EP1776794 - PERMUTATION DATA TRANSFORM TO ENHANCE SECURITY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 12.02.2016 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.02.2016 | Refusal of application | published on 16.03.2016 [2016/11] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CMLA, LLC. Intel Corporation 2111 NE 25th Avenue M/S JF 2-98 Hillsboro, OR 97124 / US | [2007/17] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DAMGAARD, Ivan, Bjerre Johannes Ewalds Vej 9 DK-8230 Aabyhoej / DK | 02 /
PEDERSEN, Torben, Pryds Johannes Ewalds Vej 20 DK-8230 Aabyhoej / DK | 03 /
RIJMEN, Vincent Martingasse 4 A-8020 Graz / AT | [2007/17] | Representative(s) | Wilding, Frances Ward, et al Haseltine Lake LLP Lincoln House, 5th Floor 300 High Holborn London WC1V 7JH / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2008/34] | Wilding, Frances Ward, et al Haseltine Lake Lincoln House 300 High Holborn London WC1V 7JH / GB | ||
Former [2007/17] | Wilding, Frances Ward, et al Haseltine Lake Lincoln House 300 High Holborn London WC1V 7JH / GB | Application number, filing date | 05809820.3 | 09.08.2005 | [2007/17] | WO2005US28316 | Priority number, date | US20040918717 | 12.08.2004 Original published format: US 918717 | US20040918103 | 12.08.2004 Original published format: US 918103 | US20040918718 | 12.08.2004 Original published format: US 918718 | [2007/17] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2006023334 | Date: | 02.03.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/09] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1776794 | Date: | 25.04.2007 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 02.03.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/17] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 01.06.2006 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.08.2010 | Classification | IPC: | H04L9/06, H04L9/08 | [2010/38] | CPC: |
G09C1/00 (EP);
G06F21/00 (KR);
H04L9/065 (KR);
H04L2209/603 (EP);
H04L9/06 (EP);
H04L9/0861 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2007/17] | H04K1/04 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/17] | Extension states | AL | 14.02.2007 | BA | 14.02.2007 | HR | 14.02.2007 | MK | 14.02.2007 | YU | 14.02.2007 | Title | German: | PERMUTATIONSDATENTRANSFORMATION ZUR VERBESSERUNG DER SICHERHEIT | [2007/17] | English: | PERMUTATION DATA TRANSFORM TO ENHANCE SECURITY | [2007/17] | French: | TRANSFORMATION DE DONNEES DE PERMUTATION AMELIORANT LA SECURITE | [2007/17] | Entry into regional phase | 14.02.2007 | National basic fee paid | 14.02.2007 | Search fee paid | 14.02.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 14.02.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 14.02.2007 | Examination requested [2007/17] | 10.03.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 17.05.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 24.11.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.02.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 27.03.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.09.2015 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 12.10.2015 | 12.10.2015 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 29.10.2015 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2016/11] | 08.11.2015 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2016/11] | Divisional application(s) | EP12150373.4 / EP2439872 | EP12150375.9 / EP2439873 | EP12161611.4 / EP2487827 | EP13167858.3 / EP2629449 | EP13167859.1 / EP2629450 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 17.05.2011 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.08.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.08.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 17.08.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 25.08.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 27.08.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 27.08.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 27.08.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 27.08.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 11 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4316055 (FEISTEL HORST) [A] 1-41 * columns 4,5 *; | [A]EP1087425 (OTKRYTOE AKTSIONERNOE OBSCHEST [RU], et al) [A] 1-41* paragraphs [0018] , [0019]; claim 1 *; | [IY] - MOLDOVYAN A A ET AL, "A CIPHER BASED ON DATA-DEPENDENT PERMUTATIONS", JOURNAL OF CRYPTOLOGY, SPRINGER, NEW YORK, NY, US LNKD- DOI:10.1007/S00145-001-0012-9, (20021201), vol. 15, no. 1, ISSN 0933-2790, pages 61 - 72, XP001077672 [I] 1,3-8,17-20,22-28,39,40 * pages 61-65; figures 1-4 * [Y] 2,9-16,21,29-38,41 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/s00145-001-0012-9 | [Y] - KWAN M, "THE DESIGN OF THE ICE ENCRYPTION ALGORITHM", FAST SOFTWARE ENCRYPTION. INTERNATIONAL WORKSHOP, XX, XX, (19970120), pages 69 - 82, XP008002265 [Y] 2,9-16,21,29-38,41 * section 3 * | International search | [A]US5796839 (ISHIGURO RYUJI [JP]); | [A]US5799088 (RAIKE WILLIAM MICHAEL [NZ]); | [A]US2001031050 (DOMSTEDT BO [SE], et al); | [X]US2002118827 (LUYSTER FRANK C [US]); | [A]US2003081785 (BONEH DAN [US], et al); | [A]US2003208677 (AYYAGARI ARUN [US], et al) |