EP1953107 - BRAKE SYSTEM FOR ELEVATOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 21.11.2014 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.11.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 24.12.2014 [2014/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORPORATION 7-3, Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8310 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2008/32] | For all designated states MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORPORATION 7-3, Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8310 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KIGAWA, Hiroshi c/o Mitsubishi Denki Kabushiki Kaisha 7-3, Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8310 / JP | 02 /
OKAMOTO, Ken-Ichi c/o Mitsubishi Denki Kabushiki Kaisha 7-3, Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8310 / JP | 03 /
UEDA, Takaharu c/o Mitsubishi Denki Kabushiki Kaisha 7-3, Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8310 / JP | [2014/03] |
Former [2008/32] | 01 /
KIGAWA, Hiroshi c/o Mitsubishi Denki Kabushiki Kaisha 7-3, Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8310 / JP | ||
02 /
OKAMOTO, Ken-Ichi c/o Mitsubishi Denki Kabushiki Kaisha 7-3, Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8310 / JP | |||
03 /
UEDA, Takaharu c/o Mitsubishi Denki Kabushiki Kaisha 7-3, Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8310 / JP | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastrasse 30 81925 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2014/03] | HOFFMANN EITLE Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4 81925 München / DE | ||
Former [2008/32] | HOFFMANN EITLE Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4 81925 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 05809480.6 | 21.11.2005 | [2008/32] | WO2005JP21362 | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2007057973 | Date: | 24.05.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/21] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1953107 | Date: | 06.08.2008 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 24.05.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2008/32] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1953107 | Date: | 15.01.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/03] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 24.05.2007 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.05.2012 | Classification | IPC: | B66B5/02, B66B1/32, B66B5/04, B66B5/14, B66B1/34, B66B5/06 | [2012/26] | CPC: |
B66B5/06 (EP);
B66B5/02 (KR);
B66B1/32 (KR);
B66B1/3492 (EP);
B66B5/04 (EP,KR);
B66B5/14 (KR);
B66B5/18 (EP)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2008/32] | B66B5/02, B66B1/32, B66B5/04, B66B5/14 | Designated contracting states | DE [2008/51] |
Former [2008/32] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | BREMSSYSTEM FÜR AUFZUG | [2008/32] | English: | BRAKE SYSTEM FOR ELEVATOR | [2008/32] | French: | SYSTEME DE FREIN POUR ASCENSEUR | [2008/32] | Entry into regional phase | 22.02.2008 | Translation filed | 22.02.2008 | National basic fee paid | 22.02.2008 | Search fee paid | 22.02.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.02.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.02.2008 | Examination requested [2008/32] | 23.06.2008 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 29.07.2008 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 12.11.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 09.08.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.12.2013 | Fee for grant paid | 04.12.2013 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 09.08.2013 | Opposition(s) | 16.10.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit [2014/52] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.04.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.11.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.11.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.11.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 23.11.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 14.11.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 16.11.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [YA]US5244060 (TANAKA MASAKATSU [JP], et al) [Y] 2 * column 2, lines 3-21 * * column 5, line 5 - column 6, line 47; figures 3,5,6 * [A] 1; | [YA]JP2001278572 (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP) [Y] 3 * abstract * * paragraphs [0007] , [0011] - [0014]; claim 4 *[A] 1; | [XY]EP1431229 (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP [JP]) [X] 1 * paragraphs [0015] - [0026]; figures 1,2,4,5a,5b * [Y] 2,3 | International search | [Y]JP2001278572 (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP); | [Y]WO2004031064 (HITACHI LTD [JP], et al) | by applicant | US5244060 | JP2004123279 | EP1431229 |