EP1815077 - THERMAL INSULATING BOARD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2007/32] | INSULATING BOARD AND METHOD FOR THE PRODUCTION THEREOF | ||
[2010/27] | Status | Patent revoked Status updated on 12.04.2019 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 27.04.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.04.2019 | Revocation of patent | published on 15.05.2019 [2019/20] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Knauf Insulation SPRL Rue de Maestricht 95 4600 Visé / BE | [2016/47] |
Former [2007/32] | For all designated states Knauf Dämmstoffe GmbH Industrieweg 1 59329 Wadersloh-Liesborn / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ZIMPFER, Harald Am Herrenacker 14 97265 Hettstadt / DE | 02 /
SEEMANN, Andreas Weidestrasse 68 59514 Welver / DE | 03 /
MÜNDER, Kurt Goethestrasse 1a 59555 Lippstadt / DE | 04 /
TUMP, Michael Leipziger Strasse 23 57462 Olpe / DE | [2007/32] | Representative(s) | ARC-IP ARC-IP sprl Rue Emile Francqui 4 1435 Mont-Saint-Guibert / BE | [N/P] |
Former [2013/27] | Müller-Boré & Partner Patentanwälte Grafinger Straße 2 81671 München / DE | ||
Former [2012/48] | KEIL & SCHAAFHAUSEN Patentanwälte, et al Cronstettenstraße 66 60322 Frankfurt am Main / DE | ||
Former [2011/02] | Farmer, Guy Dominic, et al ARC-IP sprl rue Emile Francqui, 4 1435 Mont-Saint-Guibert / BE | ||
Former [2009/23] | Farmer, Guy Dominic, et al ARC-IP Chaussée de La Hulpe, 185 1170 Bruxelles / BE | ||
Former [2009/17] | (deleted) | ||
Former [2009/07] | Müller, Karl-Ernst Patentanwälte Becker & Müller Turmstrasse 22 40878 Ratingen / DE | ||
Former [2007/32] | KEIL & SCHAAFHAUSEN Patentanwälte Cronstettenstrasse 66 60322 Frankfurt am Main / DE | Application number, filing date | 05807392.5 | 21.11.2005 | [2007/32] | WO2005EP12443 | Priority number, date | DE20041056335 | 22.11.2004 Original published format: DE102004056335 | [2007/32] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2006056387 | Date: | 01.06.2006 | Language: | DE | [2006/22] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1815077 | Date: | 08.08.2007 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 01.06.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/32] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1815077 | Date: | 12.01.2011 | Language: | DE | [2011/02] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 01.06.2006 | Classification | IPC: | E04B1/80, E04B1/90 | [2007/32] | CPC: |
E04B1/90 (EP);
B29C65/18 (EP);
B29C65/7437 (EP);
B29C66/1122 (EP);
B29C66/21 (EP);
B29C66/45 (EP);
B29C66/71 (EP);
B29C66/727 (EP);
B29C66/81433 (EP);
B29C66/8322 (EP);
B32B5/32 (EP);
E04B1/80 (EP);
B29K2025/00 (EP);
B29K2105/04 (EP);
B29K2995/0002 (EP);
| C-Set: |
B29C66/71, B29K2025/06 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/32] | Extension states | AL | 10.06.2006 | BA | 10.06.2006 | HR | 10.06.2006 | MK | 10.06.2006 | YU | 10.06.2006 | Title | German: | WÄRMEDÄMMPLATTE | [2010/27] | English: | THERMAL INSULATING BOARD | [2010/27] | French: | PANNEAU THERMOISOLANT | [2010/27] |
Former [2007/32] | D[MMPLATTE UND VERFAHREN ZU IHRER HERSTELLUNG | ||
