Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US7950919 | Global Dossier | 31.05.2011 | B2 | US2006084018 | 20.04.2006 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US24839805 | 12.10.2005 | US61890904 | 14.10.2004 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1800058 | Global Dossier | 22.06.2016 | B1 | EP1800058 | 27.06.2007 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2005US36565 | 12.10.2005 | US61890904 | 14.10.2004 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2583512 | 06.08.2013 | C | CA2583512 | 27.04.2006 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2005US36565 | 12.10.2005 | US61890904 | 14.10.2004 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2006044408 | Global Dossier | 27.04.2006 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US61890904 | 14.10.2004 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | RU2397408 | 20.08.2010 | C2 | RU2007117758 | 20.11.2008 | A | Priority number | Date | US61890904 | 14.10.2004 |