EP1802313 - THERAPEUTIC AGENTS TRAGETING THE NCCA-ATP CHANNEL AND METHODS OF USE THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 09.09.2011 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.10.2013 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 06.11.2013 [2013/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states University of Maryland, Baltimore 515 West Lombard Street, 5th Floor Baltimore, MD 21201-1602 / US | For all designated states Department of Veterans Affairs, Office of General Counsel 810 Vermont Avenue, N.W. Washington, D.C. 20420 / US | [2007/27] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SIMARD, J., Marc 5223 Springlake Way Baltimore, MD 21212-3421 / US | 02 /
CHEN, Mingkui 4311 Alan Drive, Apt. B Baltimore, MD 21229 / US | [2007/27] | Representative(s) | Woods, Geoffrey Corlett J A Kemp 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2008/29] | Woods, Geoffrey Corlett J.A. KEMP & CO. 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | ||
Former [2007/27] | Woods, Geoffrey Corlett J.A. KEMP & CO. 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 05805849.6 | 25.07.2005 | [2007/27] | WO2005US26455 | Priority number, date | US20040610758P | 18.09.2004 Original published format: US 610758 P | [2007/27] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2006036278 | Date: | 06.04.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/14] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1802313 | Date: | 04.07.2007 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.04.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/27] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1802313 | Date: | 03.11.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/44] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 18.05.2007 | Classification | IPC: | A61K31/64, A61K31/44, A61K31/40, A61K31/549, A61K31/00, A61P25/00, A61P35/00 | [2007/27] | CPC: |
A61K31/00 (EP,US);
A61K31/64 (EP,US);
A61K31/165 (EP,US);
A61K31/175 (EP,US);
A61K31/37 (US);
A61K31/40 (EP,US);
A61K31/44 (EP,US);
A61K31/549 (EP,US);
A61K31/565 (EP,US);
A61K31/566 (EP,US);
A61K38/166 (US);
A61K38/177 (EP,US);
A61K38/482 (EP,US);
A61K38/49 (EP,US);
A61K45/06 (EP,US);
A61P25/00 (EP);
A61P35/00 (EP);
A61P35/04 (EP);
A61P43/00 (EP);
A61P9/10 (EP,US);
C12Y304/21068 (US);
| C-Set: |
A61K31/175, A61K2300/00 (US,EP);
A61K31/40, A61K2300/00 (US,EP);
A61K31/44, A61K2300/00 (US,EP);
A61K31/549, A61K2300/00 (US,EP);
A61K31/565, A61K2300/00 (EP,US);
A61K31/64, A61K2300/00 (EP,US); | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/27] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | THERAPEUTISCHE MITTEL ZUM TARGETING DES NCCA-ATP-KANALS UND VERWENDUNGSVERFAHREN DAFÜR | [2007/27] | English: | THERAPEUTIC AGENTS TRAGETING THE NCCA-ATP CHANNEL AND METHODS OF USE THEREOF | [2007/27] | French: | AGENTS THERAPEUTIQUES CIBLANT LE CANAL NCCA-ATP ET LEURS METHODES D'UTILISATION | [2007/27] | Entry into regional phase | 13.04.2007 | National basic fee paid | 13.04.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 13.04.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 13.04.2007 | Examination requested [2007/27] | 20.06.2007 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 10.04.