EP1824703 - CIRCUIT FOR DISTRIBUTION OF ENERGY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 23.12.2011 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.10.2013 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 06.11.2013 [2013/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Aros Electronics AB Ostergardsgatan 12 S-431 53 Mölndal / SE | [2007/35] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HELLSTRÖM, Jerker Brandsbovägen 7 S-449 44 Nol / SE | [2007/35] | Representative(s) | Edlund, Fabian Awapatent AB Södra Hamngatan 37-41 P.O. Box 11 394 404 28 Göteborg / SE | [N/P] |
Former [2007/35] | Edlund, Fabian AWAPATENT AB, P.O. Box 11 394 404 28 Göteborg / SE | Application number, filing date | 05804140.1 | 21.11.2005 | [2007/35] | WO2005SE01742 | Priority number, date | SE20040002874 | 25.11.2004 Original published format: SE 0402874 | [2007/35] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2006057595 | Date: | 01.06.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/22] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1824703 | Date: | 29.08.2007 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 01.06.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/35] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1824703 | Date: | 16.02.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/07] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | SE | 01.06.2006 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.05.2010 | Classification | IPC: | B60R16/04, H02J7/00, H02J7/14 | [2007/35] | CPC: |
H02J7/342 (EP);
H02J7/0014 (SE);
H02J1/082 (EP);
H02J7/1423 (SE);
B60R16/03 (EP);
H02J2310/46 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/35] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | KREISLAUF ZUR VERTEILUNG VON ENERGIE | [2007/35] | English: | CIRCUIT FOR DISTRIBUTION OF ENERGY | [2007/35] | French: | CIRCUIT DE DISTRIBUTION D'ENERGIE | [2007/35] | Entry into regional phase | 14.05.2007 | National basic fee paid | 14.05.2007 | Search fee paid | 14.05.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 14.05.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 14.05.2007 | Examination requested [2007/35] | 10.09.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 29.12.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 29.12.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 17.11.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit [2012/04] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 03.11.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 05.11.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 04.11.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 04.11.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 16.02.2011 | BE | 16.02.2011 | CY | 16.02.2011 | CZ | 16.02.2011 | DK | 16.02.2011 | EE | 16.02.2011 | FI | 16.02.2011 | HU | 16.02.2011 | IS | 16.02.2011 | IT | 16.02.2011 | LT | 16.02.2011 | LV | 16.02.2011 | NL | 16.02.2011 | PL | 16.02.2011 | RO | 16.02.2011 | SI | 16.02.2011 | SK | 16.02.2011 | TR | 16.02.2011 | BG | 16.05.2011 | GR | 17.05.2011 | ES | 27.05.2011 | PT | 16.06.2011 | [2013/45] |
