EP1861423 - MOLECULES AND CHIMERIC MOLECULES THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 03.09.2010 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.09.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 06.10.2010 [2010/40] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Apollo Life Sciences Limited Level 1, 147 Queen Street Beaconsfield, New South Wales 2015 / AU | [2007/49] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
PRIEST, John D 12b Grafton Street Balmain, New South Wales 2041 / AU | 02 /
WATTS, Alan D 31 Undercliffe Street Dee Why, New South Wales 2099 / AU | 03 /
WHITTAKER, Jason S 24 Maddison Street Redfern East, New South Wales 2016 / AU | 04 /
PILKINGTON, Glenn R 6 Allara Street Rye, Victoria 3941 / AU | 05 /
LIDDELL, Catherine A 6 Caroline Street Kingsgrove, New South Wales 2208 / AU | [2007/49] | Representative(s) | Dzieglewska, Hanna Eva Dehns St Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2007/49] | Dzieglewska, Hanna Eva Frank B. Dehn & Co. St Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | Application number, filing date | 05804566.7 | 24.11.2005 | [2007/49] | WO2005AU01780 | Priority number, date | US20050653323P | 15.02.2005 Original published format: US 653323 P | [2007/49] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2006086823 | Date: | 24.08.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/34] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1861423 | Date: | 05.12.2007 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 24.08.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/49] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | AU | 24.08.2006 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.12.2009 | Classification | IPC: | C07K14/55, C07K16/06, C07K14/715, C07K19/00, A61K38/20, C07H21/04, C07H21/02, A61P31/20 | [2007/49] | CPC: |
C07K14/55 (EP,US);
A61P31/20 (EP);
A61P37/04 (EP);
C07K14/7155 (EP,US);
A61K38/00 (EP,US);
C07K2319/30 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/49] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | MOLEKÜLE UND CHIMERE MOLEKÜLE DAVON | [2007/49] | English: | MOLECULES AND CHIMERIC MOLECULES THEREOF | [2007/49] | French: | MOLÉCULE ET MOLÉCULES CHIMÈRES DE CELLE-CI | [2007/49] | Entry into regional phase | 17.09.2007 | National basic fee paid | 17.09.2007 | Search fee paid | 17.09.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 17.09.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 17.09.2007 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 17.09.2007 | Examination requested [2007/49] | 26.03.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2010/40] | 17.05.2010 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2010/40] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.09.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.11.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.11.2009 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2002193305 (RUBEN STEVEN M [US], et al) [A] 1-4,8-24* paragraph [0147] - paragraph [0148]; example 10 *; | [A]US6589764 (SIMS JOHN E [US], et al) [A] 1-4,8-24 * column 6, line 50 - column 7, line 67; example - *; | [X] - YOSHIDA YOKO ET AL, "Generation of fiber-mutant recombinant adenoviruses for gene therapy of malignant glioma", HUMAN GENE THERAPY, (19981120), vol. 9, no. 17, ISSN 1043-0342, pages 2503 - 2515, XP002927076 [X] 1-4,9,13-24 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1089/10430349850019346 | [X] - NAGASHIMA SHIGEKI ET AL, "In vitro and in vivo characteristics of human squamous cell carcinoma of the head and neck cells engineered to secrete interleukin-2", CANCER GENE THERAPY, (199711), vol. 4, no. 6, ISSN 0929-1903, pages 366 - 376, XP009126472 [X] 1-4,9,13-24 * the whole document * | [X] - ONG EDGAR ET AL, "Purification of human interleukin-2 using the cellulose-binding domain of a prokaryotic cellulase", BIOSEPARATION, (1995), vol. 5, no. 2, ISSN 0923-179X, pages 95 - 104, XP000671067 [X] 1-4,9-10,13-24 * the whole document * | [X] - KNEZEVIC M ET AL, "Human interleukin-2 (IL-2) expressed by transfected mammalian cells", PFLUEGERS ARCHIV: EUROPEAN JOURNAL OF PHYSIOLOGY, SPRINGER VERLAG, BERLIN, DE, (19960101), vol. 431, no. suppl. 