EP1797363 - PIPE LAP JOINT WITH IMPROVED SEALING SLOT FOR INCREASED CIRCUMFERENTIAL CLOSURE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.06.2013 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.05.2014 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): LU | published on 02.07.2014 [2014/27] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Norma U.S. Holding LLC 2430 E. Walton Boulevard Auburn Hills, MI 48326 / US | [2010/36] |
Former [2007/25] | For all designated states Breeze-Torca Products, LLC 2430 E. Walton Blvd Auburn Hills, Michigan 48326 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
IGNACZAK, Brian, T. 1179 Sycamore Road Rochester, MI 48307 / US | 02 /
POLASKI, Alan 4017 Athens Ave. Waterford, MI 48329 / US | [2007/25] | Representative(s) | Barker, Rosemary Anne, et al HGF Limited 4th Floor, Merchant Exchange 17-19 Whitworth Street West Manchester M1 5WG / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2012/32] | Barker, Rosemary Anne, et al Harrison Goddard Foote 4th Floor, Merchant Exchange 17-19 Whitworth Street West Manchester M1 5WG / GB | ||
Former [2008/19] | Barker, Rosemary Anne, et al Harrison Goddard Foote Orlando House 11c Compstall Road Marple Bridge Stockport SK6 5HH / GB | ||
Former [2007/25] | Denmark, James Christopher, et al Harrison Goddard Foote, Orlando House, 11c Compstall Road Marple Bridge Stockport SK6 5HH / GB | Application number, filing date | 05808834.5 | 04.10.2005 | [2007/25] | WO2005US35396 | Priority number, date | US20040615772P | 04.10.2004 Original published format: US 615772 P | [2007/25] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2006041752 | Date: | 20.04.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/16] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1797363 | Date: | 20.06.2007 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 20.04.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/25] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1797363 | Date: | 08.08.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/32] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 28.12.2006 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.12.2010 | Classification | IPC: | F16L25/00 | [2007/25] | CPC: |
F16L21/065 (EP,US);
F16L33/00 (KR);
F01N13/1805 (EP,US);
F01N13/1827 (EP,US);
F16L25/00 (KR);
F16L33/04 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/25] | Title | German: | ROHRSCHWEISSVERBINDUNG MIT VERBESSERTER VERSIEGELUNG FÜR BESSEREN RUNDUMVERSCHLUSS | [2007/25] | English: | PIPE LAP JOINT WITH IMPROVED SEALING SLOT FOR INCREASED CIRCUMFERENTIAL CLOSURE | [2007/25] | French: | JOINT A RECOUVREMENT POUR TUYAUX AYANT UNE MEILLEURE FENTE D'ETANCHEITE POUR UNE FERMETURE CIRCONFERENTIELLE AMELIOREE | [2007/25] | Entry into regional phase | 13.03.2007 | National basic fee paid | 13.03.2007 | Search fee paid | 13.03.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 13.03.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 13.03.2007 | Examination requested [2007/25] | 11.07.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 29.02.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 29.06.2012 | Fee for grant paid | 29.06.2012 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 29.02.2012 | Opposition(s) | 10.05.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit [2013/29] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.10.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.10.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.10.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.10.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 25.10.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 08.08.2012 | BE | 08.08.2012 | CY | 08.08.2012 | CZ | 08.08.2012 | DK | 08.08.2012 | EE | 08.08.2012 | FI | 08.08.2012 | IT | 08.08.2012 | LT | 08.08.2012 | LV | 08.08.2012 | PL | 08.08.2012 | RO | 08.08.2012 | SI | 08.08.2012 | SK | 08.08.2012 | TR | 08.08.2012 | IE | 04.10.2012 | LU | 04.10.2012 | CH | 31.10.2012 | LI | 31.10.2012 | MC | 31.10.2012 | BG | 08.11.2012 | IS | 08.12.2012 | PT | 10.12.2012 | [2014/27] |
Former [2014/21] | AT | 08.08.2012 | |
BE | 08.08.2012 | ||
CY | 08.08.2012 | ||
CZ | 08.08.2012 | ||
DK | 08.08.2012 | ||
EE | 08.08.2012 | ||
FI | 08.08.2012 | ||
IT | 08.08.2012 | ||
LT | 08.08.2012 | ||
LV | 08.08.2012 | ||
