EP1955751 - HONEYCOMB FILTER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 31.12.2010 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 31.12.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 02.02.2011 [2011/05] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NGK Insulators, Ltd. 2-56, Suda-cho, Mizuho-ku Nagoya-shi, Aichi 467-8530 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2008/33] | For all designated states NGK INSULATORS, LTD. 2-56, Suda-cho, Mizuho-ku Nagoya-shi, Aichi 467-8530 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
OKUMURA, Jun c/o Legal Affairs and Intellect. Prop. Dept. NGK Insulators, Ltd. 2-56 Suda-cho, Mizuho-ku Nagoya-shi, Aicchi 467-8530 / JP | [2008/33] | Representative(s) | Paget, Hugh Charles Edward Mewburn Ellis LLP City Tower 40 Basinghall Street London EC2V 5DE / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2008/33] | Paget, Hugh Charles Edward Mewburn Ellis LLP York House 23 Kingsway London WC2B 6HP / GB | Application number, filing date | 05805271.3 | 25.10.2005 | [2008/33] | WO2005JP19618 | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2007049338 | Date: | 03.05.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/18] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1955751 | Date: | 13.08.2008 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.05.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2008/33] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 03.05.2007 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.11.2009 | Classification | IPC: | B01D39/20, B01D46/24, F01N3/022 | [2009/52] | CPC: |
B01D46/2429 (EP,US);
B01D46/2478 (EP,US);
B01D46/247 (EP,US);
B01D46/2474 (EP,US);
B01D46/2482 (EP,US);
B01D46/2484 (EP,US);
B01D46/2498 (EP);
F01N3/0222 (EP);
B01D2279/30 (EP);
|
Former IPC [2008/33] | B01D39/20 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, PL [2008/49] |
Former [2008/33] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | WABENFILTER | [2008/33] | English: | HONEYCOMB FILTER | [2008/33] | French: | FILTRE EN NID D ABEILLE | [2008/33] | Entry into regional phase | 03.05.2007 | Translation filed | 13.05.2008 | National basic fee paid | 13.05.2008 | Search fee paid | 13.05.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 13.05.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 13.05.2008 | Examination requested [2008/33] | 27.05.2008 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 14.07.2008 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 23.03.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.08.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2011/05] | 08.09.2010 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2011/05] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.05.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.10.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.10.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.2010 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0867222 (NGK INSULATORS LTD [JP]) [A] 1-5 * page 3, line 42 - line 43 * * claim 1; tables 1,2 *; | [X]EP1375854 (NGK INSULATORS LTD [JP]) [X] 3,5 * paragraph [0001] * * paragraph [0015] * * paragraph [0016] * * paragraph [0040] - paragraph [0042] * * paragraph [0044] * * paragraph [0010] * * paragraph [0008] *; | [X]EP1440722 (NGK INSULATORS LTD [JP]) [X] 1,5 * paragraph [0008] * * paragraph [0009] * * paragraph [0013] * * paragraph [0042]; examples Comparative 3,4; tables 2,3 * * paragraph [0020] *; | [A]EP1484483 (NGK INSULATORS LTD [JP]) [A] 1-5* the whole document * | International search | [A]JP2003010616 (NGK INSULATORS LTD); | [Y]WO03074847 (NGK INSULATORS LTD [JP], et al); | [Y]JP2003334455 (NGK INSULATORS LTD); | [X]JP2003340224 (NGK INSULATORS LTD); | [Y]JP2005087805 (NGK INSULATORS LTD) |