EP1810821 - HEAT-SHRINKABLE LAMINATED FILM, AND MOLDED ARTICLES, HEAT-SHRINKABLE LABELS AND CONTAINERS, MADE BY USING THE FILM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 18.11.2011 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.11.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 21.12.2011 [2011/51] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MITSUBISHI PLASTICS, INC. 5-2, Marunouchi 2-chome, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-0005 / JP | [2007/30] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HIRUMA, Takashi., Nagahama Plant of Mitsubishi Plastics 5-8, Mitsuya-cho, Nagahama-shi Shiga 5268660 / JP | 02 /
YAMADA, Takeyoshi., Nagahama Plant of Mitsubishi Plantics 5-8, Mitsuya-cho, Nagahama-shi Shiga 5268660 / JP | 03 /
TANAKA, Yukihiro., Nagahama Plant of Mitsubisi Plantics 5-8, Mitsuya-cho, Nagahama-shi Shiga 6258660 / JP | 04 /
MIYASHITA, You Nagahama Plant of Mitsubishi Plantic 5-8, Mitsuya-cho, Nagahama-shi Shiga 5268660 / JP | 05 /
TAKAGI, Jun., Nagahama Plant of Mitsubishi Plastics 2-8, Mitsuya-cho, Nagahama-shi Shiga 5268660 / JP | [2007/30] | Representative(s) | Hatt, Anna Louise Beck Greener Fulwood House 12 Fulwood Place London WC1V 6HR / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2007/30] | Hatt, Anna Louise Beck Greener Fulwood House 12 Fulwood Place London WC1V 6HR / GB | Application number, filing date | 05805988.2 | 11.11.2005 | [2007/30] | WO2005JP20754 | Priority number, date | JP20040327984 | 11.11.2004 Original published format: JP 2004327984 | [2007/30] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2006051920 | Date: | 18.05.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/20] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1810821 | Date: | 25.07.2007 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.05.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/30] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 18.05.2006 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.07.2010 | Classification | IPC: | B32B27/30, B29C61/06, B32B27/36, B65D25/36, B65D65/40, G09F3/04 | [2007/30] | CPC: |
G09F3/04 (EP,US);
B32B27/36 (EP,KR,US);
B29C61/003 (EP,US);
B29C61/06 (KR);
B32B25/042 (EP,US);
B32B25/08 (EP,US);
B32B25/14 (EP,US);
B32B27/30 (KR);
B32B27/308 (EP,US);
B32B7/022 (EP,KR,US);
B32B7/027 (EP,KR,US);
B32B7/12 (EP,US);
B29K2025/00 (EP,US);
B29K2067/00 (EP,US);
B29K2067/046 (EP,US);
B29L2009/00 (EP,US);
B32B2307/412 (EP,US);
B32B2307/51 (EP,US);
B32B2307/736 (EP,US);
B32B2439/00 (EP,US);
B32B2519/00 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | GB, PL [2008/08] |
Former [2007/30] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | WÄRMESCHRUMPFBARE LAMINIERTE FOLIE UND GEFORMTE ARTIKEL, WÄRMESCHRUMPFBARE ETIKETTEN UND DURCH VERWENDUNG DER FOLIE HERGESTELLTE BEHÄLTER | [2007/30] | English: | HEAT-SHRINKABLE LAMINATED FILM, AND MOLDED ARTICLES, HEAT-SHRINKABLE LABELS AND CONTAINERS, MADE BY USING THE FILM | [2007/30] | French: | FEUILLE STRATIFIEE THERMORETRACTABLE, ET ARTICLES MOULES, ETIQUETTES ET CONTENANTS THERMORETRACTABLES REALISES AU MOYEN D'UNE TELLE FEUILLE | [2007/30] | Entry into regional phase | 23.05.2007 | Translation filed | 23.05.2007 | National basic fee paid | 23.05.2007 | Search fee paid | 23.05.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 23.05.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 23.05.2007 | Examination requested [2007/30] | 18.01.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 04.02.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.06.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2011/51] | 21.07.2011 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2011/51] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 04.02.2011 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.11.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.10.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.10.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.10.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [E]EP1752285 (MITSUBISHI PLASTICS INC [JP]); | [E]EP1810822 (MITSUBISHI PLASTICS INC [JP]) | International search | [A]JPS6141542 (TAKIRON CO); | [A]JPH11138708 (MITSUBISHI PLASTICS IND); | [A]JP2002052672 (MITSUBISHI PLASTICS IND); | [A]JP2002351332 (FUJI SEAL INC); | [A]JP2004091712 (ASAHI CHEMICAL CORP) |