20.02.2015 |
Application deemed to be withdrawn |
published on 25.03.2015 [2015/13] |
05.11.2014 |
New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: despatch of communication + time limit |
|
04.11.2014 |
New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit |
|
07.02.2014 |
Supplementary search report |
published on 12.03.2014 [2014/11] |
07.02.2014 |
Change - classification |
published on 12.03.2014 [2014/11] |
07.02.2014 |
Change - classification |
published on 12.03.2014 [2014/11] |
16.09.2013 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
02.10.2012 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
06.10.2011 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
17.09.2010 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
22.09.2009 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
31.07.2009 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
19.06.2009 |
Change - classification |
published on 22.07.2009 [2009/30] |
19.06.2009 |
Change - classification |
published on 22.07.2009 [2009/30] |
17.04.2009 |
Change - PCT data |
published on 20.05.2009 [2009/21] |
20.09.2008 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
20.06.2008 |
Change - inventor |
published on 23.07.2008 [2008/30] |
23.05.2008 |
Change - extension states |
published on 25.06.2008 [2008/26] |
09.11.2007 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 12.12.2007 [2007/50] |
09.11.2007 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 12.12.2007 [2007/50] |
31.10.2007 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
12.10.2007 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
10.10.2007 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
05.10.2006 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
03.10.2006 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
20.12.2005 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|