Former [2007/32] | INSULATING BOARD AND METHOD FOR THE PRODUCTION THEREOF | ||
Former [2007/32] | PANNEAU ISOLANT ET SON PROCEDE DE PRODUCTION | Entry into regional phase | 10.06.2006 | National basic fee paid | 10.06.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 10.06.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 10.06.2006 | Examination requested [2007/32] | 10.07.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.11.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.06.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.10.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 15.10.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP10011866.0 / EP2284324 | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
09.09.2011
18.10.2011
ADMISSIBLE Sager AG Leutwilerstrasse 1 5724 Dürrenäsch / CH Opponent's representative Keller Schneider Patent- und Markenanwälte AG (Zürich), et al, et al Beethovenstrasse 49 Postfach 8027 Zürich / CH | 02
04.10.2011
18.10.2011
ADMISSIBLE Flatz GmbH Funkenstrasse 6 6923 Lauterach / AT Opponent's representative Beer & Partner Patentanwälte KG, et al, et al Lindengasse 8 1070 Wien / AT | 03
07.10.2011
18.10.2011
ADMISSIBLE STO AG Ehrenbachstrasse 1 79780 Stühlingen / DE Opponent's representative Kietzmann, Lutz, et al, et al Maiwald GmbH Grünstraße 25 40212 Düsseldorf / DE | 04
11.10.2011
09.11.2011
ADMISSIBLE Fixit Trockenmörtel Holding AG Haldenstrasse 5 6342 Baar / CH Opponent's representative Kuhnen & Wacker Patent- und Rechtsanwaltsbüro PartG mbB Prinz-Ludwig-Straße 40A 85354 Freising / DE | 05
12.10.2011
09.11.2011
ADMISSIBLE Gonon Isolation AG (SA) Oberwiesen 8226 Schleitheim / CH Opponent's representative Kohl, Karl-Heinz, et al, et al Patentanwälte Dipl.-Ing. A.K. Jackisch-Kohl Dipl.-Ing. K.H. Kohl Stuttgarter Strasse 115 70469 Stuttgart / DE | 06
12.10.2011
09.11.2011
ADMISSIBLE Swisspor Management AG Bahnhofstr. 50 6312 Steinhausen / CH Opponent's representative Grimm, Siegfried, et al, et al E. Blum & Co. AG Vorderberg 11 8044 Zürich / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2018/12] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
09.09.2011
18.10.2011
ADMISSIBLE Sager AG Leutwilerstrasse 1 5724 Dürrenäsch / CH Opponent's representative Schneider Feldmann AG Patent- und Markenanwälte, et al, et al Beethovenstrasse 49 Postfach 8027 Zürich / CH | ||
02
04.10.2011
18.10.2011
ADMISSIBLE Flatz GmbH Funkenstrasse 6 6923 Lauterach / AT Opponent's representative Beer & Partner Patentanwälte KG, et al, et al Lindengasse 8 1070 Wien / AT | |||
03
07.10.2011
18.10.2011
ADMISSIBLE STO AG Ehrenbachstrasse 1 79780 Stühlingen / DE Opponent's representative Kietzmann, Lutz, et al, et al Maiwald Patentanwalts GmbH Grünstrasse 22-24 40212 Düsseldorf / DE | |||
04
11.10.2011
09.11.2011
ADMISSIBLE Fixit Trockenmörtel Holding AG Haldenstrasse 5 6342 Baar / CH Opponent's representative Kuhnen & Wacker Patent- und Rechtsanwaltsbüro Prinz-Ludwig-Straße 40A 85354 Freising / DE | |||
05
12.10.2011
09.11.2011
