Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JPWO2006057162 | Global Dossier | 05.06.2008 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP2005324340 | 11.11.2004 | WO2005JP20516 | 09.11.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1820749 | Global Dossier | 24.12.2008 | A4 | EP1820749 | 22.08.2007 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP2005324340 | 11.11.2004 | WO2005JP20516 | 09.11.2005 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2006057162 | Global Dossier | 01.06.2006 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP2005324340 | 11.11.2004 |