EP1833351 - DISHWASHER COMPRISING A DRYING APPARATUS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 13.05.2011 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.09.2012 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): LU | published on 31.10.2012 [2012/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BSH Bosch und Siemens Hausgeräte GmbH Carl-Wery-Strasse 34 81739 München / DE | [2010/27] |
Former [2007/38] | For all designated states BSH Bosch und Siemens Hausgeräte GmbH Carl-Wery-Str. 34 81739 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
PAINTNER, Kai Steigfeldstrasse 20 86477 Adeslried / DE | [2007/38] | Application number, filing date | 05803399.4 | 25.10.2005 | [2007/38] | WO2005EP55520 | Priority number, date | DE20041062748 | 27.12.2004 Original published format: DE102004062748 | DE20051012114 | 16.03.2005 Original published format: DE102005012114 | [2007/38] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2006069837 | Date: | 06.07.2006 | Language: | DE | [2006/27] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1833351 | Date: | 19.09.2007 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.07.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/38] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1833351 | Date: | 07.07.2010 | Language: | DE | [2010/27] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 06.07.2006 | Classification | IPC: | A47L15/48 | [2007/38] | CPC: |
A47L15/483 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/38] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | GESCHIRRSPÜLMASCHINE MIT EINER TROCKNUNGSVORRICHTUNG | [2007/38] | English: | DISHWASHER COMPRISING A DRYING APPARATUS | [2007/38] | French: | LAVE-VAISSELLE COMPRENANT UN DISPOSITIF DE SECHAGE | [2007/38] | Entry into regional phase | 27.07.2007 | National basic fee paid | 27.07.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 27.07.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.07.2007 | Examination requested [2007/38] | 22.10.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 30.04.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.02.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.05.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 28.05.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 08.04.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit [2011/24] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.10.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.10.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 02.11.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 07.07.2010 | CZ | 07.07.2010 | DK | 07.07.2010 | EE | 07.07.2010 | FI | 07.07.2010 | IE | 07.07.2010 | LT | 07.07.2010 | LV | 07.07.2010 | NL | 07.07.2010 | RO | 07.07.2010 | SE | 07.07.2010 | SI | 07.07.2010 | SK | 07.07.2010 | BG | 07.10.2010 | GR | 08.10.2010 | AT | 25.10.2010 | LU | 25.10.2010 | BE | 31.10.2010 | CH | 31.10.2010 | LI | 31.10.2010 | MC | 31.10.2010 | IS | 07.11.2010 | PT | 08.11.2010 | HU | 08.01.2011 | [2012/44] |
Former [2012/42] | CY | 07.07.2010 | |
CZ | 07.07.2010 | ||
DK | 07.07.2010 | ||
EE | 07.07.2010 | ||
FI | 07.07.2010 | ||
IE | 07.07.2010 | ||
LT | 07.07.2010 | ||
LV | 07.07.2010 | ||
NL | 07.07.2010 | ||
RO | 07.07.2010 | ||
SE | 07.07.2010 | ||
SI | 07.07.2010 | ||
SK | 07.07.2010 | ||
BG | 07.10.2010 | ||
GR | 08.10.2010 | ||
AT | 25.10.2010 | ||
BE | 31.10.2010 | ||
CH | 31.10.2010 | ||
LI | 31.10.2010 | ||
MC | 31.10.2010 | ||
IS | 07.11.2010 | ||
