Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2006047872 | Global Dossier | 11.05.2006 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US66758905 | 31.03.2005 | US62457604 | 02.11.2004 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2012258175 | Global Dossier | 11.10.2012 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201213528215 | 20.06.2012 | US66670605 | 02.11.2005 | WO2005CA01679 | 02.11.2005 | US62457604 | 02.11.2004 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2009130196 | Global Dossier | 21.05.2009 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US66758905 | 31.03.2005 | US66670405 | 02.11.2005 | US62457604 | 02.11.2004 | WO2005CA01680 | 02.11.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2008318311 | Global Dossier | 25.12.2008 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US66670605 | 02.11.2005 | WO2005CA01679 | 02.11.2005 | US62457604 | 02.11.2004 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US8309077 | Global Dossier | 13.11.2012 | B2 | US2008038322 | 14.02.2008 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US66670905 | 02.11.2005 | WO2005CA01678 | 02.11.2005 | US62457604 | 02.11.2004 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2462940 | Global Dossier | 13.06.2012 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US62457604 | 02.11.2004 | EP05804032 | 02.11.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1833497 | Global Dossier | 11.11.2009 | A4 | EP1833497 | 19.09.2007 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US66758905 | 31.03.2005 | US62457604 | 02.11.2004 | WO2005CA01680 | 02.11.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1817043 | Global Dossier | 27.01.2010 | A4 | EP1817043 | 15.08.2007 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2005CA01679 | 02.11.2005 | US62457604 | 02.11.2004 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU2005301048 | Global Dossier | 11.05.2006 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US66758905 | 31.03.2005 | US62457604 | 02.11.2004 | WO2005CA01680 | 02.11.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU2005301046B | Global Dossier | 23.02.2012 | B2 | AU2005301046 | 11.05.2006 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2005CA01678 | 02.11.2005 | US62457604 | 02.11.2004 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1812025 | Global Dossier | 05.09.2012 | B1 | EP1812025 | 16.12.2009 | A4 | EP1812025 | 01.08.2007 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2005CA01678 | 02.11.2005 | US62457604 | 02.11.2004 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | BRPI0515769 | 29.07.2008 | A | Priority number | Date | US66758905 | 31.03.2005 | US62457604 | 02.11.2004 | WO2005CA01680 | 02.11.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | BRPI0515825 | 05.08.2008 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2005CA01678 | 02.11.2005 | US62457604 | 02.11.2004 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2585926 | 14.04.2015 | C | CA2585926 | 11.05.2006 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2005CA01678 | 02.11.2005 | US62457604 | 02.11.2004 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2586611 | 11.05.2006 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2005CA01679 | 02.11.2005 | US62457604 | 02.11.2004 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2586619 | 11.05.2006 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US66758905 | 31.03.2005 | US62457604 | 02.11.2004 | WO2005CA01680 | 02.11.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | DK1812025T | 22.10.2012 | T3 | Priority number | Date | WO2005CA01678 | 02.11.2005 | US62457604 | 02.11.2004 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | ES2394455T | 31.01.2013 | T3 | Priority number | Date | WO2005CA01678 | 02.11.2005 | US62457604 | 02.11.2004 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | MX2007005277 | 11.03.2008 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2005CA01678 | 02.11.2005 | US62457604 | 02.11.2004 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | MX2007005279 | 11.03.2008 | A | Priority number | Date | US66758905 | 31.03.2005 | US62457604 | 02.11.2004 | WO2005CA01680 | 02.11.2005 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2006047871 | Global Dossier | 11.05.2006 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US62457604 | 02.11.2004 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2006047870 | Global Dossier | 11.05.2006 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US62457604 | 02.11.2004 | Type | Divisional application | EP2462940 |