EP1800394 - CURRENT LIMITING CIRCUIT FOR HIGH-SPEED LOW-SIDE DRIVER OUTPUTS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 07.10.2011 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.10.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 09.11.2011 [2011/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Texas Instruments Incorporated P.O. Box 655474, M/S 3999 Dallas, TX 75265-5474 / US | [2007/26] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ADAMS, Reed, W. 4413 Fairfax Hill Drive Plano, TX 75024 / US | 02 /
SCHMIDT, Thomas, A. 632 John Close Murphy, TX 75094 / US | 03 /
RAJASEKHAR, Suribhotla, V. 5808 Mulvane Drive Plano, TX 75094 / US | [2007/26] | Representative(s) | Holt, Michael Texas Instruments Limited European Patent Department 3rd Floor 401 Grafton Gate Milton Keynes MK9 1AQ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2008/33] | Holt, Michael Texas Instruments Limited European Patents Department 800 Pavilion Drive Northampton NN4 7YL / GB | ||
Former [2007/26] | Holt, Michael Texas Instruments, Ltd. Patents 800 Pavillon Drive Northhampton Business Park Northampton Northamptonshire NN4 7YL / GB | Application number, filing date | 05803346.5 | 28.09.2005 | [2007/26] | WO2005US34594 | Priority number, date | US20040951969 | 28.09.2004 Original published format: US 951969 | [2007/26] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2006036963 | Date: | 06.04.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/14] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1800394 | Date: | 27.06.2007 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.04.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/26] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1800394 | Date: | 01.12.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/48] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 26.05.2006 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.11.2008 | Classification | IPC: | H03K17/082 | [2008/49] | CPC: |
H03K17/165 (EP,US);
H03K17/0822 (EP,US);
H03K5/1252 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2007/26] | H03B1/00 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2008/01] |
Former [2007/26] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | STROMBEGRENZUNGSSCHALTUNG FÜR SCHNELLE LOW-SIDE-TREIBERAUSGANGSSIGNALE | [2007/26] | English: | CURRENT LIMITING CIRCUIT FOR HIGH-SPEED LOW-SIDE DRIVER OUTPUTS | [2007/26] | French: | CIRCUIT LIMITEUR DE COURANT DES SIGNAUX D'ALARME DU CONDUCTEUR A GRANDE VITESSE ET BASSE INTENSITE | [2007/26] | Entry into regional phase | 02.05.2007 | National basic fee paid | 02.05.2007 | Search fee paid | 02.05.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 02.05.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 02.05.2007 | Examination requested [2007/26] | 30.12.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 30.06.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.04.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.08.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 24.08.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 02.09.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit [2011/45] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 01.10.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.09.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.09.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0314221 (PHILIPS NV [NL]) [A] 1,2,5,6,9 * figure 3 *; | [A]WO9612346 (PHILIPS ELECTRONICS NV [NL], et al) [A] 1,2,5,6,9 * figure 1 *; | [A]EP0808025 (DENSO CORP [JP]) [A] 1,2,5,6,9* figure 1 *; | [A]DE19823768 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]) [A] 1,2,5,6,9 * figure 4 *; | [A]GB2384632 (ZETEX PLC [GB]) [A] 1,2,5,6,9 * figure 2 * | International search | [A]US5796278 (OSBORN DOUGLAS BRUCE [US], et al); | [A]US5936387 (TABATA MASAFUMI [JP], et al); | [A]US6333665 (ICHIKAWA KOHSAKU [JP]) | by applicant | EP0314221 | WO9612346 | EP0808025 | US5796278 | US5936387 | DE19823768 | US6333665 | GB2384632 |