|
26.04.2017 |
Communication regarding the expiry of opposition period |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.06.2016 |
Transmission of the certificate for a European patent pursuant to Rule 74 EPC |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.05.2016 |
Decision to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
12.05.2016 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.05.2016 |
French translation of claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
12.05.2016 |
German translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
12.05.2016 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
08.03.2016 |
Bibliographic data of the European patent application |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
08.03.2016 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
08.03.2016 |
Intention to grant (signatures) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
08.03.2016 |
Text intended for grant |
Search / examination |
13 |
|
24.11.2015 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.11.2015 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
24.11.2015 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
24.11.2015 |
Description |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
24.11.2015 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.11.2015 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
07.09.2015 |
Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.09.2015 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.09.2015 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.09.2015 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.05.2015 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
27.05.2015 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
29.01.2014 |
CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative for the applicant |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.04.2012 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.04.2012 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
24.04.2012 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
24.04.2012 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.04.2012 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
30.12.2011 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
30.12.2011 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
18.01.2010 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
30.12.2009 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's representative |
Search / examination |
13 |
|
04.07.2008 |
Letter concerning the inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.01.2008 |
Communication for party to proceedings/third party |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
05.12.2007 |
Notice drawing attention to the payment of the renewal fee and additional fee |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.07.2007 |
Invitation to indicate correct address of inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.07.2007 |
Invitation to indicate correct address of inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.07.2007 |
Letter which had not been notified |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
26.06.2007 |
Letter which had not been notified |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
31.05.2007 |
Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
29.05.2007 |
Communication regarding possible amendment of claims/payment of claims fees |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
23.04.2007 |
Annexes to the international preliminary examination report |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
23.04.2007 |
Copy of the international preliminary examination report |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
15.03.2007 |
Acknowledgement of receipt of electronic submission of the request for grant of a European patent |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.03.2007 |
Request for entry into the European phase |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
02.03.2007 |
Information on entry into European phase |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
16.01.2007 |
Annex to International preliminary examination report |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
6 |
|
16.01.2007 |
International preliminary examination report |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
16.01.2007 |
International preliminary examination report |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
16.01.2007 |
International preliminary examination report - free text sheet |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
4 |
|
16.01.2007 |
International preliminary examination report - free text sheet |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
4 |
|
16.01.2007 |
International preliminary examination report - points I-VIII |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
2 |
|
16.01.2007 |
International preliminary examination report - points I-VIII |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
2 |
|
16.01.2007 |
Notification of documents sent to WIPO |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
16.01.2007 |
Transmittal of International Preliminary Examination Report |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
17.11.2006 |
Notification of the recording of a change |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.10.2006 |
Notification of the recording of a change |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.10.2006 |
Notification of the recording of a change |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.10.2006 |
Notification of the recording of a change |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
2 |
|
31.07.2006 |
Notification of documents sent to WIPO |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
31.07.2006 |
Notification of receipt of demand |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
24.07.2006 |
Letter regarding PCTII procedure |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
5 |
|
24.07.2006 |
PCT demand form |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
3 |
|
24.07.2006 |
PCT(IPEA): Amended sheet - claims |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
3 |
|
24.07.2006 |
PCT(IPEA): Amended sheet - claims |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
3 |
|
24.07.2006 |
PCT(IPEA): Amended sheet - description |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
2 |
|
24.07.2006 |
PCT(IPEA): Amended sheet - description |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
2 |
|
24.07.2006 |
PCT(IPEA): Amended sheet - drawings |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
18.07.2006 |
Document concerning fees and payments |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
18.07.2006 |
Letter regarding PCTII procedure |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
5 |
|
18.07.2006 |
PCT demand form |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
3 |
|
18.07.2006 |
PCT(IPEA): Amended sheet - claims |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
3 |
|
18.07.2006 |
PCT(IPEA): Amended sheet - claims |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
3 |
|
18.07.2006 |
PCT(IPEA): Amended sheet - description |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
2 |
|
18.07.2006 |
PCT(IPEA): Amended sheet - description |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
2 |
|
18.07.2006 |
PCT(IPEA): Amended sheet - drawings |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
17.05.2006 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
23 |
|
27.04.2006 |
Copy of the international search report |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
27.04.2006 |
Copy of the international search report |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
27.04.2006 |
Copy of the international search report |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
27.04.2006 |
Published international application - A1 |
Search / examination |
16 |
|
27.04.2006 |
Published international application - A1 |
Search / examination |
16 |
|
27.04.2006 |
Published international application - A1 |
Search / examination |
16 |