EP1816168 - CURABLE COMPOSITION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 01.02.2013 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.02.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 06.03.2013 [2013/10] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Kaneka Corporation 2-4, Nakanoshima 3-chome Kita-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 530-8288 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2007/32] | For all designated states Kaneka Corporation 2-4, Nakanoshima 3-chome Kita-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 530-8288 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WAKABAYASHI, Katsuyu, KANEKA CORPORATION Osaka Plant, 1-1, Torikainishi 5-Chome Settsu-shi, Osaka 566-0072 / JP | 02 /
MATSUSHITA, Noriko, KANEKA CORPORATION Takasago Plant, 1-8, Takasagocho Miyamaecho Takasago-shi, Hyogo 676-8688 / JP | 03 /
OKAMOTO, Toshihiko, KANEKA CORPORATION Takasago Plant, 1-8, Takasagocho Miyamaecho Takasago-shi, Hyogo 676-8688 / JP | [2007/32] | Representative(s) | Hart-Davis, Jason, et al Cabinet Beau de Loménie 158, rue de l'Université 75340 Paris Cedex 07 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2009/52] | Hart-Davis, Jason, et al Cabinet Beau de Loménie 158, rue de l'Université 75340 Paris Cedex 07 / FR | ||
Former [2007/32] | Hart Davis, Jason, et al Cabinet Beau de Loménie, 158, rue de l'Université 75007 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 05806253.0 | 09.11.2005 | [2007/32] | WO2005JP20500 | Priority number, date | JP20040325955 | 10.11.2004 Original published format: JP 2004325955 | [2007/32] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2006051798 | Date: | 18.05.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/20] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1816168 | Date: | 08.08.2007 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.05.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/32] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 18.05.2006 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.07.2011 | Classification | IPC: | C08L101/10, C08K5/09, C08K5/17, C08K5/57, C09J201/10, C09K3/10 | [2007/32] | CPC: |
C08L101/10 (EP,US);
C08K5/16 (EP,US);
C08K5/57 (EP,US);
C08L75/08 (EP,US);
C09J175/08 (EP,US);
C09J201/10 (EP,US);
C09K3/1018 (EP,US)
(-)
| C-Set: |
C08K5/16, C08L71/02 (EP,US);
C08K5/57, C08L71/02 (US,EP) | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/32] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | HÄRTBARE ZUSAMMENSETZUNG | [2007/32] | English: | CURABLE COMPOSITION | [2007/32] | French: | COMPOSITION DURCISSABLE | [2007/32] | Entry into regional phase | 01.06.2007 | Translation filed | 01.06.2007 | National basic fee paid | 01.06.2007 | Search fee paid | 01.06.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 01.06.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 01.06.2007 | Examination requested [2007/32] | 03.02.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 02.03.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 13.09.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2013/10] | 22.10.2012 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2013/10] | Divisional application(s) | EP12183135.8 / EP2546307 | EP12183144.0 / EP2546308 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 02.03.2012 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 03.10.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.02.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.10.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 22.09.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.11.2012 | 08   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]JP2000129126 (ASAHI GLASS CO LTD) [X] 1-12* examples 1-22 * | International search | [X]JPH0841358 (KANEGAFUCHI CHEMICAL IND); | [X]JPH11124509 (ASAHI GLASS CO LTD); | [X]JP2003055511 (KANEGAFUCHI CHEMICAL IND); | [X]JP2003206410 (KANEGAFUCHI CHEMICAL IND) |