Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US7573005 | Global Dossier | 11.08.2009 | B2 | US2005247696 | 10.11.2005 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US56411104 | 22.04.2004 | US8343205 | 18.03.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP5064372B | Global Dossier | 31.10.2012 | B2 | JP2008537284 | 11.09.2008 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2005US33596 | 16.09.2005 | US8343205 | 18.03.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1864550 | Global Dossier | 12.03.2014 | A4 | EP1864550 | 12.12.2007 | A2 | Priority number | Date | WO2005US33596 | 16.09.2005 | US8343205 | 18.03.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2601543 | 28.09.2006 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2005US33596 | 16.09.2005 | US8343205 | 18.03.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN101444138B | 12.10.2011 | B | CN101444138 | 27.05.2009 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2005US33596 | 16.09.2005 | US8343205 | 18.03.2005 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2006101518 | Global Dossier | 16.04.2009 | A3 | WO2006101518 | 28.09.2006 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US8343205 | 18.03.2005 |