ADMISSIBLE Gonon Isolation AG (SA) Oberwiesen 8226 Schleitheim / CH Opponent's representative Kohl, Karl-Heinz, et al, et al Patentanwälte Dipl.-Ing. A.K. Jackisch-Kohl Dipl.-Ing. K.H. Kohl Stuttgarter Strasse 115 70469 Stuttgart / DE | |||
06
12.10.2011
09.11.2011
ADMISSIBLE Swisspor Management AG Bahnhofstr. 50 6312 Steinhausen / CH Opponent's representative Grimm, Siegfried, et al, et al E. Blum & Co. AG Vorderberg 11 8044 Zürich / CH | |||
Former [2013/39] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
09.09.2011
18.10.2011
ADMISSIBLE Sager AG Leutwilerstrasse 1 5724 Dürrenäsch / CH Opponent's representative Frommhold, Joachim, et al, et al Schneider Feldmann AG Beethovenstrasse 49 8002 Zürich / CH | ||
02
04.10.2011
18.10.2011
ADMISSIBLE Flatz Verpackungen - Styropor GmbH Funkenstrasse 6 6923 Lauterach / AT Opponent's representative Beer & Partner Patentanwälte KG, et al, et al Lindengasse 8 1070 Wien / AT | |||
03
07.10.2011
18.10.2011
ADMISSIBLE STO AG Ehrenbachstrasse 1 79780 Stühlingen / DE Opponent's representative Kietzmann, Lutz, et al, et al Maiwald Patentanwalts GmbH Grünstrasse 22-24 40212 Düsseldorf / DE | |||
04
11.10.2011
09.11.2011
ADMISSIBLE Fixit Trockenmörtel Holding AG Haldenstrasse 5 6342 Baar / CH Opponent's representative Kuhnen & Wacker Patent- und Rechtsanwaltsbüro Prinz-Ludwig-Straße 40A 85354 Freising / DE | |||
05
12.10.2011
09.11.2011
ADMISSIBLE Gonon Isolation AG (SA) Oberwiesen 8226 Schleitheim / CH Opponent's representative Kohl, Karl-Heinz, et al, et al Patentanwälte Dipl.-Ing. A.K. Jackisch-Kohl Dipl.-Ing. K.H. Kohl Stuttgarter Strasse 115 70469 Stuttgart / DE | |||
06
12.10.2011
09.11.2011
ADMISSIBLE Swisspor Management AG Bahnhofstr. 50 6312 Steinhausen / CH Opponent's representative Grimm, Siegfried, et al, et al E. Blum & Co. AG Vorderberg 11 8044 Zürich / CH | |||
Former [2013/22] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
09.09.2011
18.10.2011
ADMISSIBLE Sager AG Leutwilerstrasse 1 5724 Dürrenäsch / CH Opponent's representative Frommhold, Joachim, et al, et al Schneider Feldmann AG Beethovenstrasse 49 8002 Zürich / CH | ||
02
04.10.2011
18.10.2011
ADMISSIBLE Flatz Verpackungen - Styropor GmbH Funkenstrasse 6 6923 Lauterach / AT Opponent's representative Beer & Partner Patentanwälte KG, et al, et al Lindengasse 8 1070 Wien / AT | |||
03
07.10.2011
18.10.2011
ADMISSIBLE STO AG Ehrenbachstrasse 1 79780 Stühlingen / DE Opponent's representative Kietzmann, Lutz, et al, et al Maiwald Patentanwalts GmbH Grünstrasse 22-24 40212 Düsseldorf / DE | |||
04
11.10.2011
09.11.2011
ADMISSIBLE Fixit Trockenmörtel Holding AG Haldenstrasse 5 6342 Baar / CH Opponent's representative Kopp, Stephan, et al, et al Kuhnen & Wacker Patent- und Rechtsanwaltsbüro Prinz-Ludwig-Strasse 40A 85354 Freising / DE | |||
05
12.10.2011
09.11.2011
ADMISSIBLE Gonon Isolation AG (SA) Oberwiesen 8226 Schleitheim / CH Opponent's representative Kohl, Karl-Heinz, et al, et al Patentanwälte Dipl.-Ing. A.K. Jackisch-Kohl Dipl.-Ing. K.H. Kohl Stuttgarter Strasse 115 70469 Stuttgart / DE | |||
06
12.10.2011
09.11.2011
ADMISSIBLE Swisspor Management AG Bahnhofstr. 50 6312 Steinhausen / CH Opponent's representative Grimm, Siegfried, et al, et al E. Blum & Co. AG Vorderberg 11 8044 Zürich / CH | |||