Former [2013/44] | AT | 16.02.2011 | |
BE | 16.02.2011 | ||
CY | 16.02.2011 | ||
CZ | 16.02.2011 | ||
DK | 16.02.2011 | ||
EE | 16.02.2011 | ||
FI | 16.02.2011 | ||
IS | 16.02.2011 | ||
IT | 16.02.2011 | ||
LT | 16.02.2011 | ||
LV | 16.02.2011 | ||
NL | 16.02.2011 | ||
PL | 16.02.2011 | ||
RO | 16.02.2011 | ||
SI | 16.02.2011 | ||
SK | 16.02.2011 | ||
TR | 16.02.2011 | ||
BG | 16.05.2011 | ||
GR | 17.05.2011 | ||
ES | 27.05.2011 | ||
PT | 16.06.2011 | ||
Former [2013/33] | AT | 16.02.2011 | |
BE | 16.02.2011 | ||
CY | 16.02.2011 | ||
CZ | 16.02.2011 | ||
DK | 16.02.2011 | ||
EE | 16.02.2011 | ||
FI | 16.02.2011 | ||
IS | 16.02.2011 | ||
IT | 16.02.2011 | ||
LT | 16.02.2011 | ||
LV | 16.02.2011 | ||
NL | 16.02.2011 | ||
PL | 16.02.2011 | ||
RO | 16.02.2011 | ||
SI | 16.02.2011 | ||
SK | 16.02.2011 | ||
BG | 16.05.2011 | ||
GR | 17.05.2011 | ||
ES | 27.05.2011 | ||
PT | 16.06.2011 | ||
Former [2012/23] | AT | 16.02.2011 | |
BE | 16.02.2011 | ||
CY | 16.02.2011 | ||
CZ | 16.02.2011 | ||
DK | 16.02.2011 | ||
EE | 16.02.2011 | ||
FI | 16.02.2011 | ||
IT | 16.02.2011 | ||
LT | 16.02.2011 | ||
LV | 16.02.2011 | ||
NL | 16.02.2011 | ||
PL | 16.02.2011 | ||
RO | 16.02.2011 | ||
SI | 16.02.2011 | ||
SK | 16.02.2011 | ||
BG | 16.05.2011 | ||
GR | 17.05.2011 | ||
ES | 27.05.2011 | ||
PT | 16.06.2011 | ||
Former [2011/50] | AT | 16.02.2011 | |
BE | 16.02.2011 | ||
CY | 16.02.2011 | ||
CZ | 16.02.2011 | ||
DK | 16.02.2011 | ||
EE | 16.02.2011 | ||
FI | 16.02.2011 | ||
LT | 16.02.2011 | ||
LV | 16.02.2011 | ||
NL | 16.02.2011 | ||
PL | 16.02.2011 | ||
RO | 16.02.2011 | ||
SI | 16.02.2011 | ||
SK | 16.02.2011 | ||
BG | 16.05.2011 | ||
GR | 17.05.2011 | ||
ES | 27.05.2011 | ||
PT | 16.06.2011 | ||
Former [2011/47] | AT | 16.02.2011 | |
BE | 16.02.2011 | ||
CY | 16.02.2011 | ||
DK | 16.02.2011 | ||
EE | 16.02.2011 | ||
FI | 16.02.2011 | ||
LT | 16.02.2011 | ||
LV | 16.02.2011 | ||
NL | 16.02.2011 | ||
PL | 16.02.2011 | ||
SI | 16.02.2011 | ||
BG | 16.05.2011 | ||
GR | 17.05.2011 | ||
ES | 27.05.2011 | ||
PT | 16.06.2011 | ||
Former [2011/39] | AT | 16.02.2011 | |
BE | 16.02.2011 | ||
CY | 16.02.2011 | ||
FI | 16.02.2011 | ||
LT | 16.02.2011 | ||
LV | 16.02.2011 | ||
NL | 16.02.2011 | ||
PL | 16.02.2011 | ||
SI | 16.02.2011 | ||
BG | 16.05.2011 | ||
GR | 17.05.2011 | ||
ES | 27.05.2011 | ||
PT | 16.06.2011 | ||
Former [2011/37] | BE | 16.02.2011 | |
CY | 16.02.2011 | ||
FI | 16.02.2011 | ||
LT | 16.02.2011 | ||
LV | 16.02.2011 | ||
PL | 16.02.2011 | ||
SI | 16.02.2011 | ||
BG | 16.05.2011 | ||
GR | 17.05.2011 | ||
ES | 27.05.2011 | ||
PT | 16.06.2011 | ||
Former [2011/36] | LT | 16.02.2011 | |
LV | 16.02.2011 | ||
PL | 16.02.2011 | ||
GR | 17.05.2011 | ||
ES | 27.05.2011 | ||
PT | 16.06.2011 | Cited in | International search | [A]US5479083 (BRAINARD GERALD L [US]); | [A]US6384489 (BLUEMEL ROLAND [DE], et al); | [A]DE10057259 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]); | [A]DE10200466 (KAHLEN HANS [DE]); | [A]DE10361743 (VOLKSWAGEN AG [DE], et al) |