EP1814894 - FLAVONOID COMPLEXES WITH CYCLODEXTRINS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.06.2013 Database last updated on 10.05.2025 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.07.2014 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 20.08.2014 [2014/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states European Brand Participations SA 105, Val Ste Croix 1371 Luxembourg / LU | [2012/48] |
Former [2007/32] | For all designated states Merck Patent GmbH Frankfurter Strasse 250 64293 Darmstadt / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CAROLA, Christophe Moltkestrasse 12 69120 Heidelberg / DE | 02 /
TOULLEC, Anne 19, rue Auguste Mounié 92160 Antony / FR | 03 /
BUCHHOLZ, Herwig Dielmannstrasse 33 60599 Frankfurt / DE | [2007/39] |
Former [2007/32] | 01 /
CAROLA, Christophe Moltkestrasse 12 69120 Heidelberg / DE | ||
02 /
TOULLEC, Anne Obere Muehlstrasse 56 64291 Darmstadt / DE | |||
03 /
BUCHHOLZ, Herwig Dielmannstrasse 33 60599 Frankfurt / DE | Representative(s) | (deleted) | [2012/32] | Application number, filing date | 05808134.0 | 04.11.2005 | [2007/32] | WO2005EP11830 | Priority number, date | DE20041056899 | 25.11.2004 Original published format: DE102004056899 | [2007/32] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2006056308 | Date: | 01.06.2006 | Language: | DE | [2006/22] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1814894 | Date: | 08.08.2007 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 01.06.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/32] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1814894 | Date: | 08.08.2012 | Language: | DE | [2012/32] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 18.01.2007 | Classification | IPC: | C07H17/07 | [2007/32] | CPC: |
A61Q19/08 (EP,US);
A61K8/498 (EP,US);
A61K8/738 (EP,US);
A61P17/18 (EP);
A61Q17/04 (EP,US);
A61Q19/00 (EP,US);
C07D311/30 (EP,US);
C08B37/0015 (EP,US);
C08L5/16 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/32] | Title | German: | FLAVONOID-KOMPLEXE MIT CYCLODEXTRINEN | [2007/32] | English: | FLAVONOID COMPLEXES WITH CYCLODEXTRINS | [2007/32] | French: | COMPLEXES FLAVONOIDES AVEC CYCLODEXTRINES | [2007/32] | Entry into regional phase | 19.03.2007 | National basic fee paid | 19.03.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 19.03.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 19.03.2007 | Examination requested [2007/32] | 16.03.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 14.09.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.09.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.12.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.03.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.06.2012 | Fee for grant paid | 15.06.2012 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 16.03.2011 | Opposition(s) | 10.05.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit [2013/29] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.11.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.11.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.11.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 14.11.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 04.11.2005 | CY | 08.08.2012 | CZ | 08.08.2012 | DK | 08.08.2012 | EE | 08.08.2012 | FI | 08.08.2012 | IT | 08.08.2012 | LT | 08.08.2012 | LV | 08.08.2012 | NL | 08.08.2012 | PL | 08.08.2012 | RO | 08.08.2012 | SE | 08.08.2012 | SI | 08.08.2012 | SK | 08.08.2012 | TR | 08.08.2012 | IE | 04.11.2012 | LU | 04.11.2012 | BG | 08.11.2012 | GB | 08.11.2012 | GR | 09.11.2012 | ES | 19.11.2012 | AT | 30.11.2012 | BE | 30.11.2012 | CH | 30.11.2012 | LI | 30.11.2012 | MC | 30.11.2012 | IS | 08.12.2012 | PT | 10.12.2012 | [2014/34] |