Former [2013/16] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
09.09.2011
18.10.2011
ADMISSIBLE Sager AG Leutwilerstrasse 1 5724 Dürrenäsch / CH Opponent's representative Frommhold, Joachim, et al, et al Schneider Feldmann AG Beethovenstrasse 49 8002 Zürich / CH | ||
02
04.10.2011
18.10.2011
ADMISSIBLE Flatz Verpackungen - Styropor GmbH Funkenstrasse 6 6923 Lauterach / AT Opponent's representative Hehenberger, Reinhard, et al, et al BEER & PARTNER PATENTANWÄLTE KG Lindengasse 8 1070 Wien / AT | |||
03
07.10.2011
18.10.2011
ADMISSIBLE STO AG Ehrenbachstrasse 1 79780 Stühlingen / DE Opponent's representative Kietzmann, Lutz, et al, et al Maiwald Patentanwalts GmbH Grünstrasse 22-24 40212 Düsseldorf / DE | |||
04
11.10.2011
09.11.2011
ADMISSIBLE Fixit Trockenmörtel Holding AG Haldenstrasse 5 6342 Baar / CH Opponent's representative Kopp, Stephan, et al, et al Kuhnen & Wacker Patent- und Rechtsanwaltsbüro Prinz-Ludwig-Strasse 40A 85354 Freising / DE | |||
05
12.10.2011
09.11.2011
ADMISSIBLE Gonon Isolation AG (SA) Oberwiesen 8226 Schleitheim / CH Opponent's representative Kohl, Karl-Heinz, et al, et al Patentanwälte Dipl.-Ing. A.K. Jackisch-Kohl Dipl.-Ing. K.H. Kohl Stuttgarter Strasse 115 70469 Stuttgart / DE | |||
06
12.10.2011
09.11.2011
ADMISSIBLE Swisspor Management AG Bahnhofstr. 50 6312 Steinhausen / CH Opponent's representative Grimm, Siegfried, et al, et al E. Blum & Co. AG Vorderberg 11 8044 Zürich / CH | |||
Former [2011/47] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
09.09.2011
18.10.2011
ADMISSIBLE Sager AG Leutwilerstrasse 1 5724 Dürrenäsch / CH Opponent's representative Frommhold, Joachim, et al, et al Schneider Feldmann AG Beethovenstrasse 49 CH-8002 Zürich / CH | ||
02
04.10.2011
18.10.2011
ADMISSIBLE Flatz Verpackungen - Styropor GmbH Funkenstrasse 6 6923 Lauterach / AT Opponent's representative Hehenberger, Reinhard, et al, et al BEER & PARTNER PATENTANWÄLTE KG Lindengasse 8 1070 Wien / AT | |||
03
07.10.2011
18.10.2011
ADMISSIBLE STO AG Ehrenbachstrasse 1 79780 Stühlingen / DE Opponent's representative Maiwald Patentanwalts GmbH, et al, et al Benrather Strasse 15 40213 Düsseldorf / DE | |||
04
11.10.2011
ADMISSIBLE Fixit Trockenmörtel Holding AG Haldenstrasse 5 6342 Baar / CH Opponent's representative Kopp, Stephan Kuhnen & Wacker Patent- und Rechtsanwaltsbüro Prinz-Ludwig-Strasse 40A 85354 Freising / DE | |||
05
12.10.2011
ADMISSIBLE Gonon Isolation AG (SA) Oberwiesen 8226 Schleitheim / CH Opponent's representative Kohl, Karl-Heinz Patentanwälte Dipl.-Ing. A.K. Jackisch-Kohl Dipl.-Ing. K.H. Kohl Stuttgarter Strasse 115 70469 Stuttgart / DE | |||
06
12.10.2011
ADMISSIBLE Swisspor Management AG Bahnhofstr. 50 6312 Steinhausen / CH Opponent's representative Grimm, Siegfried E. Blum & Co. AG Vorderberg 11 8044 Zürich / CH | |||
Former [2011/46] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
09.09.2011
ADMISSIBLE Sager AG Leutwilerstrasse 1 5724 Dürrenäsch / CH Opponent's representative Frommhold, Joachim Schneider Feldmann AG Beethovenstrasse 49 CH-8002 Zürich / CH | ||
02
