EP1797365 - INSTALLATION AND METHOD FOR DRIVING A SUBMARINE PIPELINE SCRAPER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 15.01.2010 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.01.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 17.02.2010 [2010/07] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Technip France ZAC Danton 6-8, Allée de l'Arche Faubourg de l'Arche 92400 Courbevoie / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2007/25] | For all designated states Technip France ZAC Danton, 6-8, allée de l'Arche, Faubourg de l'Arche 92400 Courbevoie / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FRANQUEVILLE, Jean-Baptiste 24, rue de l'Oasis F-92800 Puteaux / FR | [2007/25] | Representative(s) | Bertrand, Didier Fédit-Loriot 38, avenue Hoche 75008 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2009/30] | Bertrand, Didier S.A. Fedit-Loriot 38 Avenue Hoche 75008 Paris / FR | ||
Former [2007/25] | Bertrand, Didier c/o S.A. Fedit-Loriot 38, avenue Hoche 75008 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 05804242.5 | 27.09.2005 | [2007/25] | WO2005FR02391 | Priority number, date | FR20040010348 | 30.09.2004 Original published format: FR 0410348 | [2007/25] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2006035158 | Date: | 06.04.2006 | Language: | FR | [2006/14] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1797365 | Date: | 20.06.2007 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.04.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/25] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1797365 | Date: | 11.03.2009 | Language: | FR | [2009/11] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 06.04.2006 | Classification | IPC: | F16L55/38, F16L55/46, B08B9/04 | [2007/25] | CPC: |
B08B9/053 (EP,US);
B08B9/055 (EP,US);
B08B9/0551 (EP,US);
F16L55/38 (EP,US);
F16L55/46 (EP,US);
F16L2101/12 (EP,US);
F16L2101/30 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | FR, GB [2009/11] |
Former [2007/25] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | INSTALLATION UND VERFAHREN ZUM BETRIEB EINES SCHRAPPERS FÜR UNTERWASSERPIPELINES | [2007/25] | English: | INSTALLATION AND METHOD FOR DRIVING A SUBMARINE PIPELINE SCRAPER | [2007/25] | French: | INSTALLATION ET METHODE D'ENTRAINEMENT D'UN RACLEUR DE CONDUITE SOUS-MARINE | [2007/25] | Entry into regional phase | 02.05.2007 | National basic fee paid | 02.05.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 02.05.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 02.05.2007 | Examination requested [2007/25] | 10.10.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 17.04.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.04.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.09.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.10.2008 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.01.2009 | Fee for grant paid | 26.01.2009 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 14.12.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit [2010/07] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.09.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.09.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]US5358573 (SIVACOE ORLANDE [CA]) [X] 7-10 * column 3, lines 5-33; figure 2 *; | [X]US5433236 (ZOLLINGER W THOR [US], et al) [X] 7-10 * column 8, lines 6-10; figure 1 *; | [A]GB2325293 (BRUCE GEORGE CHARLES [NO]) [A] 1-10 * claim 1 *; | [A]WO03031865 (STOLT OFFSHORE SA [FR], et al) [A] 1-10 * claim 1 * |