EP1791802 - OPTIMIZED LIQUID-PHASE OXIDATION OF P-XYLENE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 26.07.2019 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 17.08.2018 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 22.03.2018 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 15.02.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.07.2021 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 11.08.2021 [2021/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states GRUPO PETROTEMEX, S.A. DE C.V. Ricardo Margain No. 444 Torre sur, Piso 16 Col. Valle de Campestre San Pedro Garza Garcia, Nuevo Leon 66265 / MX | [2013/40] |
Former [2011/35] | For all designated states GRUPO PETROTEMEX, S.A. DE C.V. Ricardo Margain No. 444 Torre sur, Piso 16 Col. Valle del Campestre 66265 San Pedro Garza Garcia Nuevo Leon (81) 8748-1500 / MX | ||
Former [2007/23] | For all designated states EASTMAN CHEMICAL COMPANY 100 North Eastman Road Kingsport, TN 37660 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WONDERS, Alan, George 1005 Winchester Lane Kingsport, TN 37660 / US | 02 /
LAVOIE, Gino, Georges 1517 Belmeade Drive Kingsport, TN 37664 / US | 03 /
SUMNER, Charles, Edwan, Jr. 4280 Orebank Road Kingsport, Tennessee 37664 / US | [2007/23] | Representative(s) | Tostmann, Holger Carl, et al Wallinger Ricker Schlotter Tostmann Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Zweibrückenstrasse 5-7 80331 München / DE | [2018/38] |
Former [2012/12] | Tostmann, Holger Carl, et al Wallinger Ricker Schlotter Tostmann Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Zweibrückenstrasse 5-7 80331 München / DE | ||
Former [2007/23] | Best, Michael, et al Lederer & Keller Patentanwälte Prinzregentenstrasse 16 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 05807735.5 | 29.08.2005 | [2007/23] | WO2005US30656 | Priority number, date | US20040606738P | 02.09.2004 Original published format: US 606738 P | US20040631359P | 29.11.2004 Original published format: US 631359 P | US20050659523P | 08.03.2005 Original published format: US 659523 P | US20050154481 | 16.06.2005 Original published format: US 154481 | [2007/23] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2006028769 | Date: | 16.03.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/11] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1791802 | Date: | 06.06.2007 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 16.03.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/23] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1791802 | Date: | 19.09.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/38] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 04.05.2006 | Classification | IPC: | C07C51/265, C07C63/26 | [2007/23] | CPC: |
C07C51/265 (EP,KR,US);
C07C63/26 (KR)
| C-Set: |
C07C51/265, C07C63/26 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2018/38] |
Former [2007/23] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | OPTIMIERTE FLÜSSIGPHASENOXIDATION VON P-XYLOL | [2018/16] | English: | OPTIMIZED LIQUID-PHASE OXIDATION OF P-XYLENE | [2007/23] | French: | OXYDATION EN PHASE LIQUIDE OPTIMISEE DU P-XYLENE | [2018/16] |
Former [2007/23] | OPTIMIERTE FLÜSSIGPHASENOXIDATION | ||
Former [2007/23] | OXYDATION EH PHASE LIQUIDE OPTIMISEE | Entry into regional phase | 15.02.2007 | National basic fee paid | 15.02.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 15.02.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 15.02.2007 | Examination requested [2007/23] | 25.06.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 07.01.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.02.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 13.08.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.09.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 13.03.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.04.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.07.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.02.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.05.