04.10.2011
ADMISSIBLE Flatz Verpackungen - Styropor GmbH Funkenstrasse 6 6923 Lauterach / AT Opponent's representative Hehenberger, Reinhard BEER & PARTNER PATENTANWÄLTE KG Lindengasse 8 1070 Wien / AT | |||
03
07.10.2011
ADMISSIBLE STO AG Ehrenbachstrasse 1 79780 Stühlingen / DE Opponent's representative Maiwald Patentanwalts GmbH Benrather Strasse 15 40213 Düsseldorf / DE | |||
04
11.10.2011
ADMISSIBLE Fixit Trockenmörtel Holding AG Haldenstrasse 5 6342 Baar / CH Opponent's representative Kopp, Stephan Kuhnen & Wacker Patent- und Rechtsanwaltsbüro Prinz-Ludwig-Strasse 40A 85354 Freising / DE | |||
05
12.10.2011
ADMISSIBLE Gonon Isolation AG (SA) Oberwiesen 8226 Schleitheim / CH Opponent's representative Kohl, Karl-Heinz Patentanwälte Dipl.-Ing. A.K. Jackisch-Kohl Dipl.-Ing. K.H. Kohl Stuttgarter Strasse 115 70469 Stuttgart / DE | |||
Former [2011/45] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
09.09.2011
ADMISSIBLE Sager AG Leutwilerstrasse 1 5724 Dürrenäsch / CH Opponent's representative Frommhold, Joachim Schneider Feldmann AG Beethovenstrasse 49 CH-8002 Zürich / CH | ||
02
04.10.2011
ADMISSIBLE Flatz Verpackungen - Styropor GmbH Funkenstrasse 6 6923 Lauterach / AT Opponent's representative Hehenberger, Reinhard BEER & PARTNER PATENTANWÄLTE KG Lindengasse 8 1070 Wien / AT | |||
Former [2011/42] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
09.09.2011
ADMISSIBLE Sager AG Leutwilerstrasse 1 5724 Dürrenäsch / CH Opponent's representative Frommhold, Joachim Schneider Feldmann AG Beethovenstrasse 49 CH-8002 Zürich / CH | 18.11.2011 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 28.03.2012 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 26.02.2013 | Date of oral proceedings | 20.03.2013 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 13.04.2018 | Date of oral proceedings | 13.04.2018 | Legal effect of revocation of patent [2019/20] | 04.05.2018 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 04.05.2018 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked | Appeal following opposition | 21.05.2013 | Appeal received No. T1197/13 | 26.07.2013 | Statement of grounds filed | 22.11.2016 | Result of appeal procedure: continuation of opposition procedure | 22.11.2016 | Date of oral proceedings | 30.11.2016 | Minutes of the oral proceedings despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.11.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.11.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.11.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 12.01.2011 | IS | 12.05.2011 | MC | 30.11.2011 | CZ | 21.11.2014 | FI | 21.11.2014 | GB | 21.11.2014 | IE | 21.11.2014 | IT | 21.11.2014 | LT | 21.11.2014 | LU | 21.11.2014 | LV | 21.11.2014 | PL | 21.11.2014 | RO | 21.11.2014 | SK | 21.11.2014 | TR | 21.11.2014 | ES | 22.11.2014 | HU | 22.11.2014 | SE | 22.11.2014 | SI | 22.11.2014 | BE | 30.11.2014 | CH | 30.11.2014 | DK | 30.11.2014 | EE | 30.11.2014 | LI | 30.11.2014 | FR | 01.12.2014 | PT | 21.05.2015 | NL | 01.06.2015 | GR | 04.06.2015 | BG | 08.08.2017 | [2019/10] |
Former [2017/46] | CY | 12.01.2011 | |