PT | 08.11.2010 | ||
HU | 08.01.2011 | ||
Former [2012/11] | CY | 07.07.2010 | |
CZ | 07.07.2010 | ||
DK | 07.07.2010 | ||
EE | 07.07.2010 | ||
FI | 07.07.2010 | ||
IE | 07.07.2010 | ||
LT | 07.07.2010 | ||
LV | 07.07.2010 | ||
NL | 07.07.2010 | ||
RO | 07.07.2010 | ||
SE | 07.07.2010 | ||
SI | 07.07.2010 | ||
SK | 07.07.2010 | ||
BG | 07.10.2010 | ||
GR | 08.10.2010 | ||
AT | 25.10.2010 | ||
BE | 31.10.2010 | ||
CH | 31.10.2010 | ||
LI | 31.10.2010 | ||
MC | 31.10.2010 | ||
IS | 07.11.2010 | ||
PT | 08.11.2010 | ||
Former [2011/38] | CY | 07.07.2010 | |
CZ | 07.07.2010 | ||
DK | 07.07.2010 | ||
EE | 07.07.2010 | ||
FI | 07.07.2010 | ||
IE | 07.07.2010 | ||
LT | 07.07.2010 | ||
LV | 07.07.2010 | ||
NL | 07.07.2010 | ||
RO | 07.07.2010 | ||
SE | 07.07.2010 | ||
SI | 07.07.2010 | ||
SK | 07.07.2010 | ||
BG | 07.10.2010 | ||
GR | 08.10.2010 | ||
BE | 31.10.2010 | ||
CH | 31.10.2010 | ||
LI | 31.10.2010 | ||
MC | 31.10.2010 | ||
IS | 07.11.2010 | ||
PT | 08.11.2010 | ||
Former [2011/29] | CY | 07.07.2010 | |
CZ | 07.07.2010 | ||
DK | 07.07.2010 | ||
EE | 07.07.2010 | ||
FI | 07.07.2010 | ||
IE | 07.07.2010 | ||
LT | 07.07.2010 | ||
LV | 07.07.2010 | ||
NL | 07.07.2010 | ||
RO | 07.07.2010 | ||
SE | 07.07.2010 | ||
SI | 07.07.2010 | ||
SK | 07.07.2010 | ||
BG | 07.10.2010 | ||
GR | 08.10.2010 | ||
MC | 31.10.2010 | ||
IS | 07.11.2010 | ||
PT | 08.11.2010 | ||
Former [2011/23] | CY | 07.07.2010 | |
CZ | 07.07.2010 | ||
DK | 07.07.2010 | ||
EE | 07.07.2010 | ||
FI | 07.07.2010 | ||
IE | 07.07.2010 | ||
LT | 07.07.2010 | ||
LV | 07.07.2010 | ||
NL | 07.07.2010 | ||
SE | 07.07.2010 | ||
SI | 07.07.2010 | ||
SK | 07.07.2010 | ||
BG | 07.10.2010 | ||
GR | 08.10.2010 | ||
IS | 07.11.2010 | ||
PT | 08.11.2010 | ||
Former [2011/19] | CY | 07.07.2010 | |
DK | 07.07.2010 | ||
FI | 07.07.2010 | ||
IE | 07.07.2010 | ||
LT | 07.07.2010 | ||
LV | 07.07.2010 | ||
NL | 07.07.2010 | ||
SE | 07.07.2010 | ||
SI | 07.07.2010 | ||
BG | 07.10.2010 | ||
GR | 08.10.2010 | ||
IS | 07.11.2010 | ||
PT | 08.11.2010 | ||
Former [2011/16] | CY | 07.07.2010 | |
FI | 07.07.2010 | ||
LT | 07.07.2010 | ||
LV | 07.07.2010 | ||
NL | 07.07.2010 | ||
SE | 07.07.2010 | ||
SI | 07.07.2010 | ||
BG | 07.10.2010 | ||
GR | 08.10.2010 | ||
IS | 07.11.2010 | ||
PT | 08.11.2010 | ||
Former [2011/13] | CY | 07.07.2010 | |
FI | 07.07.2010 | ||
LT | 07.07.2010 | ||
NL | 07.07.2010 | ||
SI | 07.07.2010 | ||
BG | 07.10.2010 | ||
IS | 07.11.2010 | ||
PT | 08.11.2010 | ||
Former [2011/12] | FI | 07.07.2010 | |
LT | 07.07.2010 | ||
NL | 07.07.2010 | ||
SI | 07.07.2010 | ||
BG | 07.10.2010 | ||
PT | 08.11.2010 | ||
Former [2011/08] | LT | 07.07.2010 | |
NL | 07.07.2010 | ||
SI | 07.07.2010 | ||
Former [2011/02] | SI | 07.07.2010 | Cited in | International search | [A]JPH0698849 ; | [Y]FR2483767 (BOSCH SIEMENS HAUSGERAETE [DE]) [Y] 6,8 * page 2, lines 28-30 * * page 3, lines 10-13 * * page 5, lines 14-22; figure - *; | [A]DE3626887 (MIELE & CIE [DE]) [A] * column 5, lines 37-43 * * figure 2 *; | [DY]DE3741652 (BAUKNECHT HAUSGERAETE [DE]) [DY] 5,11 * column 2, lines 19-26; figure - *; | [A]DE29706153U (ELECTROLUX ZANUSSI ELETTRODOME [IT]) [A] * page 4, paragraph 2 - page 5, paragraph 4; figures 1,2 *; | [XY]CH693494 (V ZUG AG [CH]) [X] 1,3,4,9,10,12 * column 2, lines 32-39 * * column 3, line 61 - column 4, line 28; figure 2 * [Y] 5,6,8,11 | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19940711), vol. 018, no. 367, Database accession no. (C - 1223), & JP06098849 A 19940412 (HITACHI LTD) [A] * abstract * |