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.10.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.01.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.03.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.07.2018 | Fee for grant paid | 20.07.2018 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 20.07.2018 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 25.06.2007 | Opposition(s) | 20.06.2019 | No opposition filed within time limit [2019/35] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 03.08.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 08.08.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 07.08.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 06.08.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 30.08.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 10.08.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 19.08.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 13.08.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 10.08.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 11.08.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 14.08.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 10.08.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 14 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 29.08.2005 | CY | 19.09.2018 | CZ | 19.09.2018 | DK | 19.09.2018 | EE | 19.09.2018 | FI | 19.09.2018 | LV | 19.09.2018 | MC | 19.09.2018 | SE | 19.09.2018 | SI | 19.09.2018 | SK | 19.09.2018 | BG | 19.12.2018 | IS | 19.01.2019 | [2021/32] |
Former [2021/26] | CY | 19.09.2018 | |
CZ | 19.09.2018 | ||
DK | 19.09.2018 | ||
EE | 19.09.2018 | ||
FI | 19.09.2018 | ||
LV | 19.09.2018 | ||
MC | 19.09.2018 | ||
SE | 19.09.2018 | ||
SI | 19.09.2018 | ||
SK | 19.09.2018 | ||
BG | 19.12.2018 | ||
IS | 19.01.2019 | ||
Former [2020/25] | CZ | 19.09.2018 | |
DK | 19.09.2018 | ||
EE | 19.09.2018 | ||
FI | 19.09.2018 | ||
LV | 19.09.2018 | ||
MC | 19.09.2018 | ||
SE | 19.09.2018 | ||
SI | 19.09.2018 | ||
SK | 19.09.2018 | ||
BG | 19.12.2018 | ||
IS | 19.01.2019 | ||
Former [2019/50] | CZ | 19.09.2018 | |
DK | 19.09.2018 | ||
EE | 19.09.2018 | ||
FI | 19.09.2018 | ||
LV | 19.09.2018 | ||
SE | 19.09.2018 | ||
SI | 19.09.2018 | ||
SK | 19.09.2018 | ||
BG | 19.12.2018 | ||
IS | 19.01.2019 | ||
Former [2019/34] | CZ | 19.09.2018 | |
DK | 19.09.2018 | ||
EE | 19.09.2018 | ||
FI | 19.09.2018 | ||
LV | 19.09.2018 | ||
SE | 19.09.2018 | ||
SK | 19.09.2018 | ||
BG | 19.12.2018 | ||
IS | 19.01.2019 | ||
Former [2019/24] | CZ | 19.09.2018 | |
EE | 19.09.2018 | ||
FI | 19.09.2018 | ||
LV | 19.09.2018 | ||
SE | 19.09.2018 | ||
SK | 19.09.2018 | ||
BG | 19.12.2018 | ||
IS | 19.01.2019 | ||
Former [2019/22] | CZ | 19.09.2018 | |
FI | 19.09.2018 | ||
LV | 19.09.2018 | ||
SE | 19.09.2018 | ||
BG | 19.12.2018 | ||
IS | 19.01.2019 | ||
Former [2019/21] | FI | 19.09.2018 | |
LV | 19.09.2018 | ||
SE | 19.09.2018 | ||
BG | 19.12.2018 | ||
IS | 19.01.2019 | ||
Former [2019/13] | FI | 19.09.2018 | |
LV | 19.09.2018 | ||
SE | 19.09.2018 | ||
BG | 19.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/10] | FI | 19.09.2018 | |
SE | 19.09.2018 | ||
BG | 19.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/08] | FI | 19.09.2018 | Cited in | International search | [Y]US3082250 (BALDWIN RICHARD H, et al) [Y] 1-25 * column 1, lines 25-31,66-70 * * column 3, lines 8-19,36-39,49-54,63-66 ** column 4, lines 43-62; example 1; claim 1 *; | [Y]GB1062482 (STANDARD OIL CO) [Y] 1-25 * page 1, line 69 - page 2, lines 12,86-106,130 * * page 3, line 14 * * page 4, lines 68-78 *; | [XY]GB1373230 (MITSUI PETROCHEMICAL IND) [X] 1-14 * the whole document * [Y] 15-25; | [Y]GB1593117 (MONTEDISON SPA) [Y] 1-25 * page 1 - page 2, line 39 * * page 3, lines 15-19; examples 1,2; claims 1-3 *; | [Y]US4939297 (BROWDER LARRY W [US], et al) [Y] 1-25 * column W *; | [XP]EP1484306 (EASTMAN CHEM CO [US]) [XP] 1,4,5,9,13,14,20 * paragraphs [0003] - [0006] - [0017] , [0024]; claim 1; table 1 * | Examination | US4777287 | US5142097 |