IS | 12.05.2011 | ||
MC | 30.11.2011 | ||
CZ | 21.11.2014 | ||
FI | 21.11.2014 | ||
GB | 21.11.2014 | ||
IE | 21.11.2014 | ||
IT | 21.11.2014 | ||
LT | 21.11.2014 | ||
LU | 21.11.2014 | ||
LV | 21.11.2014 | ||
PL | 21.11.2014 | ||
RO | 21.11.2014 | ||
SK | 21.11.2014 | ||
TR | 21.11.2014 | ||
ES | 22.11.2014 | ||
HU | 22.11.2014 | ||
SE | 22.11.2014 | ||
SI | 22.11.2014 | ||
BE | 30.11.2014 | ||
BG | 30.11.2014 | ||
CH | 30.11.2014 | ||
DK | 30.11.2014 | ||
EE | 30.11.2014 | ||
LI | 30.11.2014 | ||
FR | 01.12.2014 | ||
PT | 21.05.2015 | ||
NL | 01.06.2015 | ||
GR | 04.06.2015 | ||
Former [2016/32] | CY | 12.01.2011 | |
IS | 12.05.2011 | ||
MC | 30.11.2011 | ||
CZ | 21.11.2014 | ||
FI | 21.11.2014 | ||
GB | 21.11.2014 | ||
IE | 21.11.2014 | ||
IT | 21.11.2014 | ||
LT | 21.11.2014 | ||
LU | 21.11.2014 | ||
LV | 21.11.2014 | ||
PL | 21.11.2014 | ||
RO | 21.11.2014 | ||
SK | 21.11.2014 | ||
ES | 22.11.2014 | ||
HU | 22.11.2014 | ||
SE | 22.11.2014 | ||
SI | 22.11.2014 | ||
BE | 30.11.2014 | ||
BG | 30.11.2014 | ||
CH | 30.11.2014 | ||
DK | 30.11.2014 | ||
EE | 30.11.2014 | ||
LI | 30.11.2014 | ||
FR | 01.12.2014 | ||
PT | 21.05.2015 | ||
NL | 01.06.2015 | ||
GR | 04.06.2015 | ||
Former [2016/10] | CY | 12.01.2011 | |
IS | 12.05.2011 | ||
MC | 30.11.2011 | ||
CZ | 21.11.2014 | ||
FI | 21.11.2014 | ||
GB | 21.11.2014 | ||
IE | 21.11.2014 | ||
IT | 21.11.2014 | ||
LT | 21.11.2014 | ||
LU | 21.11.2014 | ||
LV | 21.11.2014 | ||
PL | 21.11.2014 | ||
RO | 21.11.2014 | ||
SK | 21.11.2014 | ||
ES | 22.11.2014 | ||
HU | 22.11.2014 | ||
SE | 22.11.2014 | ||
SI | 22.11.2014 | ||
BE | 30.11.2014 | ||
CH | 30.11.2014 | ||
DK | 30.11.2014 | ||
EE | 30.11.2014 | ||
LI | 30.11.2014 | ||
FR | 01.12.2014 | ||
PT | 21.05.2015 | ||
NL | 01.06.2015 | ||
GR | 04.06.2015 | ||
Former [2016/03] | CY | 12.01.2011 | |
IS | 12.05.2011 | ||
MC | 30.11.2011 | ||
CZ | 21.11.2014 | ||
FI | 21.11.2014 | ||
GB | 21.11.2014 | ||
IE | 21.11.2014 | ||
IT | 21.11.2014 | ||
LT | 21.11.2014 | ||
LU | 21.11.2014 | ||
LV | 21.11.2014 | ||
RO | 21.11.2014 | ||
SK | 21.11.2014 | ||
HU | 22.11.2014 | ||
SE | 22.11.2014 | ||
SI | 22.11.2014 | ||
BE | 30.11.2014 | ||
CH | 30.11.2014 | ||
DK | 30.11.2014 | ||
EE | 30.11.2014 | ||
LI | 30.11.2014 | ||
FR | 01.12.2014 | ||
PT | 21.05.2015 | ||
NL | 01.06.2015 | ||
GR | 04.06.2015 | ||
Former [2015/50] | CY | 12.01.2011 | |
IS | 12.05.2011 | ||
MC | 30.11.2011 | ||
CZ | 21.11.2014 | ||
FI | 21.11.2014 | ||
GB | 21.11.2014 | ||
IE | 21.11.2014 | ||
LT | 21.11.2014 | ||
LU | 21.11.2014 | ||
LV | 21.11.2014 | ||
RO | 21.11.2014 | ||
SK | 21.11.2014 | ||
HU | 22.11.2014 | ||
SE | 22.11.2014 | ||
SI | 22.11.2014 | ||
BE | 30.11.2014 | ||
CH | 30.11.2014 | ||
DK | 30.11.2014 | ||
EE | 30.11.2014 | ||
LI | 30.11.2014 | ||
FR | 01.12.2014 | ||
PT | 21.05.2015 | ||
NL | 01.06.2015 | ||
GR | 04.06.2015 | ||
Former [2015/48] | CY | 12.01.2011 | |
IS | 12.05.2011 | ||
MC | 30.11.2011 | ||
CZ | 21.11.2014 | ||
FI | 21.11.2014 | ||
GB | 21.11.2014 | ||
IE | 21.11.2014 | ||
LT | 21.11.2014 | ||
LU | 21.11.2014 | ||
LV | 21.11.2014 | ||
RO | 21.11.2014 | ||
SK | 21.11.2014 | ||
HU | 22.11.2014 | ||