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 26.11.2008 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 18.12.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.01.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 22.07.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.08.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 11.02.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.04.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.08.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 09.08.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP10010753.1 / EP2359832 | Opposition(s) | 04.08.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit [2011/41] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 18.12.2008 | Request for further processing filed | 18.12.2008 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.07.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.07.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.07.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 26.07.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 03.11.2010 | BE | 03.11.2010 | CY | 03.11.2010 | CZ | 03.11.2010 | DK | 03.11.2010 | EE | 03.11.2010 | FI | 03.11.2010 | HU | 03.11.2010 | IT | 03.11.2010 | LT | 03.11.2010 | LV | 03.11.2010 | NL | 03.11.2010 | PL | 03.11.2010 | RO | 03.11.2010 | SI | 03.11.2010 | SK | 03.11.2010 | TR | 03.11.2010 | BG | 03.02.2011 | GR | 04.02.2011 | ES | 14.02.2011 | IS | 03.03.2011 | PT | 03.03.2011 | IE | 25.07.2011 | LU | 25.07.2011 | MC | 31.07.2011 | [2013/45] |
Former [2013/44] | AT | 03.11.2010 | |
BE | 03.11.2010 | ||
CY | 03.11.2010 | ||
CZ | 03.11.2010 | ||
DK | 03.11.2010 | ||
EE | 03.11.2010 | ||
FI | 03.11.2010 | ||
IT | 03.11.2010 | ||
LT | 03.11.2010 | ||
LV | 03.11.2010 | ||
NL | 03.11.2010 | ||
PL | 03.11.2010 | ||
RO | 03.11.2010 | ||
SI | 03.11.2010 | ||
SK | 03.11.2010 | ||
TR | 03.11.2010 | ||
BG | 03.02.2011 | ||
GR | 04.02.2011 | ||
ES | 14.02.2011 | ||
IS | 03.03.2011 | ||
PT | 03.03.2011 | ||
IE | 25.07.2011 | ||
LU | 25.07.2011 | ||
MC | 31.07.2011 | ||
Former [2013/26] | AT | 03.11.2010 | |
BE | 03.11.2010 | ||
CY | 03.11.2010 | ||
CZ | 03.11.2010 | ||
DK | 03.11.2010 | ||
EE | 03.11.2010 | ||
FI | 03.11.2010 | ||
IT | 03.11.2010 | ||
LT | 03.11.2010 | ||
LV | 03.11.2010 | ||
NL | 03.11.2010 | ||
PL | 03.11.2010 | ||
RO | 03.11.2010 | ||
SI | 03.11.2010 | ||
SK | 03.11.2010 | ||
BG | 03.02.2011 | ||
GR | 04.02.2011 | ||
ES | 14.02.2011 | ||
IS | 03.03.2011 | ||
PT | 03.03.2011 | ||
IE | 25.07.2011 | ||
LU | 25.07.2011 | ||
MC | 31.07.2011 | ||
Former [2013/25] | AT | 03.11.2010 | |
BE | 03.11.2010 | ||
CZ | 03.11.2010 | ||
DK | 03.11.2010 | ||
EE | 03.11.2010 | ||
FI | 03.11.2010 | ||
IT | 03.11.2010 | ||
LT | 03.11.2010 | ||
LV | 03.11.2010 | ||
NL | 03.11.2010 | ||
PL | 03.11.2010 | ||
RO | 03.11.2010 | ||
SI | 03.11.2010 | ||
SK | 03.11.2010 | ||
BG | 03.02.2011 | ||
GR | 04.02.2011 | ||
ES | 14.02.2011 | ||
IS | 03.03.2011 | ||
PT | 03.03.2011 | ||
IE | 25.07.2011 | ||
LU | 25.07.2011 | ||
MC | 31.07.2011 | ||
Former [2012/35] | AT | 03.11.2010 | |