PL | 08.08.2012 | ||
RO | 08.08.2012 | ||
SI | 08.08.2012 | ||
SK | 08.08.2012 | ||
TR | 08.08.2012 | ||
IE | 04.10.2012 | ||
CH | 31.10.2012 | ||
LI | 31.10.2012 | ||
MC | 31.10.2012 | ||
BG | 08.11.2012 | ||
IS | 08.12.2012 | ||
PT | 10.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/34] | AT | 08.08.2012 | |
BE | 08.08.2012 | ||
CY | 08.08.2012 | ||
CZ | 08.08.2012 | ||
DK | 08.08.2012 | ||
EE | 08.08.2012 | ||
FI | 08.08.2012 | ||
IT | 08.08.2012 | ||
LT | 08.08.2012 | ||
LV | 08.08.2012 | ||
PL | 08.08.2012 | ||
RO | 08.08.2012 | ||
SI | 08.08.2012 | ||
SK | 08.08.2012 | ||
IE | 04.10.2012 | ||
CH | 31.10.2012 | ||
LI | 31.10.2012 | ||
MC | 31.10.2012 | ||
BG | 08.11.2012 | ||
IS | 08.12.2012 | ||
PT | 10.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/33] | AT | 08.08.2012 | |
BE | 08.08.2012 | ||
CY | 08.08.2012 | ||
CZ | 08.08.2012 | ||
DK | 08.08.2012 | ||
EE | 08.08.2012 | ||
FI | 08.08.2012 | ||
IT | 08.08.2012 | ||
LT | 08.08.2012 | ||
LV | 08.08.2012 | ||
PL | 08.08.2012 | ||
RO | 08.08.2012 | ||
SI | 08.08.2012 | ||
SK | 08.08.2012 | ||
IE | 04.10.2012 | ||
CH | 31.10.2012 | ||
LI | 31.10.2012 | ||
MC | 31.10.2012 | ||
IS | 08.12.2012 | ||
PT | 10.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/24] | AT | 08.08.2012 | |
BE | 08.08.2012 | ||
CY | 08.08.2012 | ||
CZ | 08.08.2012 | ||
DK | 08.08.2012 | ||
EE | 08.08.2012 | ||
FI | 08.08.2012 | ||
IT | 08.08.2012 | ||
LT | 08.08.2012 | ||
LV | 08.08.2012 | ||
PL | 08.08.2012 | ||
RO | 08.08.2012 | ||
SI | 08.08.2012 | ||
SK | 08.08.2012 | ||
MC | 31.10.2012 | ||
IS | 08.12.2012 | ||
PT | 10.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/23] | AT | 08.08.2012 | |
BE | 08.08.2012 | ||
CY | 08.08.2012 | ||
CZ | 08.08.2012 | ||
DK | 08.08.2012 | ||
EE | 08.08.2012 | ||
FI | 08.08.2012 | ||
IT | 08.08.2012 | ||
LT | 08.08.2012 | ||
LV | 08.08.2012 | ||
PL | 08.08.2012 | ||
RO | 08.08.2012 | ||
SI | 08.08.2012 | ||
SK | 08.08.2012 | ||
IS | 08.12.2012 | ||
PT | 10.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/22] | AT | 08.08.2012 | |
BE | 08.08.2012 | ||
CY | 08.08.2012 | ||
CZ | 08.08.2012 | ||
DK | 08.08.2012 | ||
EE | 08.08.2012 | ||
FI | 08.08.2012 | ||
LT | 08.08.2012 | ||
LV | 08.08.2012 | ||
PL | 08.08.2012 | ||
SI | 08.08.2012 | ||
IS | 08.12.2012 | ||
PT | 10.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/21] | AT | 08.08.2012 | |
BE | 08.08.2012 | ||
CY | 08.08.2012 | ||
DK | 08.08.2012 | ||
FI | 08.08.2012 | ||
LT | 08.08.2012 | ||
LV | 08.08.2012 | ||
PL | 08.08.2012 | ||
SI | 08.08.2012 | ||
IS | 08.12.2012 | ||
PT | 10.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/13] | AT | 08.08.2012 | |
BE | 08.08.2012 | ||
CY | 08.08.2012 | ||
FI | 08.08.2012 | ||
LT | 08.08.2012 | ||
LV | 08.08.2012 | ||
PL | 08.08.2012 | ||
SI | 08.08.2012 | ||
IS | 08.12.2012 | ||
PT | 10.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/12] | AT | 08.08.2012 | |
BE | 08.08.2012 | ||
CY | 08.08.2012 | ||
FI | 08.08.2012 | ||
LT | 08.08.2012 | ||
LV | 08.08.2012 | ||
PL | 08.08.2012 | ||
SI | 08.08.2012 | ||
IS | 08.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/11] | AT | 08.08.2012 | |
CY | 08.08.2012 | ||
FI | 08.08.2012 | ||
LT | 08.08.2012 | ||
LV | 08.08.2012 | ||
PL | 08.08.2012 | ||
SI | 08.08.2012 | ||
IS | 08.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/10] | AT | 08.08.2012 | |
CY | 08.08.2012 | ||
FI | 08.08.2012 | ||
LT | 08.08.2012 | ||
IS | 08.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/09] | AT | 08.08.2012 | |
FI | 08.08.2012 | ||
LT | 08.08.2012 | ||
Former [2013/08] | AT | 08.08.2012 | |
LT | 08.08.2012 | ||
Former [2013/07] | AT | 08.08.2012 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US2227551 (MORRIS JOLLY L) [Y] 7-9 * page 1, line 34 - line 54; figures 1-2 *; | [YD]US5588680 (CASSEL SCOTT T [US], et al) [YD] 13,18* the whole document *; | [XDYI]US6089624 (CASSEL SCOTT T [US], et al) [XD] 1-5,10,11,15-17,19 * the whole document * [Y] 7-9,13,18 [I] 6,12,14 | International search | [A]US6435565 (POTTS MICHAEL R [US], et al); | [A]US6199921 (CASSEL SCOTT T [US], et al); | [X]US6089624 (CASSEL SCOTT T [US], et al); | [A]US5944365 (KIZLER WOLFGANG [DE], et al); | [Y]US5588680 (CASSEL SCOTT T [US], et al); | [A]US4629226 (CASSEL THOMAS R [US], et al); | [A]US4113289 (WAGNER WAYNE M, et al) | by applicant | US4629226 | US5588680 | US6089624 |