EP1864550 - BOIL DETECTION METHOD AND COMPUTER PROGRAM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 20.02.2015 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.02.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 25.03.2015 [2015/13] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Thermal Solutions, Inc. 8441 E. 32nd Street North Suite 110 Wichita, KS 67226 / US | [2007/50] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CLOTHIER, Brian, L. 9431 Cross Creek Street Wichita, Kansas 67206 / US | [2008/30] |
Former [2007/50] | 01 /
CLOTHIER, Brian, L. 3000 Winfield Wichita, KS 67210 / US | Representative(s) | Landry, Felix Uexküll & Stolberg Partnerschaft von Patent- und Rechtsanwälten mbB Beselerstrasse 4 22607 Hamburg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2007/50] | Landry, Felix Uexküll & Stolberg Patentanwälte Beselerstrasse 4 D-22607 Hamburg / DE | Application number, filing date | 05803332.5 | 16.09.2005 | [2007/50] | WO2005US33596 | Priority number, date | US20050083432 | 18.03.2005 Original published format: US 83432 | [2007/50] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2006101518 | Date: | 28.09.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/39] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1864550 | Date: | 12.12.2007 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 28.09.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/50] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 16.04.2009 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.02.2014 | Classification | IPC: | A23L1/00, G05D23/00, H05B6/12, H05B1/02 | [2009/30] | CPC: |
H05B6/1209 (EP,US);
H05B3/746 (EP,US);
H05B6/062 (EP,US);
H05B2213/06 (EP,US);
H05B2213/07 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2007/50] | H05B1/02 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/50] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | KOCHDETEKTIONSVERFAHREN UND COMPUTERPROGRAMM | [2007/50] | English: | BOIL DETECTION METHOD AND COMPUTER PROGRAM | [2007/50] | French: | PROCEDE ET LOGICIEL DE DETECTION D'EBULLITION | [2007/50] | Entry into regional phase | 01.10.2007 | National basic fee paid | 01.10.2007 | Search fee paid | 01.10.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 01.10.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 01.10.2007 | Examination requested [2007/50] | 27.07.2009 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 11.09.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2015/13] | 03.11.2014 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2015/13] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 01.10.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.09.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 11.09.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 29.09.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 27.09.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 12.09.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.2014 | 10   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]WO0119141 (THERMAL SOLUTIONS INC [US], et al) [Y] 3,8,9* figure 1 *; | [XYI]US6236025 (BERKCAN ERTUGRUL [US], et al) [X] 1,2,4,5,7 * column 2, line 58 - line 65; claims 1,32 * * sentence 18 - sentence 21; figures 6,7 * * column 2, line 45 - line 57; claim 4 * [Y] 3,8,9 [I] 6 | International search | [X]US5096725 (KIM KYUNG H [KR]); | [Y]US6320169 (CLOTHIER BRIAN L [US]); | [Y]JP2004103286 (SANYO ELECTRIC CO, et al) |