Former [2014/27] | CY | 08.08.2012 | |
CZ | 08.08.2012 | ||
DK | 08.08.2012 | ||
EE | 08.08.2012 | ||
FI | 08.08.2012 | ||
IT | 08.08.2012 | ||
LT | 08.08.2012 | ||
LV | 08.08.2012 | ||
NL | 08.08.2012 | ||
PL | 08.08.2012 | ||
RO | 08.08.2012 | ||
SE | 08.08.2012 | ||
SI | 08.08.2012 | ||
SK | 08.08.2012 | ||
TR | 08.08.2012 | ||
IE | 04.11.2012 | ||
LU | 04.11.2012 | ||
BG | 08.11.2012 | ||
GB | 08.11.2012 | ||
GR | 09.11.2012 | ||
ES | 19.11.2012 | ||
AT | 30.11.2012 | ||
BE | 30.11.2012 | ||
CH | 30.11.2012 | ||
LI | 30.11.2012 | ||
MC | 30.11.2012 | ||
IS | 08.12.2012 | ||
PT | 10.12.2012 | ||
Former [2014/21] | CY | 08.08.2012 | |
CZ | 08.08.2012 | ||
DK | 08.08.2012 | ||
EE | 08.08.2012 | ||
FI | 08.08.2012 | ||
IT | 08.08.2012 | ||
LT | 08.08.2012 | ||
LV | 08.08.2012 | ||
NL | 08.08.2012 | ||
PL | 08.08.2012 | ||
RO | 08.08.2012 | ||
SE | 08.08.2012 | ||
SI | 08.08.2012 | ||
SK | 08.08.2012 | ||
TR | 08.08.2012 | ||
IE | 04.11.2012 | ||
BG | 08.11.2012 | ||
GB | 08.11.2012 | ||
GR | 09.11.2012 | ||
ES | 19.11.2012 | ||
AT | 30.11.2012 | ||
BE | 30.11.2012 | ||
CH | 30.11.2012 | ||
LI | 30.11.2012 | ||
MC | 30.11.2012 | ||
IS | 08.12.2012 | ||
PT | 10.12.2012 | ||
Former [2014/09] | CY | 08.08.2012 | |
CZ | 08.08.2012 | ||
DK | 08.08.2012 | ||
EE | 08.08.2012 | ||
FI | 08.08.2012 | ||
IT | 08.08.2012 | ||
LT | 08.08.2012 | ||
LV | 08.08.2012 | ||
NL | 08.08.2012 | ||
PL | 08.08.2012 | ||
RO | 08.08.2012 | ||
SE | 08.08.2012 | ||
SI | 08.08.2012 | ||
SK | 08.08.2012 | ||
IE | 04.11.2012 | ||
BG | 08.11.2012 | ||
GB | 08.11.2012 | ||
GR | 09.11.2012 | ||
ES | 19.11.2012 | ||
AT | 30.11.2012 | ||
BE | 30.11.2012 | ||
CH | 30.11.2012 | ||
LI | 30.11.2012 | ||
IS | 08.12.2012 | ||
PT | 10.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/51] | CY | 08.08.2012 | |
CZ | 08.08.2012 | ||
DK | 08.08.2012 | ||
EE | 08.08.2012 | ||
FI | 08.08.2012 | ||
IT | 08.08.2012 | ||
LT | 08.08.2012 | ||
LV | 08.08.2012 | ||
NL | 08.08.2012 | ||
PL | 08.08.2012 | ||
RO | 08.08.2012 | ||
SE | 08.08.2012 | ||
SI | 08.08.2012 | ||
SK | 08.08.2012 | ||
IE | 04.11.2012 | ||
BG | 08.11.2012 | ||
GB | 08.11.2012 | ||
GR | 09.11.2012 | ||
ES | 19.11.2012 | ||
BE | 30.11.2012 | ||
CH | 30.11.2012 | ||
LI | 30.11.2012 | ||
IS | 08.12.2012 | ||
PT | 10.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/47] | CY | 08.08.2012 | |
CZ | 08.08.2012 | ||
DK | 08.08.2012 | ||
EE | 08.08.2012 | ||
FI | 08.08.2012 | ||
IT | 08.08.2012 | ||
LT | 08.08.2012 | ||
LV | 08.08.2012 | ||
NL | 08.08.2012 | ||
PL | 08.08.2012 | ||
RO | 08.08.2012 | ||
SE | 08.08.2012 | ||
SI | 08.08.2012 | ||
SK | 08.08.2012 | ||
IE | 04.11.2012 | ||
BG | 08.11.2012 | ||
GR | 09.11.2012 | ||
ES | 19.11.2012 | ||
BE | 30.11.2012 | ||
CH | 30.11.2012 | ||
LI | 30.11.2012 | ||
IS | 08.12.2012 | ||
PT | 10.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/38] | CY | 08.08.2012 | |
CZ | 08.08.2012 | ||
DK | 08.08.2012 | ||
EE | 08.08.2012 | ||
FI | 08.08.2012 | ||
IT | 08.08.2012 | ||
LT | 08.08.2012 | ||
LV | 08.08.2012 | ||
NL | 08.08.2012 | ||
PL | 08.08.2012 | ||
RO | 08.08.2012 | ||
SE | 08.08.2012 | ||
SI | 08.08.2012 | ||
SK | 08.08.2012 | ||
BG | 08.11.2012 | ||
GR | 09.11.2012 | ||
ES | 19.11.2012 | ||
BE | 30.11.2012 | ||
CH | 30.11.2012 | ||
LI | 30.11.2012 | ||
IS | 08.12.2012 | ||
PT | 10.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/34] | CY | 08.08.2012 | |
CZ | 08.08.2012 | ||
DK | 08.08.2012 | ||
EE | 08.08.2012 | ||
FI | 08.08.2012 | ||
IT | 08.08.2012 | ||
LT | 08.08.2012 | ||
LV | 08.08.2012 | ||
NL | 08.08.2012 | ||
PL | 08.08.2012 | ||
RO | 08.08.2012 | ||
SE | 08.08.2012 | ||
SI | 08.08.2012 | ||
SK | 08.08.2012 | ||
BG | 08.11.2012 | ||
GR | 09.11.2012 | ||
