EP1833519 - DISHWASHER WITH A DISSOLVING CHAMBER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 13.09.2013 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.09.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 16.10.2013 [2013/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BSH Bosch und Siemens Hausgeräte GmbH Carl-Wery-Strasse 34 81739 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2007/38] | For all designated states BSH Bosch und Siemens Hausgeräte GmbH Carl-Wery-Str. 34 81739 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HARTMANN, Michael An der Bleiche 18B 89420 Höchstädt / DE | 02 /
SCHESSL, Bernd Brand-Erbisdorfer-Str. 6 89407 Dillingen/Donau / DE | 03 /
SCHMID, Erich Georgstrasse 13 89567 Sontheim/Brenz / DE | [2007/38] | Application number, filing date | 05808179.5 | 21.10.2005 | [2007/38] | WO2005EP55465 | Priority number, date | DE20041063286 | 29.12.2004 Original published format: DE102004063286 | [2007/38] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2006072483 | Date: | 13.07.2006 | Language: | DE | [2006/28] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1833519 | Date: | 19.09.2007 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 13.07.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/38] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 13.07.2006 | Classification | IPC: | A61L15/44, A47L15/50 | [2007/38] | CPC: |
A47L15/505 (EP,US);
A47L15/44 (KR);
A47L15/4445 (EP,US);
A47L15/50 (KR)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/38] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | GESCHIRRSPÜLMASCHINE MIT EINER AUFLÖSUNGSKAMMER | [2007/38] | English: | DISHWASHER WITH A DISSOLVING CHAMBER | [2007/38] | French: | LAVE-VAISSELLE COMPRENANT UNE CHAMBRE DE DISSOLUTION | [2007/38] | Entry into regional phase | 30.07.2007 | National basic fee paid | 30.07.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 30.07.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 30.07.2007 | Examination requested [2007/38] | 11.12.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.04.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2013/42] | 28.05.2013 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2013/42] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 11.12.2012 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.10.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.10.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 02.11.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 02.11.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 31.10.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 31.10.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]JP2001286428 ; | [DA]EP0298353 (HENKEL KGAA [DE]) [DA] 1* the whole document *; | [A]EP0882423 (ESSWEIN SA [FR]) [A] 1 * the whole document *; | [X]EP1002494 (ESSWEIN SA [FR]) [X] 1-6,9,10 * paragraph [0013] - paragraph [0014] *; | [X]EP1319360 (CANDY SPA [IT]) [X] 1,4,5,8,12 * paragraph [0041] - paragraph [0046] *; | [X]WO2004084699 (MERLONI ELETTRODOMESTICI SPA [IT], et al) [X] 1 * page 11, line 4 - page 14, line 28 * * page 17, line 25 - line 32 * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (20020402), vol. 2002, no. 02, & JP2001286428 A 20011016 (RINNAI CORP) [A] 1 * abstract * |