2, ISSN 0031-6768, pages R227 - R228, XP009126471 [X] 1-4,9,13-24 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/BF02346351 | [X] - MARCHESE E ET AL, "Separation by cation-exchange high-performance liquid chromatography of three forms of Chinese hamster ovary cell-derived recombinant human interleukin-2.", JOURNAL OF CHROMATOGRAPHY 20 APR 1990, (19900420), vol. 504, no. 2, ISSN 0021-9673, pages 351 - 358, XP002558024 [X] 1-4,9,13-24 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0021-9673(01)89538-8 | [X] - CONRADT H S ET AL, "SECRETION OF GLYCOSYLATED HUMAN INTERLEUKIN-2 BY RECOMBINANT MAMMALIAN CELL LINES", CARBOHYDRATE RESEARCH, & THIRD EUROPEAN SYMPOSIUM ON CARBOHYDRATES, GRENOBLE, FRANCE, SEPT. 16-20, 1985. CARBOHYDR RES., (1986), vol. 149, no. 2, ISSN 0008-6215, pages 443 - 450, XP026634489 [X] 1-4,9,13-24 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0008-6215(00)90064-8 | [X] - VITA N ET AL, "CLOSELY RELATED GLYCOSYLATION PATTERNS OF RECOMBINANT HUMAN IL-2 EXPRESSED IN A CHO CELL LINE AND NATURAL IL-2", LYMPHOKINE RESEARCH, (1990), vol. 9, no. 1, ISSN 0277-6766, pages 67 - 80, XP009126470 [X] 1-4,9,13-24 * the whole document * | [X] - CONRADT H S ET AL, "Expression of human interleukin-2 in recombinant baby hamster kidney ltk-, and chinese hamster ovary cells /STRUCTURE OF O-LINKED CARBOHYDRATE CHAINS AND THEIR LOCATION WITHIN THE POLYPEPTIDE", JOURNAL OF BIOLOGICAL CHEMISTRY, AMERICAN SOCIETY OF BIOLOCHEMICAL BIOLOGISTS, BIRMINGHAM, US, (19891015), vol. 264, no. 29, ISSN 0021-9258, pages 17368 - 17373, XP003017499 [X] 1-4,9,13-24 * the whole document * | [X] - TANIGUCHI T ET AL, "Structure and expression of a cloned cDNA for human interleukin-2.", NATURE 1983 MAR 24-30, (19830324), vol. 302, no. 5906, ISSN 0028-0836, pages 305 - 310, XP002558027 [X] 1-4,9,13-24 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/302305a0 | [A] - KUZIEL W A ET AL, "Interleukin-2 and the IL-2 receptor: new insights into structure and function.", THE JOURNAL OF INVESTIGATIVE DERMATOLOGY JUN 1990, (199006), vol. 94, no. 6 Suppl, ISSN 0022-202X, pages 27S - 32S, XP002558028 [A] 1-4,8-24 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1111/1523-1747.ep12875017 | International search | [X]JPS6153300 ; | [XP]WO2005021592 (MERCK PATENT GMBH [DE], et al); | [X]WO2005007121 (MASSACHUSETTS INST TECHNOLOGY [US], et al); | [X]WO03031464 ; | [X]WO02066514 (MERCK PATENT GMBH [DE], et al); | [X]US5824330 (MERTELSMANN ROLAND [US], et al); | [X]US4908434 (MERTELSMANN ROLAND [US], et al); | [X]US4925919 (MERTELSMANN ROLAND [US], et al); | [X]US4751183 (SONNEBORN HANS H [DE], et al) | [X] - CHO M.S. ET AL., "Establishment of a human somatic hybrid cell line for recombinant protein production", J. BIOMED. SCI., (200211), vol. 9, no. 6 PT 2, pages 631 - 638, XP008118040 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/BF02254991 | [X] - ZHENG X.X. ET AL., "Il-2 receptor-targeted cytolytic Il-2/Fc fusion protein treatment blocks diabetogenic autoimmunity in nonobese diabetic mice", J. IMMUNOL., (19991001), vol. 163, no. 7, pages 4041 - 4048, XP002230805 | [X] - ZHANG W.Y. ET AL., "Rapid purification of a new humanized single-chain Fv antibody/human interleukin-2 fusion protein reactive against HER2 receptor", ACTA BIOCHIM BIOPHYS SIMICA (SHANGHAI), (200410), vol. 36, no. 10, pages 707 - 712, XP008118072 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1093/abbs/36.10.707 | [X] - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 1986, no. 17, Database accession no. 1986-110375, XP008113408 & JPS6153300 A 19860317 (TAKEDA CHEMICAL IND KK) | [X] - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 2003, no. 42, Database accession no. 2003-449162, XP008113409 & WO03031464 A2 20030417 (NEOSE TECHNOLOGIES INC.) | [X] - SUTTMANN H. ET AL., "Stimulation of neutrophil granulocytes with Mycobacterium bovis bacillus Calmete-Guerin induces changes in phenotype and gene expression and inhibits spontaneous apoptosis", INFECTION AND IMMUNITY, (200308), vol. 71, no. 8, pages 4647 - 4656, XP008117975 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1128/IAI.71.8.4647-4656.2003 | [X] - KREITMAN R.J., "Toxin-labeled monoclonal antibodies", CURRENT PHARMACEUTICAL BIOTECHNOLOGY, (200112), vol. 2, no. 4, pages 313 - 325, XP008118070 | [X] - TERAMOTO H. ET AL., "Tyrosine phosphorylation of the vav proto-oncogene product links FcepsilonRI to the Rac1-JNK pathway", JOURNAL OF BIOLOGICAL CHEMISTRY, (19970418), vol. 272, no. 16, pages 10751 - 10755, XP008117974 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1074/jbc.272.16.10751 |