ES | 19.11.2012 | ||
CH | 30.11.2012 | ||
LI | 30.11.2012 | ||
IS | 08.12.2012 | ||
PT | 10.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/33] | CY | 08.08.2012 | |
CZ | 08.08.2012 | ||
DK | 08.08.2012 | ||
EE | 08.08.2012 | ||
FI | 08.08.2012 | ||
IT | 08.08.2012 | ||
LT | 08.08.2012 | ||
LV | 08.08.2012 | ||
NL | 08.08.2012 | ||
PL | 08.08.2012 | ||
RO | 08.08.2012 | ||
SE | 08.08.2012 | ||
SI | 08.08.2012 | ||
SK | 08.08.2012 | ||
GR | 09.11.2012 | ||
ES | 19.11.2012 | ||
CH | 30.11.2012 | ||
LI | 30.11.2012 | ||
IS | 08.12.2012 | ||
PT | 10.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/23] | CY | 08.08.2012 | |
CZ | 08.08.2012 | ||
DK | 08.08.2012 | ||
EE | 08.08.2012 | ||
FI | 08.08.2012 | ||
IT | 08.08.2012 | ||
LT | 08.08.2012 | ||
LV | 08.08.2012 | ||
NL | 08.08.2012 | ||
PL | 08.08.2012 | ||
RO | 08.08.2012 | ||
SE | 08.08.2012 | ||
SI | 08.08.2012 | ||
SK | 08.08.2012 | ||
GR | 09.11.2012 | ||
ES | 19.11.2012 | ||
IS | 08.12.2012 | ||
PT | 10.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/22] | CY | 08.08.2012 | |
CZ | 08.08.2012 | ||
DK | 08.08.2012 | ||
EE | 08.08.2012 | ||
FI | 08.08.2012 | ||
LT | 08.08.2012 | ||
LV | 08.08.2012 | ||
NL | 08.08.2012 | ||
PL | 08.08.2012 | ||
SE | 08.08.2012 | ||
SI | 08.08.2012 | ||
GR | 09.11.2012 | ||
ES | 19.11.2012 | ||
IS | 08.12.2012 | ||
PT | 10.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/21] | CY | 08.08.2012 | |
DK | 08.08.2012 | ||
FI | 08.08.2012 | ||
LT | 08.08.2012 | ||
LV | 08.08.2012 | ||
NL | 08.08.2012 | ||
PL | 08.08.2012 | ||
SE | 08.08.2012 | ||
SI | 08.08.2012 | ||
GR | 09.11.2012 | ||
IS | 08.12.2012 | ||
PT | 10.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/15] | CY | 08.08.2012 | |
FI | 08.08.2012 | ||
LT | 08.08.2012 | ||
LV | 08.08.2012 | ||
NL | 08.08.2012 | ||
PL | 08.08.2012 | ||
SE | 08.08.2012 | ||
SI | 08.08.2012 | ||
GR | 09.11.2012 | ||
IS | 08.12.2012 | ||
PT | 10.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/13] | CY | 08.08.2012 | |
FI | 08.08.2012 | ||
LT | 08.08.2012 | ||
LV | 08.08.2012 | ||
PL | 08.08.2012 | ||
SE | 08.08.2012 | ||
SI | 08.08.2012 | ||
GR | 09.11.2012 | ||
IS | 08.12.2012 | ||
PT | 10.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/12] | CY | 08.08.2012 | |
FI | 08.08.2012 | ||
LT | 08.08.2012 | ||
LV | 08.08.2012 | ||
PL | 08.08.2012 | ||
SE | 08.08.2012 | ||
SI | 08.08.2012 | ||
GR | 09.11.2012 | ||
IS | 08.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/11] | CY | 08.08.2012 | |
FI | 08.08.2012 | ||
LT | 08.08.2012 | ||
LV | 08.08.2012 | ||
PL | 08.08.2012 | ||
SI | 08.08.2012 | ||
GR | 09.11.2012 | ||
IS | 08.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/10] | CY | 08.08.2012 | |
FI | 08.08.2012 | ||
LT | 08.08.2012 | ||
IS | 08.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/09] | FI | 08.08.2012 | |
LT | 08.08.2012 | ||
Former [2013/08] | LT | 08.08.2012 | Cited in | International search | [Y]WO02069926 (MERCK PATENT GMBH [DE], et al) [Y] 1-17 * page 17 - page 23; claim 1 *; | [YD]EP1400579 (MERCK PATENT GMBH [DE]) [YD] 1-17 * claim 1 *; | [PX]WO2005068484 (MERCK PATENT GMBH [DE], et al) [PX] 1-17* claim 1 *; | [Y] - BUSCHMANN H-J ET AL, "APPLICATIONS OF CYCLODEXTRINS IN COSMETIC PRODUCTS: A REVIEW", JOURNAL OF COSMETIC SCIENCE, SOCIETY OF COSMETIC CHEMISTS, NEW YORK, NY,, US, (200205), vol. 53, no. 3, ISSN 1525-7886, pages 185 - 191, XP008013888 [Y] 1-17 * the whole document * | [Y] - LOFTSSON T ET AL, "CYLODEXTRINS IN TOPICAL DRUG FORMULATONS: THEORY AND PRACTICE", INTERNATIONAL JOURNAL OF PHARMACEUTICS, AMSTERDAM, NL, (200108), vol. 225, no. 1/2, ISSN 0378-5173, pages 15 - 30, XP001023910 [Y] 1-17 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0378-5173(01)00761-X |