BE | 03.11.2010 | ||
CZ | 03.11.2010 | ||
DK | 03.11.2010 | ||
EE | 03.11.2010 | ||
FI | 03.11.2010 | ||
IT | 03.11.2010 | ||
LT | 03.11.2010 | ||
LV | 03.11.2010 | ||
NL | 03.11.2010 | ||
PL | 03.11.2010 | ||
RO | 03.11.2010 | ||
SI | 03.11.2010 | ||
SK | 03.11.2010 | ||
BG | 03.02.2011 | ||
GR | 04.02.2011 | ||
ES | 14.02.2011 | ||
IS | 03.03.2011 | ||
PT | 03.03.2011 | ||
IE | 25.07.2011 | ||
MC | 31.07.2011 | ||
Former [2012/11] | AT | 03.11.2010 | |
BE | 03.11.2010 | ||
CZ | 03.11.2010 | ||
DK | 03.11.2010 | ||
EE | 03.11.2010 | ||
FI | 03.11.2010 | ||
IT | 03.11.2010 | ||
LT | 03.11.2010 | ||
LV | 03.11.2010 | ||
NL | 03.11.2010 | ||
PL | 03.11.2010 | ||
RO | 03.11.2010 | ||
SI | 03.11.2010 | ||
SK | 03.11.2010 | ||
BG | 03.02.2011 | ||
GR | 04.02.2011 | ||
ES | 14.02.2011 | ||
IS | 03.03.2011 | ||
PT | 03.03.2011 | ||
MC | 31.07.2011 | ||
Former [2012/03] | AT | 03.11.2010 | |
BE | 03.11.2010 | ||
CZ | 03.11.2010 | ||
DK | 03.11.2010 | ||
EE | 03.11.2010 | ||
FI | 03.11.2010 | ||
IT | 03.11.2010 | ||
LT | 03.11.2010 | ||
LV | 03.11.2010 | ||
NL | 03.11.2010 | ||
PL | 03.11.2010 | ||
RO | 03.11.2010 | ||
SI | 03.11.2010 | ||
SK | 03.11.2010 | ||
BG | 03.02.2011 | ||
GR | 04.02.2011 | ||
ES | 14.02.2011 | ||
IS | 03.03.2011 | ||
PT | 03.03.2011 | ||
Former [2011/38] | AT | 03.11.2010 | |
BE | 03.11.2010 | ||
CZ | 03.11.2010 | ||
DK | 03.11.2010 | ||
EE | 03.11.2010 | ||
FI | 03.11.2010 | ||
LT | 03.11.2010 | ||
LV | 03.11.2010 | ||
NL | 03.11.2010 | ||
PL | 03.11.2010 | ||
RO | 03.11.2010 | ||
SI | 03.11.2010 | ||
SK | 03.11.2010 | ||
BG | 03.02.2011 | ||
GR | 04.02.2011 | ||
ES | 14.02.2011 | ||
IS | 03.03.2011 | ||
PT | 03.03.2011 | ||
Former [2011/35] | AT | 03.11.2010 | |
BE | 03.11.2010 | ||
CZ | 03.11.2010 | ||
EE | 03.11.2010 | ||
FI | 03.11.2010 | ||
LT | 03.11.2010 | ||
LV | 03.11.2010 | ||
NL | 03.11.2010 | ||
SI | 03.11.2010 | ||
BG | 03.02.2011 | ||
GR | 04.02.2011 | ||
ES | 14.02.2011 | ||
IS | 03.03.2011 | ||
PT | 03.03.2011 | ||
Former [2011/32] | AT | 03.11.2010 | |
BE | 03.11.2010 | ||
FI | 03.11.2010 | ||
LT | 03.11.2010 | ||
LV | 03.11.2010 | ||
NL | 03.11.2010 | ||
SI | 03.11.2010 | ||
BG | 03.02.2011 | ||
GR | 04.02.2011 | ||
ES | 14.02.2011 | ||
IS | 03.03.2011 | ||
PT | 03.03.2011 | ||
Former [2011/29] | AT | 03.11.2010 | |
FI | 03.11.2010 | ||
LT | 03.11.2010 | ||
LV | 03.11.2010 | ||
NL | 03.11.2010 | ||
SI | 03.11.2010 | ||
BG | 03.02.2011 | ||
GR | 04.02.2011 | ||
IS | 03.03.2011 | ||
PT | 03.03.2011 | ||
Former [2011/23] | FI | 03.11.2010 | |
LT | 03.11.2010 | ||
LV | 03.11.2010 | ||
IS | 03.03.2011 | ||
Former [2011/19] | LT | 03.11.2010 | Cited in | International search | [X]WO0154771 (CEDARS SINAI MEDICAL CENTER [US]) [X] 1-26 * claims 83-85 *; | [X]WO03075933 (UPSHER SMITH LAB INC [US]) [X] 27-29,34* page 6, line 14 - line 22 *; | [XD]WO03079987 (UNIV MARYLAND [US], et al) [XD] 27-106 * paragraphs [0141] , [0148]; claims 1,3,6,25-30 *; | [X] - YONG SOO LEE ET AL, "IN VITRO ANTITUMOR ACTIVITY OF CROMAKALIM IN HUMAN BRAIN TUMOR CELLS", PHARMACOLOGY, (1994), vol. 49, ISSN 0031-7012, pages 69 - 74, XP002948868 [X] 1-18,23-26 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1159/000139218 |