Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2008108548 | Global Dossier | 08.05.2008 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2005NL50040 | 14.11.2005 | EP04078112 | 12.11.2004 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP5069121B | Global Dossier | 07.11.2012 | B2 | JP2008519831 | 12.06.2008 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2005NL50040 | 14.11.2005 | EP04078112 | 12.11.2004 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU2005302852B | Global Dossier | 02.06.2011 | B2 | AU2005302852 | 18.05.2006 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2005NL50040 | 14.11.2005 | EP04078112 | 12.11.2004 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1811867 | Global Dossier | 01.08.2007 | A2 | Priority number | Date | EP05808543 | 14.11.2005 | WO2005NL50040 | 14.11.2005 | EP04078112 | 12.11.2004 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | BRPI0517336 | 07.10.2008 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2005NL50040 | 14.11.2005 | EP04078112 | 12.11.2004 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2006052134 | Global Dossier | 16.08.2007 | A3 | WO2006052134 | 18.05.2006 | A2 | Priority number | Date | EP04078112 | 12.11.2004 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN101179954 | 14.05.2008 | A | Priority number | Date | EP04078112 | 12.11.2004 |