SE | 22.11.2014 | ||
SI | 22.11.2014 | ||
BE | 30.11.2014 | ||
CH | 30.11.2014 | ||
EE | 30.11.2014 | ||
LI | 30.11.2014 | ||
PT | 21.05.2015 | ||
NL | 01.06.2015 | ||
GR | 04.06.2015 | ||
Former [2015/46] | CY | 12.01.2011 | |
IS | 12.05.2011 | ||
MC | 30.11.2011 | ||
CZ | 21.11.2014 | ||
FI | 21.11.2014 | ||
IE | 21.11.2014 | ||
LT | 21.11.2014 | ||
LU | 21.11.2014 | ||
LV | 21.11.2014 | ||
RO | 21.11.2014 | ||
SK | 21.11.2014 | ||
HU | 22.11.2014 | ||
SE | 22.11.2014 | ||
SI | 22.11.2014 | ||
BE | 30.11.2014 | ||
CH | 30.11.2014 | ||
EE | 30.11.2014 | ||
LI | 30.11.2014 | ||
PT | 21.05.2015 | ||
NL | 01.06.2015 | ||
GR | 04.06.2015 | ||
Former [2015/39] | CY | 12.01.2011 | |
IS | 12.05.2011 | ||
MC | 30.11.2011 | ||
CZ | 21.11.2014 | ||
FI | 21.11.2014 | ||
LT | 21.11.2014 | ||
LU | 21.11.2014 | ||
LV | 21.11.2014 | ||
RO | 21.11.2014 | ||
SK | 21.11.2014 | ||
HU | 22.11.2014 | ||
SE | 22.11.2014 | ||
SI | 22.11.2014 | ||
BE | 30.11.2014 | ||
CH | 30.11.2014 | ||
EE | 30.11.2014 | ||
LI | 30.11.2014 | ||
PT | 21.05.2015 | ||
NL | 01.06.2015 | ||
GR | 04.06.2015 | ||
Former [2015/37] | CY | 12.01.2011 | |
IS | 12.05.2011 | ||
MC | 30.11.2011 | ||
CZ | 21.11.2014 | ||
FI | 21.11.2014 | ||
LT | 21.11.2014 | ||
LU | 21.11.2014 | ||
RO | 21.11.2014 | ||
SK | 21.11.2014 | ||
SE | 22.11.2014 | ||
SI | 22.11.2014 | ||
BE | 30.11.2014 | ||
CH | 30.11.2014 | ||
EE | 30.11.2014 | ||
LI | 30.11.2014 | ||
PT | 21.05.2015 | ||
GR | 04.06.2015 | ||
Former [2015/36] | CY | 12.01.2011 | |
IS | 12.05.2011 | ||
MC | 30.11.2011 | ||
CZ | 21.11.2014 | ||
FI | 21.11.2014 | ||
LT | 21.11.2014 | ||
LU | 21.11.2014 | ||
RO | 21.11.2014 | ||
SE | 22.11.2014 | ||
SI | 22.11.2014 | ||
BE | 30.11.2014 | ||
CH | 30.11.2014 | ||
EE | 30.11.2014 | ||
LI | 30.11.2014 | ||
PT | 21.05.2015 | ||
Former [2015/35] | CY | 12.01.2011 | |
IS | 12.05.2011 | ||
MC | 30.11.2011 | ||
LT | 21.11.2014 | ||
LU | 21.11.2014 | ||
BE | 30.11.2014 | ||
CH | 30.11.2014 | ||
EE | 30.11.2014 | ||
LI | 30.11.2014 | ||
PT | 21.05.2015 | ||
Former [2015/33] | CY | 12.01.2011 | |
IS | 12.05.2011 | ||
MC | 30.11.2011 | ||
LU | 21.11.2014 | ||
BE | 30.11.2014 | ||
CH | 30.11.2014 | ||
LI | 30.11.2014 | ||
Former [2015/30] | CY | 12.01.2011 | |
IS | 12.05.2011 | ||
MC | 30.11.2011 | ||
LU | 21.11.2014 | ||
BE | 30.11.2014 | ||
Former [2015/21] | CY | 12.01.2011 | |
IS | 12.05.2011 | ||
MC | 30.11.2011 | ||
Former [2011/39] | CY | 12.01.2011 | |
IS | 12.05.2011 | Cited in | International search | [XI]JPH04270643 ; | [DA]DE8226114U (DEITERMANN, WOLFGANG, 4354 DATTELN, DE) [DA] 1,4,10 * the whole document *; | [XI]US5066531 (LEGG WARREN F [US], et al) [X] 12,14,15 * the whole document *[I] 13; | [DA]EP0620246 (ALGOSTAT GMBH & CO KG [DE]) [DA] 1-11 * the whole document *; | [DA]EP1142942 (BASF AG [DE]) [DA] 1-11 * the whole document *; | [A]EP1201838 (ALCOPOR MAN AG [CH]) [A] 1-4,10 * the whole document * | [XI] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19930208), vol. 017, no. 064, Database accession no. (M - 1364), & JP04270643 A 19920928 (SEKISUI PLASTICS CO LTD) [X] 12,14,15 * the whole document * [I] 13 |