document *; | [X] - WINKLER W.C. ET AL., "An mRNA structure that controls gene expression by binding FMN", PROCEEDINGS OF THE NATIONAL ACADEMY OF SCIENCES OF THE USA, (20021210), vol. 99, no. 25, pages 15908 - 15913, XP002374934 [X] 1,5,9,17,18,29,31,32,34-36 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1073/pnas.212628899 | [X] - WINKLER W.C. AND BREAKER R.R., "Genetic control by metabolite-binding riboswitches", CHEMBIOCHEM, (2003), vol. 4, pages 1024 - 1032, XP002374935 [X] 1,5,9,17,18,29,31,32,34-36 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/cbic.200300685 | [X] - FREDRIKSSON S. ET AL., "Protein detection using proximity-dependent DNA ligation assays", NATURE BIOTECHNOLOGY, (200205), vol. 20, pages 473 - 477, XP002375040 [X] 1,8,14,17,18,31,33,34,37 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/nbt0502-473 | [X] - FAMULOK M., "Bringing picomolar protein detection into proximity", NATURE BIOTECHNOLOGY, (200205), vol. 20, pages 448 - 449, XP002375041 [X] 1,8,14,17,18,31,33,34,37 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/nbt0502-448 | [AD] - NUTIU R. AND LI Y., "Structure-switching signaling aptamers: transducing molecular recognition into fluorescence signaling", CHEMISTRY, (20040419), vol. 10, no. 8, pages 1868 - 1876, XP002374936 [AD] * figure 5 * * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/chem.200305470 | [A] - NUTIU R. AND LI Y., "Structure-switching signaling aptamers", THE JOURNAL OF THE AMERICAN CHEMICAL SOCIETY, (2003), vol. 125, no. 16, page 4771-4778/S1, XP002374937 [A] * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/ja028962o | [AD] - BUSKIRK A.R. ET AL., "Engineering a ligand-dependent RNA transcriptional activator", CHEMISTRY & BIOLOGY, (20040820), vol. 11, no. 8, pages 1157 - 1163, XP002374938 [AD] * figure 1 * * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.chembiol.2004.05.017 | [A] - BUSKIRK A.R. ET AL., "In vivo evolution of an RNA-based transcriptional activator", CHEMISTRY & BIOLOGY, (200306), vol. 10, pages 533 - 540, XP002374939 [A] * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S1074-5521(03)00109-1 | [AD] - HESSELBERTH J.R. ET AL., "Simultaneous detection of diverse analytes with an aptazyme ligase array", ANALYTICAL BIOCHEMISTRY, (20030115), vol. 312, no. 2, pages 106 - 112, XP002374940 [AD] * figure 2 * * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0003-2697(02)00441-4 | [A] - LUZI E. ET AL., "New trends in affinity sensing: aptamers for ligand binding", TRENDS IN ANALYTICAL CHEMISTRY, (200312), vol. 22, no. 11, pages 810 - 818, XP002374941 [A] * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0165-9936(03)01208-1 | [A] - SILVERMAN SCOTT K., "Rube Goldberg goes (ribo)nuclear ? Molecular switches and sensors made from RNA", RNA, New York, (200304), vol. 9, no. 4, pages 377 - 383, XP002374942 [A] * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1261/rna.2200903 |