EP1820749 - PACKAGING ENVELOPE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 23.07.2010 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.07.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 25.08.2010 [2010/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Dainichi Printing Co., Ltd. Iriyama Building 5-10-5 Shiba Minato-ku Tokyo, 108-0014 / JP | [2007/34] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SEKO, Akiyoshi, Dainichi Printing Co., Ltd. Iriyama Building, 5-10-5, Shiba Minato-ku Tokyo, 108-0014 / JP | [2007/34] | Representative(s) | Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/35] | Vossius & Partner Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | ||
Former [2007/34] | Vossius & Partner Siebertstrasse 4 81675 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 05806222.5 | 09.11.2005 | [2007/34] | WO2005JP20516 | Priority number, date | JP20050324340 | 11.11.2004 Original published format: JP 2005324340 | [2007/34] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2006057162 | Date: | 01.06.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/22] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1820749 | Date: | 22.08.2007 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 01.06.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/34] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 01.06.2006 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.11.2008 | Classification | IPC: | B65D85/57, B65D33/24 | [2007/34] | CPC: |
G11B33/0422 (EP);
G11B33/0494 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2008/08] |
Former [2007/34] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERPACKUNGSHÜLLE | [2007/34] | English: | PACKAGING ENVELOPE | [2007/34] | French: | ENVELOPPE D'EMBALLAGE | [2007/34] | Entry into regional phase | 08.06.2007 | Translation filed | 08.06.2007 | National basic fee paid | 08.06.2007 | Search fee paid | 08.06.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 08.06.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 08.06.2007 | Examination requested [2007/34] | 23.03.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 31.07.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.10.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.03.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2010/34] | 07.04.2010 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2010/34] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.11.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.11.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.11.2009 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JPH09309580 (DAINIPPON PRINTING CO LTD) [A] 1,6,7* abstract * | International search | [Y]JPH09309580 (DAINIPPON PRINTING CO LTD); | [Y]JPH07277384 (HAGOROMO KK); | [Y]JP3033149U ; | [Y]JPH0826366 (TOSHIBA EMI KK) |